Vision Films, Inc. v. Does 1-19
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00856

Tags
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 10:36 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time under Rule 4(m) to serve the Doe defendants. Plaintiffs must serve summons and complaint on defendants on or before April 29, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/30/2013. (Abel, Mark)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
    MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/29/2014. For Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [3] Ex Parte Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 09/17/2013. (sr1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Motion for Discovery
        Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Vision Films, Inc.. (Bass, Leon)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Complaint
            COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-19 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4242557), filed by Vision Films, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit A1, # (4) Exhibit A2, # (5) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 110 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?