Continental Insurance Company, et al v. USA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 13-5599

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 1:32 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011873931 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Alisa B. Klein for USA in 13-5578, 13-5599. Certificate of Service:11/05/2013. Argument Request: requested. [13-5578, 13-5599] (ABK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011855148 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
    LETTER SENT granting motion to establish new briefing schedule in light of restoration of appropriations [4961507-2] filed by Ms. Alisa B. Klein, resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 11/06/2013, Reply briefs due 30 days after filing of appellee briefs. [13-5578, 13-5599] (LAJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011854931 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
      UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Ms. Alisa B. Klein for USA in 13-5578, 13-5599 to establish new briefing schedule in light of restoration of appropriations. Certificate of Service: 10/18/2013. [13-5578, 13-5599] (ABK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011841303 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
        ORDER: The government's motion to hold appeals in abeyance in light of lapse of appropriations is GRANTED. Counsel for the government shall advise the court within two days after the restoration of appropriations of a proposed, revised briefing shcedule. Upon resumption of the appeal, a new schedule shall issue. [13-5578, 13-5599] (LAJ)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011840886 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION filed by Ms. Alisa B. Klein for USA in 13-5578, 13-5599 to hold case in abeyance. Certificate of Service: 10/07/2013. [13-5578, 13-5599] (ABK)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011795557 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
            APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Keith Bruce Dalen for Nissan North America, Inc., Gibson Guitar Corp., Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, Harris Corporation, Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Ins. Co, LTD (U.S. Branch), OSG Ship Management, Inc., Carters Inc., L-3 Communications Holdings Inc., ABC Bus Companies Inc., Metal One Holdings America, Inc. and Qinetiq North America Operations LLC. Certificate of Service:08/22/2013. Argument Request: requested. [13-5599, 13-5578] (KBD)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011724432 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellant briefs now due 08/22/2013. appellee briefs now due 10/21/2013. Reply briefs now due 30 days from the filing of appellees' briefs. [13-5578, 13-5599] (LAJ)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006011724390 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                ORDER granting motion to consolidate for briefing and submission, cases 13-5578 and 13-5599 [4876872-2], and granting the motion to extend time to file briefs [4876872-3] filed by Ms. Alisa B. Klein. In view of the already extended briefing schedule, further requests for extension will not be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. A new briefing schedule will issue contemporaneously with this order. [13-5578, 13-5599] (LAJ)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 45 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?