Lindsay Jenkins v. John Kerry, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-5134

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 5:09 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 1470 - Civil (RICO)
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207543678 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
MOTION filed [STYLED AS "MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND TO REINSTATE APPEAL WITH NEW CANENDAR DATES"] [1464623] by. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/15/2013) [Service Date: 10/31/2013 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [13-5134]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207539913 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1462590] considering Clerk order to show cause [1454506-4], dismissing case for lack of prosecution, withholding issuance of the mandate. [13-5134]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207530004 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
      CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1456890] RECEIVED from L. Jenkins [signed for on 09/07/2013] for order [1454520-2] sent to Appellant Lindsay Jenkins [13-5134]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207525786 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1454506] to show cause regarding Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [1442297-2]and motion for summary affirmance [1449979-2], Response to Order due 10/03/2013. Response may not exceed 20 pages. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [13-5134]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207517891 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION filed [1449979] by Eric H. Holder, Jr. and John F. Kerry for summary affirmance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/19/2013) [Service Date: 08/05/2013 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [13-5134] (Haque, Sobia)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207514155 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1447732] by Lucy Chernow Brown, Fred A. Hazouri, Glenn Kelley, Melanie G. May and Mark E. Polen [Service Date: 07/22/2013 ] [13-5134] (Fahlbusch, Charles)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207514145 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1447728] by Charles M. Fahlbusch on behalf of Appellees Lucy Chernow Brown, Fred A. Hazouri, Glenn Kelley, Melanie G. May and Mark E. Polen. [13-5134] (Fahlbusch, Charles)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 98 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?