TCYK, LLC v. DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06650
District Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 6:48 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241 jphn.doe.0x32.0x9E.0xE.0xF1@gmail.com
No Logo Kyle Rogers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kyle Rogers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Rogers
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 pro se appearance
PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Kyle Rogers. (ao,)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Order on Motion to Quash
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 3/17/2014. Defendant revealed identity and address in open court. Defendant to file an amended response by 3/19/2014, including her name and address as set forth in open court, as well as an appearance. Status hearing set for 4/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. Defendant's motion to quash [17] is entered and continued to 4/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. Joint status report to be filed by 4/16/2014.Mailed notice (rth, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 Response
      RESPONSE by Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241 to plaintiffs complaint for copyright infringement. (ao,)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 2/11/2014, regarding Defendants motion to quash (17). The defendants motion to quash is entered and continued to 3/17/14 at 9:00 a.m. The plaintiff served summons and complaint on the defendant in open court. The defendant is given twenty-one days in which to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiffs' complaint. Status hearing is set for 3/17/14 at 9:00 a.m.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION by Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241 to quash or modify subpoena and supporting brief of Comcast subscriber 17 . (tlp, ) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of MOTION by Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241 to quash or modify subpoena and supporting brief of Comcast subscriber 17 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/11/2014 at 8:45 AM. (tlp, ) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION by Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241 to quash or modify subpoena and supporting brief of Comcast subscriber (attachment). (tlp, ) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 2/3/2014. Defendant granted leave to properly re-file her motion to quash and notice it before this court on 2/11/2014 at 08:45 AM. Defendant to serve a copy of the motion on plaintiff prior to the motion hearing.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 12/16/2013. Defendant DOE's motion to quash 13 is stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b). Status hearing set for 2/3/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM by DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241 in support of motion of comcast subscriber to quash or to modify subpoena and motion for protective order. (ao,) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION by Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241 to quash or to modify subpoena and supporting brief or comcast subscriber. (Exhibits) (ao,) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                        PRO SE Appearance by Defendant DOE, subscriber assigned IP Address 50.158.14.241. (ao,) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 10/9/2013. Plaintiff's for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference 8 is granted. Status hearing set for 12/16/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 8 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/9/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 8 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, due to a clerical error, the Honorable Edmond E. Chang was directly assigned and Magistrate Judge Young B. Kim was directly designated in the cases listed below; therefore It is hereby ordered that, the Clerk is to reassign these cases by lot to a district judge and designate a magistrate judge by lot. Case reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/18/2013. (td, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                    MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ao,) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                          CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8739392. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 155 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?