Janet Sobel, et al v. Hertz Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-17056

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 6:21 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009025823976 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
Filed order MEDIATION (CLR):A dial-in telephonic conference will be held on April 2, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as an attachment to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Program immediately at ca09_mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. [9003346] [13-17056, 13-17186] (KM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009025534223 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
    Filed order MEDIATION (LW): Case referred to Mediation for assessment conference only. TThe court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time listed above with counsel to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is VACATED. The following briefing schedule shall govern this appeal: The first cross-appeal brief is due February 28, 2014 (Hertz); the second cross-appeal brief is due March 31, 2014 (Sobel, et al.); the third cross-appeal brief is due April 30, 2014 (Hertz); any optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief. [see complete order] [8877084] [13-17056, 13-17186] (KM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DMA): Appellees’ motion to dismiss this appeal is referred to the panel assigned to decide the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate. Principal briefing is completed. The reply brief is now due 14 days from the date of this order. [9235570] (WL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Appellant Hertz Corporation citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/20/2014. [9212194] (RBB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel reply to response (, ,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 08/14/2014. [9205881] (GDR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellant Hertz Corporation response to motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 08/07/2014. [9197899] (RBB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
              Filed clerk order: The answering brief [40] submitted by Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [40] submitted by Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9185147] (TLH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 07/28/2014. [9184460] (GDR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed order MEDIATION (CLR): The following briefing schedule shall govern this appeal: Appellant’s opening brief is due May 27, 2014; Appellees’ answering brief is due June 26, 2014; Appellant’s optional reply brief is due July 16, 2014.[9075921] (KM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed order MEDIATION (CLR): The existing briefing schedule is VACATED. [9071453] (KM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed order MEDIATION (CLR): The in-person mediation conference previously scheduled for March 4, 2014, is rescheduled to April 23, 2014. (The starting time and location remain unchanged.) Counsel and clients shall be available for a continued session on April 25, 2014, if warranted. In all other respects, this court's previous order governing the conduct of the mediation dated February 3, 2014, remains in effect. [9013098] (KM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed order MEDIATION (CLR): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is reset as follows: Appellant’s opening brief is due April 4, 2014; Appellees’ answering brief is due May 1, 2014; Appellant’s optional reply brief is due May 29, 2014. [8967585]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached order. Resent NDA. 02/10/2014 by RY] (KM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                          Filed order MEDIATION (CLR): An in-person mediation conference will be held on March 4, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time, at the U.S. Court of Appeals in Pasadena, 125 So. Grand Avenue, Pasadena, California 91105. Mediation statements of no more than 12 pages (excluding exhibits, which may not exceed an additional 18 pages) shall be submitted by telefax or email to the Circuit Mediator [fax no. (415) 355-8566 or lew_ross@ca9.uscourts.gov] on or before February 24, 2014. Mediation statements shall not be filed with the court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [8962609] (SB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael T. Brody for Appellant Hertz Corporation. Date of service: 01/30/2014. [8959075] (MTB)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ross B. Bricker for Appellant Hertz Corporation. Date of service: 01/29/2014. [8958413] (RBB)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                Filed order (Deputy Clerk: AT) Appellants’ motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [8921176] (BJB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Daniel Dugan, Lydia Lee and Janet Sobel in 13-17186 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 12/23/2013. [8913755] [13-17186, 13-17056] (GDR)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellant’s motion for expedition is denied. The briefing schedule is unchanged. [8912842] [13-17056, 13-17186] (WL)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Hertz Corporation Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 11/27/2013. [8881347]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to 13-17186, resent notice. 12/02/2013 by ASW] (WEP)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel in 13-17186 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/04/2013. [8848370] [13-17186, 13-17056] (GDR)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                          DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/04/2013. First cross appeal brief due 01/21/2014 for Hertz Corporation. Second brief on cross appeal due 02/18/2014 for Daniel Dugan, Lydia Lee, NSHE, Mark Singer and Janet Sobel. Third brief on cross appeal due 03/18/2014 for Hertz Corporation. Optional cross appeal reply brief for Daniel Dugan, et al. is due within 14 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [8838895] [13-17186, 13-17056] (RT)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard D. Williamson for Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel. Date of service: 10/23/2013. [8833495] (RDW)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Hertz Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/22/2013. [8832137] (WEP)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of G. David Robertson for Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel. Date of service: 10/16/2013. [8823494] (GDR)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Arthur Stock for Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel. Date of service: 10/16/2013. [8822339] (AS)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/22/2013. Transcript ordered by 11/12/2013. Transcript due 12/10/2013. Appellant Hertz Corporation opening brief due 01/21/2014. Appellees Daniel Dugan, Lydia Lee, NSHE, Mark Singer and Janet Sobel answering brief due 02/18/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8821000] (IV)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?