Charles Hebb v. Homeq Servicing Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 11-1270

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2016 at 11:06 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00403672870 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
ORDER - ENTRY STRUCK [998747356]. [11-1272, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316]--[Edited 12/20/2011 by CP] (CP)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00403294124 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
    [Edited 04/14/2011 by CP]. Reason for Edit: Document Struck. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
      Mandate issued. Referencing: [61] Unpublished Authored Opinion , [62] Judgment order. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-03218-JFM.. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1292, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
        COURT ORDER filed [998926683] denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [63] Copies to all parties. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1292, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
          Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1). Mailed to: Dorothy Ann Davis. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1292, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (DSD)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
            PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Appellants Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod, Andy S. Newman and Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellants David Hutchison, Katherine Hutchison and Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellants Charlene Hebb, Charles Hebb and Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellants Emanuel Phillips, Geraldine Phillips and Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellants Sharon L. Rodwell, William F. Rodwell and Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, Appellant Lynn A. Fulmore and Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1281, Appellant Edwin Ruble and Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellant Judith J. Moffitt and Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, Appellants McLaren Brewster, Vanta Othella Brewster, George W. Liebmann and Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, Appellant Linda Orem and Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellants Kathy T. Cary, Brenda L. Mitchell, James E. Mitchell, Sr. and Appellees PSB Lending Corporation and PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 in 11-1299, Appellants Linda Floyd, Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre, Sheri C. Parker and Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated in 11-1304, Appellant Sheldon Johnson and Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellants Dennis C. Trojanowski, Peggy L. Trojanowski and Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1292, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 11-1259 opn.u.arg 11-1266 opn.u.arg 11-1270 opn.u.arg 11-1276 opn.u.arg 11-1277 opn.u.arg 11-1281 opn.u.arg 11-1284 opn.u.arg 11-1289 opn.u.arg 11-1291 opn.u.arg 11-1292 opn.u.arg 11-1295 opn.u.arg 11-1297 opn.u.arg 11-1299 opn.u.arg 11-1304 opn.u.arg 11-1308 opn.u.arg 11-1316 opn.u.arg. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-03218-JFM. Entered on Docket Date: 08/01/2012. [998907163] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                UNPUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [998830067-3] in 11-1291, granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [998830068-3] in 11-1295; Motion to deconsolidate/sever [998830067-2] in 11-1291, Motion to deconsolidate/sever [998830068-2] in 11-1295 Originating case number: 1:09-cv-03218-JFM Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [998907138].. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Appellants Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod and Andy S. Newman in 11-1259, Appellants David Hutchison and Katherine Hutchison in 11-1266, Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb in 11-1270, Appellants Emanuel Phillips and Geraldine Phillips in 11-1276, Appellants Sharon L. Rodwell and William F. Rodwell in 11-1277, Appellant Lynn A. Fulmore in 11-1281, Appellants Jacqueline Conway and Tyrone Conway in 11-1282, Appellant Edwin Ruble in 11-1284, Appellant Judith J. Moffitt in 11-1289, Appellant Donna Renee Tipton in 11-1291, Appellants McLaren Brewster, Vanta Othella Brewster and George W. Liebmann in 11-1292, Appellants Michelle L. Gephardt and Thomas A. Gephardt in 11-1295, Appellant Linda Orem in 11-1297, Appellants Kathy T. Cary, Brenda L. Mitchell and James E. Mitchell, Sr. in 11-1299, Appellants Linda Floyd, Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre and Sheri C. Parker in 11-1304, Appellant Sheldon Johnson in 11-1308, Appellants Dennis C. Trojanowski and Peggy L. Trojanowski in 11-1316. [998771736]. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                    Letter re: Supplemental Authority [57] corrected Brief by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated in 11-1282, Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, 11-1291, Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellees PSB Lending Corporation and PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 in 11-1299, 11-1304, Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316. [998771571] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Gerard Gaeng
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                      COURT ORDER filed [998770501] granting Motion to file corrected document [54] Description of corrected document: corrected brief of appellees. Copies to all parties. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                        Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Fairbanks Capital Corporation in 11-1292. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998769577] [11-1292, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Daniel Glass
