CLI Holdings Inc
Bankruptcy Case Washington Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-19746-KAO
District Judge Karen A. Overstreet, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 16, 2016 at 6:06 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo , U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A Buford Thomas.A.Buford@usdoj.gov
No Logo CLI Holdings, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deirdre P Glyn Levin +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384
900 Winslow Way East, Suite 100
Bainbridge Island, WA 98110
KITSAP-WA
Tax ID / EIN: 98-1138574dba Alydian Deirdre Glynn Levin +1 206 623 1900

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
900 Winslow Way East, Suite 100
Bainbridge Island, WA 98110
KITSAP-WA
Tax ID / EIN: 98-1138574dba Alydian Keller Rohrback LLP +1 206 623 1900
  Entries (228) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Transfer of Claim
Transfer of Claim Transferor: Soule Investments LLC (Claim No. 13) To Coinlab, Inc. Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc..(Pearson, Jane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Transfer of Claim
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Bitvestment Partners LLC fka Dalsa Barbour LLC (Claim No. 11) To Coinlab, Inc. Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc..(Pearson, Jane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim(13-19746-KAO) [claims,trclm] ( 25.00). Receipt number 18939148. Fee amount $ 25.00. (U.S. Treasury)
    LREF
    Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
    Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim(13-19746-KAO) [claims,trclm] ( 25.00). Receipt number 18939076. Fee amount $ 25.00. (U.S. Treasury)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Submitted But Not Entered
      Submitted But Not Entered (Related document(s)112 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9). (SYL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
        Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Pearson, Jane. Related document [112]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Hearing Notice
          Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case (Related document(s)112 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9). Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc.. (Pearson, Jane)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 113 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Declaration
            Declaration of Jane Pearson in Support of Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case (Related document(s)112 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9)... Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1 # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2) (Pearson, Jane)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9Court Filing
            Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause ... Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc. The Hearing date is set for 2/28/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. Response due by 2/21/2014. (Pearson, Jane)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order re: Application to Employ
              ORDER Granting Debtor's Application to Employ Denali Financial Consulting LLC as Accountant (Related Doc # 80) (SYL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Hearing Not Held LBR 9013
                Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Order to be entered pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1(f)(2). (related document(s): [80] Application to Employ filed by CLI Holdings Inc) (MJB )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                  Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Glynn Levin, Deirdre. Related document [80]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Declaration of No Objection
                    Declaration of No Objection (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 81 Declaration, 82 Hearing Notice, 104 Notice of Amended or Continued Hearing, 105 Proof of Service)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Notice to Court Unopposed Motion, Order to be Submitted
                      Notice to Court Unopposed Motion, Order to be Submitted. Hearing Originally Scheduled for: 01/31/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 82 Hearing Notice, 104 Notice of Amended or Continued Hearing, 105 Proof of Service). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Notice to Court Unopposed Motion, Order to be Submitted
                        Notice to Court Unopposed Motion, Order to be Submitted. Hearing Originally Scheduled for: 01/31/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 82 Hearing Notice, 104 Notice of Amended or Continued Hearing, 105 Proof of Service). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Notice to Court Unopposed Motion, Order to be Submitted
                          Notice to Court Unopposed Motion, Order to be Submitted. Hearing Originally Scheduled for: 01/31/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 82 Hearing Notice, 104 Notice of Amended or Continued Hearing, 105 Proof of Service). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Monthly Financial Report
                            Amended Monthly Financial Report for the period of November 2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Monthly Financial Report
                              Monthly Financial Report for the period of December, 2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter renoted. (related document(s): [80] Application to Employ filed by CLI Holdings Inc) Continued Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. (MJB )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                  Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter renoted. (related document(s): [80] Application to Employ filed by CLI Holdings Inc) Continued Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. (MJB )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                    Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter renoted. (related document(s): [80] Application to Employ filed by CLI Holdings Inc) Continued Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. (MJB )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Hearing Not Held. Matter Withdrawn
                                      Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter has been withdrawn. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) (MJB )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Hearing Not Held. Matter Withdrawn
                                        Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter has been withdrawn. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) (MJB )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Hearing Not Held. Matter Withdrawn
                                          Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter has been withdrawn. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) (MJB )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Audio CD Request
