Roman v. Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-09297
District Judge Ronnie Abrams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 16, 2018 at 10:49 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Antonio Roman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Antonio Roman
v.
No Logo Lt. James Cosgrove, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 788 0422 +1 212 788 9776 mkunz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthw C. Browndorf, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rudyard W Ceres +1 917 576 0498 +1 212 788 9776 rceres@whbllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Gainfort Moe +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 amoe@law.nyc.gov
No Logo PO Gavin, Defendant
No Logo PO Laporte, Defendant
No Logo PO Sharpe, Defendant
No Logo PO Adam Landau, Defendant
No Logo POF Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo POF Shanay Boone, Defendant
No Logo Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Scarizzini, Defendant
No Logo Sgt. Kevin Grayson, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Shanay Boone, James Cosgrove, Gavin, Kevin Grayson, Adam Landau, Laporte, Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York, Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department, Scarizzini, Sharpe, Sullivan. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Local Rule 56.1 Statement)(Moe, Alison) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Alison G. Moe in Support re: 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Shanay Boone, James Cosgrove, Gavin, Kevin Grayson, Adam Landau, Laporte, Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York, Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department, Scarizzini, Sharpe, Sullivan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O-1, # 16 Exhibit 0-2, # 17 Supplement Local Rule 51.2 notice, # 18 Affidavit of service by mail)(Moe, Alison) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Shanay Boone, James Cosgrove, Gavin, Kevin Grayson, Adam Landau, Laporte, Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York, Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department, Scarizzini, Sharpe, Sullivan. Responses due by 11/8/2013(Moe, Alison) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER: Accordingly, the Court will extend discovery until September 6, 2013 so that Defendants may prepare responses to the nine sets of interrogatories that are directed to parties to this litigation. Defense counsel need not respond to the seven sets of interrogatories directed to non-parties. Finally, following the conclusion of fact discovery on September 6, Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment by October 4, 2013. Roman shall file his response to the motion by November 8, 2013 and defendants will have until November 25, 2013 to file any reply papers. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery due by 9/6/2013., Motions due by 10/4/2013., Responses due by 11/8/2013, Replies due by 11/25/2013.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 7/22/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: Fact discovery is extended until July 23,2013. There will be no further extensions. The Court grants defendants permission to continue plaintiffs deposition by video conference on June 6 and has signed a separate order to that effect. The Court grants defendants permission to reserve their right to conduct expert discovery until after their anticipated motion for summary judgment is resolved. The Court denies defendants' request that plaintiff be directed to answer questions regarding his relationship with an individual he identified as "Carlos" during his deposition on May 23rd, without prejudice to renewal if the relevant excerpts of the transcript are provided to the Court for review and a more substantial justification for the information sought is established (as well as the fact that the information cannot be obtained from other sources, such as from plaintiffs criminal case). Accordingly, should plaintiff wish to take discovery of the officers he identified in his May 7th submission to the Court, he must do so by sending specific questions for specific officers to defense counsel, and do so no later than June 24th in order to allow for responses to be provided before the fact discovery period is concluded. SO ORDERED. ( Fact Discovery due by 7/23/2013.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/28/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) Modified on 6/3/2013 (ama). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) the Warden or other official in charge of Federal Correction Institution McKean produce inmate Antonio Roman, Inmate No. 51745-045, for the taking or his deposition by defendants' attorney via video conference link with Diamond Reporting on Thursday, June 6, 2013, commencing at 10:00 A.M., until completion, or in the alternative, at a date and time prior to the completion of discovery; and (2) that inmate Antonio Roman appear in such place as designated by the Warden or other official in charge of Federal Correction Institution McKean so that his deposition may be taken. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/28/2013) (ama) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SUBPOENAS AND DEPOSITIONS. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (ama) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sullivan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Moe, Alison) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: Accordingly, the parties are directed to meet and confer at Roman's deposition on May 23 and Defendants shall provide a status update to the Court, by letter, no later than May 28,2013. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/17/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Sullivan served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. Service was accepted by SPAA Neely. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (ft) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) the Warden or other official in charge of Federal Correction Institution McKean produce inmate Antonio Roman, Inmate No. 51745-045, for the taking of his deposition by defendants' attorney via video conference link with Diamond Reporting on Thursday May 23, 2013, commencing at 10:00 A.M., until completion, or in the alternative, at a date and time prior to the completion of discovery; and (2) that inmate Antonio Roman appear in such place as designated by the Warden or other official in charge of Federal Correction Institution McKean so that his deposition may be taken. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/13/2013) (ama) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMO ENDORSED ON ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Alison G. Moe dated 3/22/2013 re: Counsel for defendant request that the Court unseal the transcript of Plaintiff's July 13, 2011 hearing before Judge Rakoff in a related criminal case. ENDORSEMENT: the transcript is ordered to be unsealed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/8/2013) (js) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Moe, Alison) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Alison G. Moe dated 3/22/2013 re: I am an Assistant Corporation Counsel at the New York City Law Department, and I am assigned to the defense of the above-referenced matter. Defendants Bloomberg, Kelly, Boone, Grayson, Landau, Scarazzini, Laporte, and Sharpe ("City defendants") write to request that the Court unseal the transcript of Plaintiffs July l3, 2011 sentencing hearing before Judge Rakoff in a related criminal case. ENDORSEMENT: The application to unseal the transcript of Roman's July 13, 2011 sentencing hearing before Judge Rakoff is denied without prejudice. Defendants are directed to apply to Judge Rakoff directly for the relief sought, as he is in the best position to assess the various interests at stake, including any privacy interests of Roman or of any third parties, because he sealed the transcript. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 4/02/2013) (ama) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Gavin served on 3/18/2013, answer due 4/8/2013. Service was accepted by Lt. Murray. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Morgan D. Kunz dated 2/25/2013 re: Therefore, this office respectfully requests that the Court extend the date upon which discovery closes from March 5, 2013 to June 5, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: The date for the close of discovery is extended to May 24, 2013. No further Extensions. SO ORDERED., ( Discovery due by 5/24/2013.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/26/2013) (ama) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                    PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORIES & REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (sc) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: In a motion dated January 9, 2013, pro se Plaintiff Antonio Roman requests an extension of time to answer the defendants' interrogatories. Roman states that he only learned of the deadline when he received a letter from defense counsel on January 7, 2013. In accordance with Roman's request, the extension is granted and Roman may have until January 17, 2013, to respond to defendants' interrogatories. The Clerk is directed to close docket number 51. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/17/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers (djc) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORIES. Document filed by Antonio Roman.(sc) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Summons, along with the second amended complaint (see Dkt. No. 9) in this action and to prepare and forward the necessary papers to the United States Marshal for service of the Summons and Complaint upon the following Defendants: Officer Christian Sullivan and Officer Dawn Gavin. The Clerk is further directed to deliver the summons, second amended complaint, and all other necessary documents to the United States Marshals Service so that service may be completed as quickly as possible. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/7/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint. Gavin served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013; Sullivan served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (cd) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE to Answer. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Antonio Roman dated 11/28/2012 re: Plaintiff Pro Se requests an extension to answer counsel Michael A. Cardozo 's First and Second Interrogatories request documents as well some names of agencies Plaintiff does not have at this time. ENDORSEMENT: The request is Granted. Plaintiff shall respond to interrogatories and document requests by January 8, 2013. In the future, Plaintiff must send a copy of all correspondence with the Court to opposing counsel. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 12/14/2012) (js) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by James Cosgrove. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Kunz, Morgan) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James Cosgrove waiver sent on 11/23/2012, answer due 1/22/2013. Document filed by James Cosgrove. (Kunz, Morgan) (Entered: 11/23/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER: Plaintiff Antonio Roman ("Roman") has applied for appointment of counsel in anapplication dated October 23, 2012 (to be docketed). The application is denied at this time without prejudice to renewal.Plaintiff should work with the Pro Se Office of the Court for any additional help that heneeds, and should also continue to seek to obtain private counsel. The Pro Se Office may be contacted at: ProSe Office, United States District Court, S.D.N.Y., 500 Pearl St, New York, N.Y. 10007, 212-805-0175 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 11/14/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ago) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Morgan D. Kunz dated 11/9/2012 re: Defense counsel writes to request that Defendants be granted until November 13, 2012, nunc pro tunc, to produce the CCRB file to Plaintiff and to serve the initial discovery and they defendants be granted until November 23, 2012 to attempt to arrange for Defendant Cosgrove to waive service. ENDORSEMENT: These requests are GRANTED. Plaintiffs to notify counsel for defendants by letter (with a copy to the Court) no lather than December 14, 2012 whether he wishes to proceed against officers Sullivan and Gavin. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 11/14/2012) (ago) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                          APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Antonio Roman.