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated in 11-1282, Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, 11-1291, Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellees PSB Lending Corporation and PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 in 11-1299, 11-1304, Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316 to file a corrected document Description of corrected document: Corrected Consolidated Brief of Appellees. Date and method of service: 01/19/2012 ecf [998769028] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] James Martin
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                            CORRECTED order filed [998747911] correcting and superseding order dated 12/19/2011. Copies to all parties.. [11-1272] (CP)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                              COURT ORDER filed [998747445] denying Motion additional argument time (Local Rule 34(d)) [44] in 11-1259 Copies to all parties. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellants Reginald A. Nance, Terri L. Nance and Appellees HSBC Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1272 to dismiss appeal [50] [11-1272, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Daniel Squire
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                  ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellees HSBC Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1272, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, 11-1291, Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellees PSB Lending Corporation and PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 in 11-1299, 11-1304, Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316. Counsel arguing: James C. Martin [998736049] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] James Martin
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                    ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod and Andy S. Newman in 11-1259, Appellants David Hutchison and Katherine Hutchison in 11-1266, Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb in 11-1270, Appellants Reginald A. Nance and Terri L. Nance in 11-1272, Appellants Emanuel Phillips and Geraldine Phillips in 11-1276, Appellants Sharon L. Rodwell and William F. Rodwell in 11-1277, Appellant Lynn A. Fulmore in 11-1281, Appellant Edwin Ruble in 11-1284, Appellant Judith J. Moffitt in 11-1289, Appellant Donna Renee Tipton in 11-1291, Appellants McLaren Brewster, Vanta Othella Brewster and George W. Liebmann in 11-1292, Appellants Michelle L. Gephardt and Thomas A. Gephardt in 11-1295, Appellant Linda Orem in 11-1297, Appellants Kathy T. Cary, Brenda L. Mitchell and James E. Mitchell, Sr. in 11-1299, Appellants Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre and Sheri C. Parker in 11-1304, Appellant Sheldon Johnson in 11-1308, Appellants Dennis C. Trojanowski and Peggy L. Trojanowski in 11-1316. Counsel arguing: E. David Hoskins Opening argument time: 15 Minutes Rebuttal argument time: 5 Minutes [998735863] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                      ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellees HSBC Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1272, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1281, Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1291, Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, Appellees Sovereign Bank in 11-1295, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellees PSB Lending Corporation and PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 in 11-1299, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1304, Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316. Counsel arguing: Gerard J. Gaeng [998735182] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316]--[Edited 12/02/2011 by CP] Gerard Gaeng
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                        CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 01/25/2012. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (JLE)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                          ORDER filed [998730538] deferring action on Motion additional argument time (Local Rule 34(d)) filed by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation [44] in 11-1259 Copies to all parties... [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellees HSBC Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1272, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, 11-1291, Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellees PSB Lending Corporation and PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 in 11-1299, 11-1304, Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316 for additional argument time Total time requested: 60 Minutes.. Date and method of service: 11/23/2011 ecf [998729723] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Gerard Gaeng
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                              ORDER filed [998718200] amending/correcting caption Copies to all parties. [11-1299] (CP)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/24/12 - 1/27/12 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/14/2011 [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (JLC)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                  COURT ORDER filed [998696464] granting Motion to remand case for limited purpose [38] Copies to all parties. [11-1299] (CP)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by Appellant Marie O. Felder and Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Wachovia Bank National Association in 11-1299 to remand case for limited purpose [4cca retains jurisdiction]. Date and method of service: 09/30/2011 ecf [998690786] [11-1299, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Bruce Alexander
