DC v. William Vinyard, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-7167

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 3:36 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207557956 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1472546] granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [1471787-2], issuing mandate [13-7167]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207556595 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION filed [1471787] by DC to dismiss case voluntarily (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/02/2014) [Service Date: 12/20/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207552877 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION filed [1469639] by Laura Vinyard and William Vinyard to dismiss case as moot (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/23/2013) [Service Date: 12/09/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [13-7167] (Gruber, Brian)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207552868 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1469636] by Jennifer A. Semko on behalf of Appellees Laura Vinyard and William Vinyard. [13-7167] (Gruber, Brian)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548701 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1467508] by Laura Vinyard and William Vinyard [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ] [13-7167] (Gruber, Brian)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548698 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1467506] by Brian Keith Gruber on behalf of Appellees Laura Vinyard and William Vinyard. [13-7167] (Gruber, Brian)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548562 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
              UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1467456] by DC [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ] [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548550 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1467452] by DC [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548539 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                  STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1467446] by DC [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ] [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548536 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                    STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1467445] by DC [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548531 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1467444] by Donna M Murasky and co-counsel Todd S Kim Loren L Alikhan on behalf of Appellant DC. [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548527 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                        DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1467442] by DC [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ] [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207548524 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1467441] by DC [Service Date: 11/22/2013 ] [13-7167] (Murasky, Donna)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 01207540422 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1462888] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/25/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/09/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 11/25/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/25/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/25/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/09/2013 [13-7167]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207540419 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1462886] by DC seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-01604-CKK. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-7167]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?