Life University, Inc. v. Brain Synergy Institute, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01741
District Judge Steve C Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 9:19 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Life University, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED taskew@mcciplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Ann Keesee +1 404 645 7700 +1 404 645 7707 jkeesee@mcciplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Scott Moreland +1 404 645 7700 +1 404 645 7707 dmoreland@mcciplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder tlevie@mcciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
v.
No Logo Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Paul Getzoff +1 303 473 2734 +1 303 473 2720 tgetzoff@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mher Hartoonian +1 303 295 8000 mhartoonian@hollandhart.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Preston Hamilton Heard +1 404 888 7366 +1 404 879 2966 pheard@wcsr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William McKenzie Ragland, Jr. +1 404 888 7466 +1 404 870 2401 wragland@wcsr.com
No Logo Carrick Brain Centers, Defendant
No Logo KBCR, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Maher, Intervenor-Plaintiff
No Logo Ultrathera Technologies, Inc., Intervenor-Plaintiff
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
Costs Taxed in amount of $2,465.13 against Plaintiff Life University, Inc. for Defendants Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, KBCR, LLC and Carrick Brain Centers. (aaq) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 33 Motion for Costs. The Motion is GRANTED (as to the court reporter fees) and DENIED (as to travel expenses). Defendants are hereby awarded costs in the amount of $2,465.13. The Clerk is DIRECTED to tax the costs in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 07/08/14. (aaq) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying the 29 Motion for Attorney Fees Incurred in Connection with Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 07/08/14. (aaq) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
        Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA GRANTING Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss 30 Notice of Appeal filed by Life University, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - Federal Circuit. USCA Case Number 14-1353. (kac) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
          Certified copy of ORDER of USCA GRANTING Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss 30 Notice of Appeal filed by Life University, Inc. Each party shall bear its own costs. Case Appealed to USCA - Federal Circuit. USCA Case Number 14-1353. (kac) Modified on 6/23/2014 to modify docket text (kac). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees Incurred in Connection with Plaintiff's Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Heard, Preston) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
              TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 30 Notice of Appeal,. (Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Costs filed by Life University, Inc.. (Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                  Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Timothy Getzoff, # 2 Exhibit A)(Heard, Preston) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees Incurred in Connection with Plaintiff's Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Life University, Inc.. (Moreland, David) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                      USCA Acknowledgment of 30 Notice of Appeal filed by Life University, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - Federal Circuit. USCA Case Number 14-1353. (kac) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Costs with Brief In Support by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit of Timothy Getzoff, # 3 Exhibit A to Getzoff Declaration)(Heard, Preston) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE to 25 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Life University, Inc. (Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                            Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 30 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Defendants' Corrected Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Getzoff, Timothy) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 31 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE Of Filing Appeal Transmission Letter by Life University, Inc., re: 30 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Getzoff, Timothy) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 28 Clerk's Judgment, 27 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Life University, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-5063454. Transcript Order Form due on 3/21/2014 (Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees Incurred in Connection with Plaintiff's Jurisdictional Discovery with Brief In Support by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit of Timothy Getzoff, # 3 Exhibit A)(Heard, Preston) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                        CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Defendants' Amended Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Getzoff, Timothy) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) [Doc. No. 8] and denying as moot 7 the pending Motion to Intervene filed by Ultrathera Technologies, Inc. and Kevin Maher's [Doc. No. 7]. Nothing further remaining for the Court's consideration, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 2/7/14. (ddm) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Life University, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit)(Moreland, David) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Jurisdictional Discovery Requests and Interrogatories by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers.(Getzoff, Timothy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting the emergency 9 Motion for Judicial Discovery. (See order for specifics.) With regard to the motion to intervene 7 , the Court declines to consider the motion on an expedited basis. The Court shall address the matter in due course and in conjunction with its consideration of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 08/23/13. (aaq) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth C. Beam in Support of 18 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Getzoff, Timothy) Modified on 8/23/2013 to edit docket text. (jtj) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Getzoff, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Intervene and Request for Expedited Consideration of the Motion filed by Kevin Maher, UltraThera Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Moreland, David) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C Jones: Telephone conference held regarding plaintiff Life University's 9 Emergency MOTION to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. Matter taken under advisement pending the filing of Plaintiff's reply brief; after which the Court will enter a written order. (Court Reporter Lois Phillips)(ddm) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 Emergency MOTION to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Ragland, William) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Life University, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stephen Bolles in Support of Life's Brief in Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Moreland, David) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Intervene and Request for Expedited Consideration of the Motion filed by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kenneth Beam, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ragland, William) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy Getzoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4716501)by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Heard, Preston) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Mher Hartoonian Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4716454)by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Heard, Preston) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Preston Hamilton Heard on behalf of Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC (Heard, Preston) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Discovery to Request Permission to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery with Brief In Support by Life University, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers, KBCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit Kenneth Beam, # 3 Exhibit A to Beam Decl, # 4 Exhibit B to Beam Decl, # 5 Exhibit C to Beam Decl, # 6 Exhibit D to Beam Decl)(Ragland, William) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Intervene and Request for Expedited Consideration of the Motion with Brief In Support by UltraThera Technologies, Inc., Kevin Maher. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life University, Inc. (Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Return of Service Executed by Life University, Inc. Brain Synergy Institute served on 6/28/2013. Answer due 7/19/2013. (Askew, Anthony) Modified on 7/17/2013 to edit docket text. (jtj) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Court's NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TOTHE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to Brain Synergy Institute, LLC, Carrick Brain Centers and KBCR, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 KBCR LLC, # 2 Carrick Brain)(eop) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT, filed by Life University, Inc.. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-4596892.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 352 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?