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. ORDER granting Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/19/2011. [11-1299] (CP)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                        ORDER filed [998671212] denying Motion to dismiss appeal [35] in 11-1299 Copies to all parties. [11-1299, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION by Appellant Marie O. Felder and Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Wachovia Bank National Association in 11-1299 to dismiss appeal [35]. Date and method of service: 09/01/2011 ecf [998669357] [11-1299, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Bruce Alexander
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER filed [998659384] deconsolidating/severing case(s) 11-1282 from lead case 11-1259 Copies to all parties. [11-1282, 11-1259] (CP)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                              CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellants Jacqueline Conway, Tyrone Conway and Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated in 11-1282 to dismiss appeal [33] [11-1282, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Daniel Squire
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                COURT ORDER filed [998656972] denying Motion to certify question to state court [26] in 11-1259; denying Motion for stay pending appeal [26] in 11-1259 Copies to all parties. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY by Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod and Andy S. Newman in 11-1259, David Hutchison and Katherine Hutchison in 11-1266, Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb in 11-1270, Reginald A. Nance and Terri L. Nance in 11-1272, Emanuel Phillips and Geraldine Phillips in 11-1276, Sharon L. Rodwell and William F. Rodwell in 11-1277, Lynn A. Fulmore in 11-1281, Jacqueline Conway and Tyrone Conway in 11-1282, Edwin Ruble in 11-1284, Judith J. Moffitt in 11-1289, Donna Renee Tipton in 11-1291, McLaren Brewster, Vanta Othella Brewster and George W. Liebmann in 11-1292, Michelle L. Gephardt and Thomas A. Gephardt in 11-1295, Linda Orem in 11-1297, Kathy T. Cary, Marie O. Felder, Brenda L. Mitchell and James E. Mitchell, Sr. in 11-1299, Linda Floyd, Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre and Sheri C. Parker in 11-1304, Sheldon Johnson in 11-1308, Dennis C. Trojanowski and Peggy L. Trojanowski in 11-1316 to Motion for stay pending appeal [26], Motion to certify question to state court [26], Response [30]. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE/ANSWER by M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, HSBC Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1272, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated in 11-1282, Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, 11-1291, Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, PSB Lending Corporation, PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 and Wachovia Bank National Association in 11-1299, 11-1304, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316 to notice requesting response [27], Motion for stay pending appeal [26], Motion to certify question to state court [26]. Nature of response: in opposition. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] James Martin
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      BRIEF by Appellants Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod and Andy S. Newman in 11-1259, Appellants David Hutchison and Katherine Hutchison in 11-1266, Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb in 11-1270, Appellants Reginald A. Nance and Terri L. Nance in 11-1272, Appellants Emanuel Phillips and Geraldine Phillips in 11-1276, Appellants Sharon L. Rodwell and William F. Rodwell in 11-1277, Appellant Lynn A. Fulmore in 11-1281, Appellants Jacqueline Conway and Tyrone Conway in 11-1282, Appellant Edwin Ruble in 11-1284, Appellant Judith J. Moffitt in 11-1289, Appellant Donna Renee Tipton in 11-1291, Appellants McLaren Brewster, Vanta Othella Brewster and George W. Liebmann in 11-1292, Appellants Michelle L. Gephardt and Thomas A. Gephardt in 11-1295, Appellant Linda Orem in 11-1297, Appellants Kathy T. Cary, Marie O. Felder, Brenda L. Mitchell and James E. Mitchell, Sr. in 11-1299, Appellants Linda Floyd, Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre and Sheri C. Parker in 11-1304, Appellant Sheldon Johnson in 11-1308 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/27/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998641315] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE ISSUED to Anthony Peter Ashton for M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation and Mr. James David Mathias for M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Mr. David J. Bird for Sovereign Bank, Mr. James Edward Crossan for Sovereign Bank, Mr. Gerard J. Gaeng for Sovereign Bank, Mr. James Christopher Martin for Sovereign Bank, John Michael McIntyre for Sovereign Bank and Colin E. Wrabley for Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Mr. Gregory Louis Lockwood for Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Mr. Daniel Harris Squire for Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated and HSBC Finance Corporation in 11-1272, Mr. David J. Bird for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon, Mr. James Edward Crossan for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon, Mr. Gerard J. Gaeng for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon, Mr. James Christopher Martin for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon, John Michael McIntyre for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon and Colin E. Wrabley for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Mr. Brian L. Moffet for PSB Lending Corporation and Mr. Daniel J. Tobin for Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A., United States Bank National Association, Litton Loan Servicing, LP and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, Mr. Reginald Brantley McKnight for HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated and Mr. Daniel Harris Squire for HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated in 11-1282, Victoria