                                            Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/06/13 hearing. Other Info: Please send CD to Ahearn & Associates, Inc. (Maple Valley).. Requested by: Jane Pearson.. . (Transcriber - Wheeler, Shari)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Audio CD Request
                                              Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/06/13 hearing. Other Info: Please send CD to Ahearn & Associates, Inc. (Maple Valley).. Requested by: Jane Pearson.. . (Transcriber - Wheeler, Shari)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/06/13 hearing. Other Info: Please send CD to Ahearn & Associates, Inc. (Maple Valley).. Requested by: Jane Pearson.. . (Transcriber - Wheeler, Shari)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Order Re Application to Sell
                                                  ORDER Denying Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Notice of Sale, Bidding Procedures Order, and Setting Hearing on Sale of Assets and Granting Other Relief (Related Doc # 67) . (SYL)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Proof of Service
                                                      Proof of Service . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 81 Declaration, 103 Hearing Notice). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Notice of Amended or Continued HearingCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of Amended/Continued Hearing (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. Continued Hearing scheduled for 1/31/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. Response due by 1/24/2014. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Dismissal. Sent to the BNC for mailing to all creditors . (SYL) (Entered: 02/26/2014 at 08:01:08)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Hearing Notice
                                                              Amended Notice of Hearing (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ Denali Financial Consulting LLC as Accountant ). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre) Modified on 1/14/2014 Wrong Event Docketed. E-filer called (Luu, Suying).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER Dismissing Case (Related Doc # 112). Debtor CLI Holdings Inc dismissed. Case Can Close: 3/19/2014. . (SYL) (Entered: 02/26/2014 at 08:00:13)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Simonyan, Tereza. Related document [67]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    Docket Text: Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Pearson, Jane. Related document [112]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken
                                                                      Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken on Date of Hearing: 01/17/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, Minutes Hearing Held). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken
                                                                        Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken on Date of Hearing: 01/17/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, Minutes Hearing Held). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken
                                                                          Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken on Date of Hearing: 01/17/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, Minutes Hearing Held). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Declaration of No Objection
                                                                            Docket Text: Declaration of No Objection (Related document(s)112 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9)... Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc.. (Pearson, Jane)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Notice to Court of Motion to be Continued
                                                                              Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 01/17/2014 at 9:30 a.m.. to: 01/31/2014 at 9:30 a.m.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 82 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Notice to Court of Motion to be Continued
                                                                                Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 01/17/2014 at 9:30 a.m.. to: 01/31/2014 at 9:30 a.m.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 82 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Court of Motion to be Continued
                                                                                  Notice to Court Requesting Continuance of Hearing on Motion - from: Date of Hearing: 01/17/2014 at 9:30 a.m.. to: 01/31/2014 at 9:30 a.m.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ, 82 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                    Docket Text: Proof of Service . Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc.. (Related document(s)112 Motion to Dismiss Ch 7 11 12 9). (Pearson, Jane)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                      Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 1/10/14... Requested by: Tereza Simonyan, Bitvestment Partners.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                        Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 1/10/14... Requested by: Tereza Simonyan, Bitvestment Partners.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                          Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 1/10/14... Requested by: Tereza Simonyan, Bitvestment Partners.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/15/2014, Entered: 2/15/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                            Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)119 Transfer of Claim). Notice Date 02/15/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Declaration
                                                                                              Declaration of Tereza Simonyan in Support of Objection to Motion to Approve Auction Sale and Bidding Procedures (Related document(s)100 Objection)... Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Monthly Financial Report
                                                                                                Docket Text: Monthly Financial Report for the period of January 2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Objection
                                                                                                  Objection to Motion to Approve Auction Sale and Bidding Procedures (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens)... Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                    Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)118 Transfer of Claim). Notice Date 02/13/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Response
