Hill et al v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06147
District Judge Pamela K. Chen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:55 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrea Holly, Plaintiff
No Logo Cynthia Hill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maduegbuna, Cooper LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel O. Maduegbuna +1 212 232 0155 +1 212 232 0156 sam.m@mcande.com
No Logo Denise Inman, Plaintiff
No Logo Ellen Ennis, Plaintiff
No Logo Gail Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Rolando Lopez, Plaintiff
No Logo Taura Pate, Plaintiff
No Logo Vickie Gordon, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Charles F. Dowd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Andersen +1 212 788 0870 +1 212 788 0940 janderse@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Donald Church, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Andersen +1 212 788 0870 +1 212 788 0940 janderse@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Dr. David Lichtenstein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Francis, Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Andersen +1 212 788 0870 +1 212 788 0940 janderse@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 through 20, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Ljubomir Belusic, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Andersen +1 212 788 0870 +1 212 788 0940 janderse@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by District 22 Political Forum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica C. Gray-Nelson +1 212 815 1450 +1 212 815 1440 egray-nelson@dc37.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
TERMINATED: 04/08/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MELISSA S. WOODS +1 212 239 4999 mwoods@msek.com
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael R. Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Michael V. Polito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Andersen +1 212 788 0870 +1 212 788 0940 janderse@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
No Logo Richard F. Napolitano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Andersen +1 212 788 0870 +1 212 788 0940 janderse@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Anne Canfield +1 212 356 2461 +1 212 356 2438 dcanfiel@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanan B. Kolko +1 212 239 4999 +1 212 239 1311 hkolko@msek.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (155) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Discovery
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Declaration
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on October 27, 2015, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than October 23, 2015, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/29/2015. (Wentworth-Ping, Alex)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: 9/28/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                MEMORANDUM & ORDER [Dkts. 89, 91, 104]: As set forth in the attached, the City Defendants' motion to dismiss [Dkt. 91] is granted in part and denied in part. The Court dismisses the following claims as to the City Defendants: (1) Plaintiffs' FMLA interference claim based on certification delay, miscalculation of eligibility hours, use of a designated FMLA number, and investigation of FMLA use (fifth cause of action); (2) Plaintiffs' FMLA retaliation claim based on the "high absentee" list (fifth cause of action); (3) Plaintiffs' First Amendment retaliation claim (fourth cause of action); and (4) Plaintiffs' New York State Labor Law claim (seventh cause of action).The following claims are not dismissed and will proceed as to the City Defendants: (1) Plaintiffs' racial discrimination claims under Sections 1981 and 1983 (first cause of action); (2) NYSHRL racial discrimination claim (second cause of action); (3) NYCHRL racial discrimination claim (third cause of action); (4) Plaintiffs' FMLA interference claim based on the 30-minute call window and the miscalculation of FMLA hours used (fifth cause of action); (5) Plaintiffs' FMLA retaliation claim based on the requirement to perform mandatory overtime immediately upon returning from leave (fifth cause of action); and (6) Plaintiffs' breach of contract claim (sixth cause of action).For the reasons set forth in the attached, DC 37's motion to dismiss 89 Plaintiffs' Section 1981 racial discrimination claim (tenth cause of action) is granted insofar as Plaintiffs assert a direct discrimination claim, but denied on an acquiescence theory. Since DC 37 did not move to dismiss Plaintiffs' breach of duty of fair representation claim (eighth cause of action), that claim will proceed.Plaintiffs motion to certify the proposed Section 1981 and FMLA classes, pursuant to FRCP 23(b)(2) for liability and injunctive relief [Dkt. 104], is granted. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 9/28/2015. (Pelaez, Jenny)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Canfield, Donna)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class Affirmation of Meaghean Murphy by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class Supplemental Affirmation of Steven Sykes by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class Hanan B. Kolko by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class filed by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class Reply Declaration of Samuel O. Maduegbuna in Support of Plaintiffs' Brief in Response to Defendant DC 37 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Cowles, William) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              REPLY in Support re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class Reply to Defendant DC 37 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                REPLY in Support re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class Reply to Defendants City of New York filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class Declaration of Samuel O. Maduegbuna filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit) (Cowles, William) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 104 Notice of MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION to Certify Class by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Service) (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Woods, Melissa)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Canfield, Donna)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Request for Extension to Respond to Motion for Class Certification by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Canfield, Donna)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memoranda of Law in Response to Plaintffs' Motion for Class Certififcation by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, John and Jane Does 1 through 20, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Letter Cover Letter Re: Motion for Class Certification by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Canfield on behalf of Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito (aty to be noticed) (Canfield, Donna)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Letter to Judge Chen Requesting Permission for Oral Argument by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support re 91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum) (Kolko, Hanan)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Letter Cover Letter for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant City of New York's Motion to Dismiss by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams (Cowles, William) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Letter Cover Letter for Plaintiffs' Opposition to DC 37's Motion to Dismiss by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Request for Extension to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Cowles, William)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Letter Cover Letter for City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Letter Cover Letter for Motion to Dismiss by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO (Woods, Melissa) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter with Proposed Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Letter