R. Collado for Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated, Andrew LeMar for Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated and LeAnn Pedersen Pope for Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Mr. David J. Bird for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC, Victoria R. Collado for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mr. James Edward Crossan for Residential Funding Company, LLC, Mr. Gerard J. Gaeng for Residential Funding Company, LLC, Andrew LeMar for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mr. James Christopher Martin for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC, John Michael McIntyre for Residential Funding Company, LLC, LeAnn Pedersen Pope for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Colin E. Wrabley for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, Mr. David J. Bird for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC, Mr. James Edward Crossan for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC, Mr. Gerard J. Gaeng for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC, Mr. James Christopher Martin for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC, John Michael McIntyre for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC and Colin E. Wrabley for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1291, Anthony Peter Ashton for PB Investment Corporation, Dorothy Ann Davis for Fairbanks Capital Corporation, Mr. Daniel A. Glass for Fairbanks Capital Corporation, Mr. Edward John Longosz, II for Fairbanks Capital Corporation and Mr. James David Mathias for PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Mr. Reginald Brantley McKnight for Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated, Edward Hutchinson Robbins, Jr. for Bank of America Corporation, Mr. Daniel Harris Squire for Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated and Scott Wilson for Bank of America Corporation in 11-1297, Mr. Bruce Edward Alexander for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Mr. Gregory Louis Lockwood for Wachovia Bank National Association and Mr. Brian L. Moffet for PSB Lending Corporation and PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 in 11-1299, 11-1304, Mr. David J. Bird for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC, Mr. James Edward Crossan for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC, Mr. Gerard J. Gaeng for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC, Mr. James Christopher Martin for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC, John Michael McIntyre for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC and Colin E. Wrabley for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Mr. James Edward Crossan for Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated and Mr. Gerard J. Gaeng for Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316 requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [26] and Motion to certify question to state court [998639933-3[998640077] Mailed to: Dorothy Davis. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (BHR)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION by Appellants Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod and Andy S. Newman in 11-1259, Appellants David Hutchison and Katherine Hutchison in 11-1266, Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb in 11-1270, Appellants Reginald A. Nance and Terri L. Nance in 11-1272, Appellants Emanuel Phillips and Geraldine Phillips in 11-1276, Appellants Sharon L. Rodwell and William F. Rodwell in 11-1277, Appellant Lynn A. Fulmore in 11-1281, Appellants Jacqueline Conway and Tyrone Conway in 11-1282, Appellant Edwin Ruble in 11-1284, Appellant Judith J. Moffitt in 11-1289, Appellant Donna Renee Tipton in 11-1291, Appellants McLaren Brewster, Vanta Othella Brewster and George W. Liebmann in 11-1292, Appellants Michelle L. Gephardt and Thomas A. Gephardt in 11-1295, Appellant Linda Orem in 11-1297, Appellants Kathy T. Cary, Marie O. Felder, Brenda L. Mitchell and James E. Mitchell, Sr. in 11-1299, Appellants Linda Floyd, Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre and Sheri C. Parker in 11-1304, Appellant Sheldon Johnson in 11-1308, Appellants Dennis C. Trojanowski and Peggy L. Trojanowski in 11-1316 for stay pending appeal., for certification of question to state court. Date and method of service: 07/26/2011 ecf [998639933] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            BRIEF by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellees HSBC Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1272, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated in 11-1282, Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, 11-1291, Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, PSB Lending Corporation, PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 and Wachovia Bank National Association in 11-1299, 11-1304, Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/08/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998628160] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] James Martin
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF PAPER FILING by Appellants Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod and Andy S. Newman in 11-1259, Appellants David Hutchison and Katherine Hutchison in 11-1266, Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb in 11-1270, Appellants Reginald A. Nance and Terri L. Nance in 11-1272, Appellants Emanuel Phillips and Geraldine Phillips in 11-1276, Appellants Sharon L. Rodwell and William F. Rodwell in 11-1277, Appellant Lynn A. Fulmore in 11-1281, Appellants Jacqueline Conway and Tyrone Conway in 11-1282, Appellant Edwin Ruble in 11-1284, Appellant Judith J. Moffitt in 11-1289, Appellant Donna Renee Tipton in 11-1291, Appellants McLaren Brewster and Vanta Othella Brewster in 11-1292, Appellants Michelle L. Gephardt and Thomas A. Gephardt in 11-1295, Appellant Linda Orem in 11-1297, Appellants Kathy T. Cary, Marie O. Felder, Brenda L. Mitchell and James E. Mitchell, Sr. in 11-1299, Appellants