                                                                                                      Response to Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Notice of Sale, Bidding Procedures Order, And Setting Hearing on Sale of Assets and Granting Other Relief (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens)... Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc.. (Pearson, Jane)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                        Docket Text: BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)117 Transfer of Claim). Notice Date 02/13/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Special Notice Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc.. (Pearson, Jane)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Transfer of Claim
                                                                                                            Docket Text: Transfer of Claim Transferor: XRAY Holdings Limited (Claim No. 6) To Coinlab, Inc. Filed by Jane E Pearson on behalf of CoinLab, Inc..(Pearson, Jane)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Objection
                                                                                                            Objection to Sale of Assets (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens)... Filed by Jerry N Stehlik on behalf of Soule Investments, LLC. (Stehlik, Jerry)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Monthly Financial Report
                                                                                                              Amended Monthly Financial Report for the period of November 2013 (UST-14 only). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Statement of Financial Affairs
                                                                                                                Statement of Financial Affairs (Amended). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Amending Schedules D E or F
                                                                                                                  Amending Schedules B.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Amending Schedules D E or F(13-19746-KAO) [misc,860] ( 30.00). Receipt number 18789837. Fee amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                      Receipt of filing fee for Amending Schedules D E or F(13-19746-KAO) [misc,860] ( 30.00). Receipt number 18789837. Fee amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Amending Schedules D E or F(13-19746-KAO) [misc,860] ( 30.00). Receipt number 18789837. Fee amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                          Proof of Service . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)92 Declaration). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                            Supplemental Declaration of Peter Vessenes (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Court of Intent to Argue
                                                                                                                            Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 1/10/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens, 71 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Court of Intent to Argue
                                                                                                                              Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 1/10/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens, 71 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Court of Intent to Argue
                                                                                                                                Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 1/10/2014. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens, 71 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)88 Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor or Trustee). Notice Date 01/02/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)87 Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor or Trustee). Notice Date 01/02/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)86 Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor or Trustee). Notice Date 01/02/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor or Trustee
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor (for creditor Jon Chin, claim 12). (admin)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor or Trustee
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor (for creditor Robert F. Seidensticker III, claim 8). (admin)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor or Trustee
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing of Proof of Claim by Debtor (for creditor Christopher Koss, claim 5). (admin)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                              Request for Special Notice . Filed by Jerry N Stehlik on behalf of Soule Investments, LLC. (Stehlik, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                Request for Special Notice . Filed by Jerry N Stehlik on behalf of Soule Investments, LLC. (Stehlik, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                  Request for Special Notice . Filed by Jerry N Stehlik on behalf of Soule Investments, LLC. (Stehlik, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Order Re Motion to
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Bitvestment Partners LLC's Motion to Compel (Related Doc # 74) . (DLP)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                      Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Tereza Simonyan, Deirdre Glenn Levin. Order to be entered. (related document(s): [74] Motion filed by Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                        Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Tereza Simonyan, Deirdre Glenn Levin. Order to be entered. (related document(s): [74] Motion filed by Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                          Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Tereza Simonyan, Deirdre Glenn Levin. Order to be entered. (related document(s): [74] Motion filed by Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                            Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/30/13 at 10:00 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                              Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/30/13 at 10:00 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/30/13 at 10:00 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Deirdre Glynn Levin (Related document(s)83 Response)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Response
                                                                                                                                                                    Debtor's Response to Motion to Compel (Related document(s)74 Motion, 77 Order Re Motion to Shorten Time, 78 Hearing Notice)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Hearing Notice