(ago) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: At a Rule 16 conference today held by telephone, the Court set the following schedule: 1. Defense counsel plan to seek authorization to represent three of the defendants who remain unserved: retired Lieutenant Cosgrove, Officer Boone and Officer Sullivan. Defense counsel will notify Mr. Roman and the Court by letter dated on or before November 9, 2012, as to whether defense counsel will be representing these defendants and waiving service on their behalf. (Defense counsel will not seek authorization to represent Defendant Gavin because neither counsel nor Mr. Roman have been able to identify him.) 2. Defense counsel will produce the CCRB file to Mr. Roman no later than October 31, 2012. Defense counsel will also send Mr. Roman their discovery requests and medical releases by that date. Mr. Roman should respond to these requests and releases as soon as possible to avoid any further delays in this case. 3. All fact and e)(pert discovery is to be completed no later than March 15, 2013 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 10/17/2012) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morgan David Kunz on behalf of Shanay Boone, Kevin Grayson, Adam Landau, Laporte, Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York, Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department, Scarizzini, Sharpe (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Kunz, Morgan) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: Initial Conference set for 10/17/2012 at 10:30 AM in Room 1360, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Counsel for defendants is to arrange for plaintiff Roman to appear telephonically by calling chambers (212-805-0250) at the scheduled time. In addition to discussing a discovery schedule, the parties should be prepared to discuss settlement as well. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 10/2/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Shanay Boone, Kevin Grayson, Adam Landau, Laporte, Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York, Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department, Scarizzini, Sharpe.(Ceres, Rudyard) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER: As you may be aware, this case has been reassigned to my docket. All current schedules and orders remain in effect, including referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Cott for all general pretrial proceedings. The parties are directed to familiarize themselves with the Court's applicable Individual Rules and Practices, including the Court's Special Rules and Practices in Civil Pro Se Cases, (available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Abrams) regarding communications with Chambers and other matters. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/19/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Paul A. Engelmayer is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) Modified on 8/15/2012 (gp). (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter dated June 29, 2012 from Assistant Corporation Counsel Rudyard W. Ceres which seeks to keep the current stay in place until October 1, 2012, and provides an update concerning the status of the Civilian Complaint Review Board ("CCRB") investigation of the incident giving rise to this lawsuit. The Court will sua sponte continue the stay of this action, but only until September 7, 2012, and it will not extend the stay beyond that date. even if the CCRB investigation has not been completed by that time. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 6/29/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl) Modified on 7/2/2012 (pl). (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz no longer referred to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (pgu) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              STANDING ORDER (M10-468): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (1) effective June 1, 2012, the Clerk of Court shall designate all civil pro se cases to Electronic Case Filing (ECF) database, and (2) all previously pending civil pro se cases shall be designated as ECF cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that: The Clerk of Court shall docket a copy of this Order in all pending civil pro se cases which shall be designated ECF. Unless ordered by the Court, documents filed by pro se litigants (who are not members of the bar and who do not have an active ECF account) will continue to be filed in the traditional manner on paper and will be scanned and docketed by the Clerk's Office staff into the ECF system. The filings shall be deemed filed on the date the documents are received by the Clerk' Office. Attorneys appearing as counsel for plaintiff (s) or defendant (s) in pro se cases shall file their pleading (s) using the ECF system. Counsel must attached an affirmation/affidavit of service to each pleading indicating the pro se party was served with a paper copy of the pleading. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/11/12) (jw) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Rudyard W. Ceres dated 4/9/2012 re: Counsel for the defendants request that the Court continue its stay of this action; and, that a further status report is provided on or by June 29, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 4/11/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Rudyard W. Ceras dated 2/10/12 re: Counsel for the City defendants requests that the Court continue its stay of this action and that a further status report be provided on or by 4/9/12. ENDORSEMENT: The stay of this action continues. Defendants' counsel shall submit a status report on or before April 9, 2012. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 2/14/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated December 13, 2011 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Antonio Roman. New Address: Reg# 51745-054, F.C.I. McKean, P.O. Box 8000, Bradford, PA, 16701. (arc) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge P. Kevin Castel is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated September 12, 2011 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Antonio Roman. New Address: Reg# 51745-054, M.D.C., P.O. Box 329002, Brooklyn, New York, 11232. (arc) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Rudyard W. Ceres dated 9/6/2011 re: Counsel for defendants requests that the Court stay this matter in its entirety, until the CCRB and IAB investigations into the incident alleged in the complaint are completed and that the time for defendants' to respond to the complaint be enlarged until threeweeks after such a stay is lifted. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's counsel is to promptly advise the Court when the investigations are completed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 9/12/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York served on 7/27/2011, answer due 8/17/2011. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Arnov (Service Window Clerk). (js) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department served on 7/27/2011, answer due 8/17/2011. 6/6/11 Sent out for mail/service, no response. 7/20/11 Set up for Per/Service. (js) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Kevin Grayson served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011. 6/6/11 Sent out for mail service, no response. 7/20/11 Set up for Per/Service (js) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Scarizzini served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011.6/6/11 Sent out for mail service, no response. 7/20/2011 Set up for Per/Service (js) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Shanay Boone. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 7/25/11. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Sharpe served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011. Service was accepted by SPAA Nango. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Laporte served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011. Service was accepted by SPAA Nino. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Gavin. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 7/25/11. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Adam Landau served on 7/25/2011, answer due 8/15/2011. Service was accepted by SPAA Nino. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to James Cosgrove. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 6/23/2011. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (lmb) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Rudyard W. Ceres dated 7/5/11 re: counsel for City Defendants Mayor Bloomberg and Police Commissioner Kelly (sued herein as "Police Commissioner Kelley") (collectively, the "City Defendants")respectfully request a 60-day extension of the City Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, from July 6, 2011 to September 6, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: The City Defendants time to respond to the Complaint is extended to September 6, 2011. Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York answer due 9/6/2011; Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department answer due 9/6/2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 7/6/11) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER OF SERVICE The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Summons in this action, and Plaintiff is directed to serve the Summons and Second Amended Complaint upon each Defendant within 120 days of the issuance of the Summons. If service has not been made within the 120 days, and Plaintiff has not requested an extension of time to serve within that 120 days, the action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/13/11) (jmi) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/13/11) (jmi) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Loretta A. Preska is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 7 30/60 Days Amended Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Antonio Roman. Related document: 7 30/60 Days Amended Complaint filed by Antonio Roman.(mbe) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER TO AMEND: The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a Second Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order as detailed below. Plaintiff is directed to file a Second Amended Complaint containing the informationspecified above. The Second Amended Complaint must be submitted to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, be captioned as a "SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT," and bear the same docket number as this Order. A Second Amended Civil Rights Complaint form, which Plaintiff should complete as specified above, is attached to this Order. No summons will issue at this time. Once submitted, the Second Amended Complaint will be reviewed for substantive sufficiency, and then, if proper, the case will be reassigned to a district judge in accordance with the procedures of the Clerk's Office. If the case is reassigned, a copy of this Order will be served with the Summons and SecondAmended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the action will be dismissed.The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/3/2011) (mbe) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending 2 PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint.Document filed by Antonio Roman. Related document: 2 PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint.(mbe) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1 Motion: Leave to proceed in this Court without payment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/8/2011) (mbe) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                PRISONER AUTHORIZATION signed by Antonio Roman on 2/2/11. Document filed by Antonio Roman. (mro) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 2/24/2011. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/25/11) (Attachments: # 1 PLRA Prisoner Authorization Form) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (khs) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Pro Se Acknowledgment Letter Mailed: Pro Se acknowledgment letter mailed to the plaintiff via USPS to the address noted on the Complaint on 12/17/2010. (msa) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Shanay Boone, James Cosgrove, Gavin, Kevin Grayson, Adam Landau, Laporte, Mayor Bloomberg for the City of New York, Persons Unknown, Police Commissioner Kelly for the New York Police Department, Scarizzini, Sharpe, Sullivan. Reply required under Prison Litigation Reform Act Section 7(2)(g)(2)..Document filed by Anthonio Roman.(mro) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Document filed by Anthonio Roman.(mro) (msa). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?