Linda Floyd, Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre and Sheri C. Parker in 11-1304, Appellant Sheldon Johnson in 11-1308, Appellants Dennis C. Trojanowski and Peggy L. Trojanowski in 11-1316. Type of paper document filed: appendix Date paper copies mailed, dispatched or delivered to court: 05/20/2011 Method of filing paper copies: hand delivery [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                BRIEF by Appellants Betty McLeod, Dennis McLeod and Andy S. Newman in 11-1259, Appellants David Hutchison and Katherine Hutchison in 11-1266, Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb in 11-1270, Appellants Reginald A. Nance and Terri L. Nance in 11-1272, Appellants Emanuel Phillips and Geraldine Phillips in 11-1276, Appellants Sharon L. Rodwell and William F. Rodwell in 11-1277, Appellant Lynn A. Fulmore in 11-1281, Appellants Jacqueline Conway and Tyrone Conway in 11-1282, Appellant Edwin Ruble in 11-1284, Appellant Judith J. Moffitt in 11-1289, Appellant Donna Renee Tipton in 11-1291, Appellants McLaren Brewster and Vanta Othella Brewster in 11-1292, Appellants Michelle L. Gephardt and Thomas A. Gephardt in 11-1295, Appellant Linda Orem in 11-1297, Appellants Kathy T. Cary, Marie O. Felder, Brenda L. Mitchell and James E. Mitchell, Sr. in 11-1299, Appellants Linda Floyd, Christine Mohre, Derek Mohre and Sheri C. Parker in 11-1304, Appellant Sheldon Johnson in 11-1308, Appellants Dennis C. Trojanowski and Peggy L. Trojanowski in 11-1316 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/20/2011. Is this a redacted brief?No If yes, have you verified that the redacted material cannot be revealed by cutting and pasting text? N/A [998594351] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Letter re: Appellees' Lead Counsel Designation by Appellees M&T Bank Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1259, Appellee Sovereign Bank in 11-1266, Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation in 11-1270, Appellees HSBC Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1272, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Residential Funding Company, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon in 11-1276, Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP, PSB Lending Corporation, United States Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, N.A. in 11-1277, 11-1281, Appellee HSBC Mortgage Services, Incorporated in 11-1282, Appellee Banc One Financial Services, Incorporated in 11-1284, Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1289, 11-1291, Appellees Fairbanks Capital Corporation and PB Investment Corporation in 11-1292, 11-1295, Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Household Finance Corporation and Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Incorporated in 11-1297, Appellees Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, PSB Lending Corporation, PSB Lending Home Loan Owner Trust 1997-4 and Wachovia Bank National Association in 11-1299, 11-1304, Appellees Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Residential Funding Company, LLC in 11-1308, Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316. [998573954] [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] Gerard Gaeng
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Fifth Third Bank, Incorporated in 11-1316. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998569326] [11-1316, 11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308] James Crossan
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Corrected Amended BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/24/2011. Response Brief due 07/08/2011 [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER filed [998568324] rescinding briefing schedules. Copies to all parties. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (CP)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          COURT ORDER filed [998567884] granting motion to consolidate cases (Local Rule 12(b)) [998565714-2] in 11-1259, exceeding length limitations for briefs, Total Words: 21,000 for opening and response briefs and 10,500 for reply brief. Copies to all parties. [11-1259, 11-1266, 11-1270, 11-1272, 11-1276, 11-1277, 11-1281, 11-1282, 11-1284, 11-1289, 11-1291, 11-1292, 11-1295, 11-1297, 11-1299, 11-1304, 11-1308, 11-1316] (SAW)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998565625] [11-1270] Gregory Lockwood
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation re: to file a corrected disclosure of corporate affiliations form. [11-1270] (CP)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Homeq Servicing Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998564686] [11-1270] Gregory Lockwood
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [11-1270] (LP)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Myers, Daniel O. for Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb.[998563543] [11-1270] Daniel Myers
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/16/2011. Response Brief due 06/20/2011 [11-1270] (CP)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gregory L. Lockwood for Homeq Servicing Corporation.[998562616] [11-1270] Gregory Lockwood
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998560038] [11-1270] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998560037] [11-1270] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb. [11-1270] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by E. David Hoskins for Charlene Hebb and Charles Hebb.[998560032] [11-1270] Edwin Hoskins
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1],case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-02334-JFM. Mailed to: Gregory Louis Lockwood TREANOR, POPE & HUGHES 29 West Susquehanna Avenue Towson, MD 21204-0000 Renita Lynne Collins TREANOR, POPE & HUGHES 29 West Susquehanna Avenue Towson, MD 21204-0000. [11-1270] (CP)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-02334-JFM. Case manager: CPoulsen. Date notice of appeal filed: 03/22/2011 [11-1270] (CP)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?