Requesting Permission to File Partial Motion to Dismiss by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Scheduling Order for Defendants' Intended Motion to Dismiss as Per the Court's March 20, 2014 Order by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B -1, # 3 Exhibit B - 2, # 4 Exhibit C) (Cowles, William) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend The Complaint by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Cowles, William) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by William W. Cowles, II (Cowles, William) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Samuel O. Maduegbuna (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Z. Williamson on behalf of Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams (aty to be noticed) (Williamson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Plaintiffs' Response and Opposition to DC 37 Pre-Motion Letter by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Cowles, William) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Plaintiffs' Response and Opposition to Defendant City Pre-Motion Letter on Motion to Dismiss by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Cowles, William) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO (Woods, Melissa) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Gail Williams and in Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Rolando Lopez and in Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Cynthia Hill and in Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to Dismiss the Complaint by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Woods, Melissa) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Request to File Reply Briefs by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Cowles, William) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Adjourn Conference / Oral Argument by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re 60 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N) (Woods, Melissa) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order filed by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Woods, Melissa) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order of Hamilton Banks filed by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order of Inspector Richard F. Napolitano filed by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order of Leah S. Schmelzer filed by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Adjourn Conference Request to Reschedule Oral Argument on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Kolko, Hanan) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, On Consent by Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Declarations with Exhibits served on All Defendants on 1/24/2014, filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Pamela Rodriguez, with Exhibit A) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Stacy E. Kennely, with Exhibits A and B) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Denise Inman, with Exhibit A) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Andrea Holly) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Rolando Lopez, with Exhibit A) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Gail Williams) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Cynthia Hill) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order (by Samuel O. Maduegbuna, with Exhibits 1-19) filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restraining Order by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Notice of Service of Motion to Enjoin Defendants by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams (Attachments: # 1 Service of Motion Letter, # 2 Service of Motion Letter) (Cowles, William) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs seek expedited review of this request and application given the urgent nature of the reliefs sought by Ellen Ennis, Vickie Gordon, Cynthia Hill, Andrea Holly, Denise Inman, Rolando Lopez, Taura Pate, Gail Williams. (Cowles, William) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, Letter Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Woods, Melissa) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. City of New York served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Charles F. Dowd served on 11/29/2013, answer due 12/20/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Charles F. Dowd served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Raymond Kelly served on 11/29/2013, answer due 12/20/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Raymond Kelly served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Michael R. Bloomberg served on 11/29/2013, answer due 12/20/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Michael R. Bloomberg served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. City of New York served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. David Lichtenstein served on 11/20/2013, answer due 12/11/2013. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Donald Church served on 11/18/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Donald Church served on 11/15/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Francis Kelly served on 11/18/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Francis Kelly served on 11/15/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Ljubomir Belusic served on 11/18/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Ljubomir Belusic served on 11/15/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Michael V. Polito served on 11/15/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Richard F. Napolitano served on 11/18/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. Richard F. Napolitano served on 11/15/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Maduegbuna, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Gray-Nelson, Erica) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Hanan B. Kolko on behalf of Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO (aty to be noticed) (Kolko, Hanan) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa S Woods on behalf of Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO (aty to be noticed) (Woods, Melissa) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Charles F. Dowd. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Leah S Schmelzer on behalf of Charles F. Dowd (aty to be noticed) (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by Michael R. Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Leah S Schmelzer on behalf of Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito (aty to be noticed) (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, by Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO. (Gray-Nelson, Erica) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by Ljubomir Belusic, Donald Church, Francis Kelly, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Andersen, Jane) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jane E. Andersen on behalf of Ljubomir Belusic, Donald Church, Francis Kelly, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito (aty to be noticed) (Andersen, Jane) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Erica C. Gray-Nelson on behalf of Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO (aty to be noticed) (Gray-Nelson, Erica) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Cowles, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Cowles, William) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jane E. Andersen on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Andersen, Jane) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by City of New York. (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Leah S Schmelzer on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Schmelzer, Leah) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Ljubomir Belusic, Michael R. Bloomberg, Donald Church, City of New York, Charles F. Dowd, Francis Kelly, Raymond Kelly, David Lichtenstein, Local 1549, District Council 37, AFSCME, AFL-CIO, Richard F. Napolitano, Michael V. Polito. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Taura Pate, Cynthia Hill, Rolando Lopez, Gail Williams, Andrea Holly, Ellen Ennis, Denise Inman, Vickie Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?