USA v. Maggiore
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-02185-H

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 10:29 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Nicholas Patrick Maggiore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by san.rr.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn L Oliver +1 858 456 3572 +1 858 536 5903 coliver1@san.rr.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 6/30/2008
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
308-mj-01697-LSP
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) - Bank Robbery
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore :Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Objection must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 07/22/08. (ag)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Plea Agreement
    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore (ag)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Consent to PleaCourt Filing
      CONSENT TO PLEA before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas by Nicholas Patrick Maggiore. (ag)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Change of Plea Hearing as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore held on 7/22/2008. Plea Agreement filed. Presentence Report Ordered. Guilty Plea tendered by Nicholas Patrick Maggiore on counts 1 of Information. Excludable(s) started as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore: XK Proposed Plea Agreement and XT1 Interest of Justice - Tendered a Guilty Plea started 07/22/08 until 10/06/08. Pending Hearing vacated except for Sentencing Hearing. Accept Plea with P.O. Report set for 10/6/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (Tape #LSP08-1:10:08-10:54).(Attorney Dominic Kardum, AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Carolyn L Oliver, CJA). (gac)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Change of Plea Hearing as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore not held on 7/15/2008. Change of Plea Hearing continued to 7/22/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 8/25/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (Tape #LSP08-10:01-10:02).(Plaintiff Attorney Tara McGrath AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Carolyn Oliver CJA). (jmj)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Waiver of Indictment
            WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Nicholas Patrick Maggiore (jmj)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Arraignment on Information as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore (1) Count 1 held on 6/30/2008. Not Guilty plea entered. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/15/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas. (Tape #LSP08-13:28-13:47).(Plaintiff Attorney Greg Noonan AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Carolyn Oliver CJA). (jmj)
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Information - Felony
                INFORMATION as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore (1) count(s) 1. (jmj) (mam).
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Preliminary HearingCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Preliminary Hearing as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore not held on 6/17/2008. Preliminary Hearing continued to 6/30/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas. (Tape #LSP08-9:50-9:54).(Plaintiff Attorney Greg Noonan AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Michael Littman S/A CJA). (jmj)[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                    Findings of Fact and ORDER OF DETENTION re waiver of detention pending trial as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 6/10/08. (jjh)[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order on Motion to DetainCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas: Detention Hearing as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore not held on 6/10/2008. USA oral motion for detention. Motion found as moot as to Defendant Nicholas Patrick Maggiore. Defendant stipulates to detention pending trial without prejudice. Order Filed. (Tape #LSP08-10:01-10:04.)(Plaintiff Attorney Greg Noonan AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Carolyn Oliver CJA). (jmj)[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/4/2008 in case as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore. (kmm)[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Detention Hearing as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore not held on 6/6/2008. Detention Hearing continued to 6/10/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas. (Tape #LSP08-9:43-9:45).(Plaintiff Attorney Greg Noonan AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Carolyn Oliver CJA). (jmj)[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Motion to Detain
                            ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore (flight) (jmp) (mam).[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas:Initial Appearance on complaint as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore held on 6/4/2008, attorney Carolyn L Oliver (n/a) appointed for Nicholas Patrick Maggiore., Bond set as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore (1) No Bail, Govt oral motion for detention (flight)( Detention Hearing set for 6/6/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas., Preliminary Hearing set for 6/17/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas.) (Tape #LSP08-13:57-14:14).(Plaintiff Attorney Greg Noonan AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Sarah Peloquin FD S/A). (jmp)(mam).[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Arrest
                                Arrest of Nicholas Patrick Maggiore on 6/4/08 (jmp)[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                  ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler in case as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore. (kmm)[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT as to Nicholas Patrick Maggiore (1). (ecl) (mam).[3:08-mj-01697-LSP]
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?