Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation v. RF Micro Devices, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00725
District Judge Marilyn L. Huff, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 11:08 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H. Blankenheimer +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ablankenheimer@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Moore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan A. Berkelhammer +1 336 378 5200 +3785 378 378 5400 jon.berkelhammer@smithmoorelaw.com
v.
No Logo Rf Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean S. Pak +1 415 875 6320 +1 415 395 8095 seanpak@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Yeh-Kai Tung +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 marktung@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 8,405,147, re Terminated Case. cc:USPTO (ag) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Sara O'Connell on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(O'Connell, Sara)Attorney Sara O'Connell added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:pla) (ag). (Entered: 06/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt, per related case 12cv911 H (JLB). The new case number is 13cv725 H (JLB).(no document attached) (jcj) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Transfer Order. It is hereby ordered that the following listed cases are transferred from the calendar of the Honorable William McCurine, Jr. to the calendar of the Honorable William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 13cv0725-H(WVG). All future conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge McCurine, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Gallo. Counsel will contact the Chambers of Judge Gallo to reschedule any conferences or hearings within five days of the entry of this Order. Any dates set before the District Judge remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/31/2014.(jao) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Irma E. Gonzalez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 13CV0725-H(WMC).(no document attached) (nsp) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting Plaintiff's 8 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. Pursuant to FRCP 42(a), case numbers 13cv725-IEG(WMC) and 12cv911-IEG(WMC) are consolidated for all purposes. All future docketing will be done in the lead case, case number 12cv911-IEG(WMC). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/25/2013. (jah) (jrl). (Entered: 04/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Tung on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Tung, Mark). (jah). (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Sean S. Pak on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Pak, Sean). (jah). (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Holmes on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Holmes, Andrew). (jah). (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K Verhoeven on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Verhoeven, Charles). (jah). (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion for 14-Day Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc. ordered to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 5/1/2013. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/18/2013.(jah)(jrd) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Neukom, John). (jah). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION for 14-Day Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John). Modified on 4/18/2013 - Proposed Order attached. QC Email sent to Atty re ECF Proposed Order policy. Edited to remove duplicative text. Added link to Complaint (jah). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by John McMakin Neukom on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Neukom, John). (jah). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Irma E. Gonzalez and Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:12-cv-0911-IEG (WMC). The new case number is 13CV0725-IEG (WMC). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/12/2013. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 04/11/2013.(yeb) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Table of Contents, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. RF Micro Devices, Inc. served. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jonathan Arthur Berkelhammer appearing for Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (vam) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Order: Judge Larry Alan Burns has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 13cv725-H(KSC) (no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                        Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (av1). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                          REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,405,147* cc: USPTO. (dls)(av1). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (dls) (av1). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against RF Micro Devices, Inc. (filing fee $350 receipt number 0974-5745688), filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Case Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:13-cv-725-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Blankenheimer, Alan)(dls) (av1). Modified on 4/9/2013 to note that a low number order was prepared (ag). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 307 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?