TCYK, LLC v. DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 24.15.249.99
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06660
District Judge Harry D. Leinenweber, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 6:47 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (ao,) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Cause voluntarily dismissed by plaintiff pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1).Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 24.15.249.99 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
          MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiff's Motion for leave to take discovery 7 is granted. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 7 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/3/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 7 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                    MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ao,) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                          CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8739804. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 136 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?