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ Denali Financial Consulting LLC as Accountant ). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Chris Dishman in Support of Debtors Application to Employ Denali Financial Consulting LLC as Accountant (Related document(s)80 Application to Employ)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013, Terminated: 2/3/2014 Application to EmployCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ Denali Financial Consulting LLC as Accountant ... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc The Hearing date is set for 1/17/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. Response due by 1/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                            Proof of Service . Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Related document(s)77 Order Re Motion to Shorten Time, 78 Hearing Notice). (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Hearing Notice
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing on Bitvestment Partners, LLC's Motion to Compel (Related document(s)74 Motion). Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Order Re: Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing (Related Doc # 72) (RE: related document(s)74 Motion to Compel. Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. The Hearing date is set for 12/30/2013 at 10:00 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. Response due by 12/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). (JLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Simonyan, Tereza. Related document [72]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Tereza Simonyan in Support of Motion to Compel (Related document(s)74 Motion)... Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/30/2013 MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Compel. Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. The Hearing date is set for 12/30/2013 at 10:00 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. Response due by 12/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Simonyan, Tereza) Modified on 12/27/2013 to correct time of hearing. (Birkland, Judy)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Tereza Simonyan in Support of Motion to Shorten Time (Related document(s)72 Motion to Shorten Time)... Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/27/2013 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Compel.. Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None Hearing Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing (Related document(s)66 Motion to Shorten Time, 67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time to Hear (Related document(s)67 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens). The Hearing date is set for 1/10/2014 at 10:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206.. (DR)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment to Declaration of Peter Vessenes (Related document(s)66 Motion to Shorten Time)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Glynn Levin, Deirdre. Related document [66]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/15/2014 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Debtor's Motion to Sell Estate Property Free and Clear of Liens, 11 USC 363(f) Bitcoin Mining Rigs. ... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Olsen Declaration # 2 Exhibit Vessenes Declaration # 3 Exhibit Ex A to Vessenes Declaration # 4 Proposed Order) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Debtor's Motion to Shorten Time .. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Vessenes # 2 Proposed Order) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Order re: Motion to Reconsider
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider (Related Doc # 62) . (SLA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens(13-19746-KAO) [motion,144] ( 176.00). Receipt number 18735820. Fee amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens(13-19746-KAO) [motion,144] ( 176.00). Receipt number 18735820. Fee amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens(13-19746-KAO) [motion,144] ( 176.00). Receipt number 18735820. Fee amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing Not Held. Matter Withdrawn
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter has been withdrawn. (related document(s): [57] UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 Case filed by United States Trustee) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Hearing Not Held. Matter Withdrawn
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter has been withdrawn. (related document(s): [57] UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 Case filed by United States Trustee) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing Not Held. Matter Withdrawn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Matter has been withdrawn. (related document(s): [57] UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 Case filed by United States Trustee) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)57 UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 Case). Notice Date 12/19/2013. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Simonyan, Tereza. Related document [62]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/23/2013 Motion to Reconsider
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Motion to Reconsider Ex Parte Order Granting Motion for Rule 2004 Exam of Bitvestment Partners, LLC and for Production of Documents.. Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Order on Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte ORDER Granting Debtor's Motion for 2004 Examination of Bitvestment Partners LLC and for Production of Documents (Related Doc # 59) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) . (VAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/06/13 9:30 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/06/13 9:30 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/06/13 9:30 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Glynn Levin, Deirdre. Related document [59]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/19/2013 Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Debtor's Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of Bitvestment Partners, LLC.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Monthly Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Financial Report for the period of November 2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken on Date of Hearing: 12/20/13. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of United States Trustee. (Related document(s)57 UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 Case). (Buford, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken on Date of Hearing: 12/20/13. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of United States Trustee. (Related document(s)57 UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 Case). (Buford, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Court Motion Withdrawn, Hearing Stricken on Date of Hearing: 12/20/13. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of United States Trustee. (Related document(s)57 UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 Case). (Buford, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None UST Motion to Dismiss Ch 11 CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            US Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause or Convert Case. Notice period provided by Local Bankruptcy Rule 2015-1(c)... Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of United States Trustee The Hearing date is set for 12/20/2013 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. Response due by 12/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Tara Maurer # 2 Proposed Order) (Buford, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Order on Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Authorizing Rule 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 52) . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Waiving Case Management Conference and Setting Deadlines (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Assume or Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying Debtor's Motion to Reject Executory Contract with Bitvestment Partners LLC (Related Doc # 12) . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Simonyan, Tereza. Related document [52]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/12/2013 Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application for FRBP 2004 Examination .. Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Simonyan, Tereza. Related document [12]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Deirdre Glynn Levin for the debtor, Wendy Wallace, Tereza Simonyan for Bitvestment Partners. Motion denied as to Bitvestments, continued as to Soule Investments. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) Continued Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Deirdre Glynn Levin for the debtor, Wendy Wallace, Tereza Simonyan for Bitvestment Partners. Motion denied as to Bitvestments, continued as to Soule Investments. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) Continued Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Deirdre Glynn Levin for the debtor, Wendy Wallace, Tereza Simonyan for Bitvestment Partners. Motion denied as to Bitvestments, continued as to Soule Investments. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) Continued Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2014 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Deifre Glynn Levin fro the debtor, Wendy Wallace, Tereza Simonyan for Bitvestment Partners. Motion denied, order to be entered. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Deifre Glynn Levin fro the debtor, Wendy Wallace, Tereza Simonyan for Bitvestment Partners. Motion denied, order to be entered. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Minutes Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes. Hearing Held. Appearances: Deifre Glynn Levin fro the debtor, Wendy Wallace, Tereza Simonyan for Bitvestment Partners. Motion denied, order to be entered. (related document(s): [12] Motion to Assume or Reject filed by CLI Holdings Inc) (MJB )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Debtor's Reply (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Declaration of Peter Vessenes (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, 13 Declaration, 22 Declaration)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)37 Order Re Motion for Order Fixing Last Date to File Proof of Claim). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/03/13 at 11:00 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/03/13 at 11:00 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/03/13 at 11:00 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Audio CD Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Audio CD Request. Hearing Date and Time: 12/03/13 at 11:00 am... Requested by: Lane Powell.. . (Transcriber - Strehlo, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  US Trustees Statement Re Inability to Appoint Committee of Unsecured Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  An order for relief in this case was entered under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code. Despite efforts to contact eligible unsecured creditors, as of this date, the United States Trustee has not received a sufficient number of creditors willing to serve on a committee of unsecured creditors. (See,11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(b)(1)). Accordingly, the United States Trustee is unable to appoint a committee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(a). Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  US Trustees Statement Re Inability to Appoint Committee of Unsecured Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    An order for relief in this case was entered under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code. Despite efforts to contact eligible unsecured creditors, as of this date, the United States Trustee has not received a sufficient number of creditors willing to serve on a committee of unsecured creditors. (See,11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(b)(1)). Accordingly, the United States Trustee is unable to appoint a committee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(a). Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  US Trustees Statement Re Inability to Appoint Committee of Unsecured Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      An order for relief in this case was entered under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code. Despite efforts to contact eligible unsecured creditors, as of this date, the United States Trustee has not received a sufficient number of creditors willing to serve on a committee of unsecured creditors. (See,11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(b)(1)). Accordingly, the United States Trustee is unable to appoint a committee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(a). Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  US Trustees Statement Re Inability to Appoint Committee of Unsecured Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        An order for relief in this case was entered under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code. Despite efforts to contact eligible unsecured creditors, as of this date, the United States Trustee has not received a sufficient number of creditors willing to serve on a committee of unsecured creditors. (See,11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(b)(1)). Accordingly, the United States Trustee is unable to appoint a committee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec.1102(a). Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  US Trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors as concluded. Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  US Trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors as concluded. Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  US Trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors as concluded. Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  US Trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors as concluded. Filed by United States Trustee. (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Adequate Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adequate Filing . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Adequate Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adequate Filing . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Adequate Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adequate Filing . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Adequate Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adequate Filing . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Court of Intent to Argue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 12/6/2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, 14 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Court of Intent to Argue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 12/6/2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, 14 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Court of Intent to Argue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 12/6/2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, 14 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Court of Intent to Argue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 12/6/2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, 14 Hearing Notice). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: 11/29/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Bryan I. Reyhani in Support of Bitvestment Partners LLC Objection to Motion to Reject Executory Contracts (Related document(s)45 Objection)... Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: 11/29/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Daniel H. Gallancy (Related document(s)45 Objection)... Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: 11/29/2013 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Debtor's Motion to Reject Executory Contracts (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject)... Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of John Zwick in Support of Soule Investments' Objection to Motion to Reject Executory Contracts (Related document(s)43 Objection)... Filed by Robert N. Amkraut on behalf of Soule Investments, LLC. (Amkraut, Robert). Related document(s) 12 Motion to Reject Leases or Executory Contracts for EXECUTORY CONTRACTS of Christopher Koss, Robert F. Seidensticker III, Brian Cartmell, Barry Silbert, Soule Investments LLC, Dalsa Barbour LLC, Joel Yarmon, Sunshine Network Limited, the Timothy Drap filed by Debtor CLI Holdings Inc. Modified on 12/9/2013 to create link to motion. (Birkland, Judy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Debtors' Motion to Reject Executory Contracts (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject)... Filed by Robert N. Amkraut on behalf of Soule Investments, LLC. (Amkraut, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Papers Filed by Robert N. Amkraut on behalf of Soule Investments, LLC. (Amkraut, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Application. Employment of Bryan I Reyhani (Related Doc 35) . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Special Notice and Notice of Appearance. Filed by Tereza Simonyan on behalf of Bitvestment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Simonyan, Tereza)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Balance of Schedules
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Debtor's Balance of Schedules Modified Schedules I and J (combined). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Amended Matrix(13-19746-KAO) ( 30.00). Receipt number 18620473. Fee amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt of filing fee for Amended Matrix(13-19746-KAO) ( 30.00). Receipt number 18620473. Fee amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Amended Matrix(13-19746-KAO) ( 30.00). Receipt number 18620473. Fee amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt of filing fee for Amended Matrix(13-19746-KAO) ( 30.00). Receipt number 18620473. Fee amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Create Fee Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fee Due Amended Matrix $ 30 for matrix uploaded/added 17 creditors on 11/26/2013 (Related document(s)19 Non public document SSN). (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Create Fee Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Due Amended Matrix $ 30 for matrix uploaded/added 17 creditors on 11/26/2013 (Related document(s)19 Non public document SSN). (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Create Fee Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee Due Amended Matrix $ 30 for matrix uploaded/added 17 creditors on 11/26/2013 (Related document(s)19 Non public document SSN). (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Create Fee Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fee Due Amended Matrix $ 30 for matrix uploaded/added 17 creditors on 11/26/2013 (Related document(s)19 Non public document SSN). (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Supplemental Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Filing of Request for Special Notice and Notice of Appearance. Filed by Charles R Ekberg on behalf of Bitvesment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Related document(s)31 Request for Special Notice). (Ekberg, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Order re: Motion for Order Fixing Last Date to File Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Motion Setting Claims Bar Date (Related Doc # 28) Proof of Claims due by 12/31/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Ekberg, Charles. Related document [35]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013, Terminated: 11/27/2013 Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice Application .. Filed by Charles R Ekberg on behalf of Bitvesment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Ekberg, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Creditors Uploaded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Creditor matrix uploaded/added 17 creditor(s). (admin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Creditors Uploaded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Creditor matrix uploaded/added 17 creditor(s). (admin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Creditors Uploaded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Creditor matrix uploaded/added 17 creditor(s). (admin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Creditors Uploaded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Creditor matrix uploaded/added 17 creditor(s). (admin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Pro Hac Vice Application(13-19746-KAO) [motion,1990] ( 150.00). Receipt number 18614160. Fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt of filing fee for Pro Hac Vice Application(13-19746-KAO) [motion,1990] ( 150.00). Receipt number 18614160. Fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Pro Hac Vice Application(13-19746-KAO) [motion,1990] ( 150.00). Receipt number 18614160. Fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt of filing fee for Pro Hac Vice Application(13-19746-KAO) [motion,1990] ( 150.00). Receipt number 18614160. Fee amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Glynn Levin, Deirdre. Related document [28]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Submitted But Not Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted But Not Entered (Related document(s)30 Received UNSIGNED Order). (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Order re: Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Application by Debtor to Employ Keller Rohrback LLP (Related Doc # 25) . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Special Notice and Notice of Appearance. Filed by Charles R Ekberg on behalf of Bitvesment Partners LLC f/k/a Dalsa Barbour LLC. (Ekberg, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Glynn Levin, Deirdre. Related document [28]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Glynn Levin, Deirdre. Related document [25]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013, Terminated: 11/26/2013 Motion for Order Fixing Last Date to File Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Order Fixing Last Date to File Proof of Claim Ex Parte.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Declaration of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of No Objection (Related document(s)25 Application to Employ)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Declaration of Deidre Glynn Levin (Related document(s)25 Application to Employ)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013, Terminated: 11/25/2013 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application to Employ Keller Rohrback L.L.P. and Deirdre Glynn Levin as Attorneys for Debtor.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)20 Order Vacating Order of Dismissal). Notice Date 11/21/2013. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)22 Declaration). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Declaration of Peter Vessenes (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, 13 Declaration)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E # 2 Exhibit K) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)17 Order Dismissing Case). Notice Date 11/20/2013. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Order Vacating Order of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Vacating Order of Dismissal for Debtor (Related document(s)17 Order Dismissing Case). (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Non public document SSN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtor's Social Security Number(s) of Debtor(s) Submitted. PDF only viewable by court. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Notice of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Dismissal. Sent to the BNC for mailing to all creditors . (SYL) Modified on 11/18/2013 deleted BNC notice. SSN stmt filed (Luu, Suying).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/19/2013 Order Dismissing Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Dismissing Case. Case Can Close: 12/9/2013. (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof of Service . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)5 341 Meeting of Creditors Sent to BNC for Mailing). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject, 13 Declaration, 14 Hearing Notice). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Hearing Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject). Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Peter Vessenes (Related document(s)12 Motion to Assume or Reject)... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013, Terminated: 12/12/2013 Motion to Assume or RejectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Reject Leases or Executory Contracts for EXECUTORY CONTRACTS of Christopher Koss, Robert F. Seidensticker III, Brian Cartmell, Barry Silbert, Soule Investments LLC, Dalsa Barbour LLC, Joel Yarmon, Sunshine Network Limited, the Timothy Draper Living Trust, Jon Chin, and Peter Vessenes with Notice of Hearing... Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc The Hearing date is set for 12/6/2013 at 09:30 AM at Judge Overstreet's Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, Room 7206. Response due by 11/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A to Order) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Statement of Financial Affairs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Balance of Schedules , Statement of Financial Affairs . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre) Modified on 11/18/2013 MISSING Schedules I & J (Luu, Suying).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Statement of Financial Affairs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Balance of Schedules , Statement of Financial Affairs . Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc. (Related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition). (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Order Re Motion to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Motion for Order Changing Caption to Correct DBA (Related Doc # 8) . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Received UNSIGNED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by Glynn Levin, Deirdre. Related document [8]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013, Terminated: 11/14/2013 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Motion for Order Changing Caption to Correct DBA.. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)2 Notice of Deficient Filing). Notice Date 11/06/2013. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (Related document(s)5 341 Meeting of Creditors Sent to BNC for Mailing). Notice Date 11/06/2013. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 341 Meeting of Creditors Sent to BNC for Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Sent to BNC for Mailing . (SYL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 UST Meeting Business Chapter 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Meeting of Creditors Business Filed by United States Trustee. With 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/3/2013 at 11:00 AM at US Courthouse, Room 4107 (341 Meetings). (UST Staff - Gunter, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of United States Trustee. (Buford, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Deficient Filing . (EMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/15/2013. Schedules A-J due 11/15/2013. Schedules and Statements must be filed on Revised Forms. Due 11/15/2013. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 11/15/2013. Summary of schedules due 11/15/2013. Incomplete Filings due by 11/15/2013. Filed by Deirdre Glynn Levin on behalf of CLI Holdings, Inc. dba Alydian, Inc. (Glynn Levin, Deirdre)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (13-19746) [misc,1032] (1213.00). Receipt number 18498443. Fee amount $1213.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (13-19746) [misc,1032] (1213.00). Receipt number 18498443. Fee amount $1213.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (13-19746) [misc,1032] (1213.00). Receipt number 18498443. Fee amount $1213.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Receipt of Filng Fee Automatic docket of credit card payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (13-19746) [misc,1032] (1213.00). Receipt number 18498443. Fee amount $1213.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,607 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?