NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP et al v. MCCRORY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Middle District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP
District Judge THOMAS D. SCHROEDER, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 22, 2018 at 9:00 PM EDT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARMENTA EATON, Plaintiff
No Logo BAHEEYAH MADANY, Plaintiff
No Logo BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., Plaintiff
No Logo BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, Plaintiff
No Logo CAROLYN COLEMAN, Plaintiff
No Logo CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, Plaintiff
No Logo COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, Plaintiff
No Logo EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, Plaintiff
No Logo FAITH JACKSON, Plaintiff
No Logo JANE DOE 1, Plaintiff
No Logo JANE DOE 2, Plaintiff
No Logo Jane Doe #3, Plaintiff
No Logo JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Plaintiff
No Logo John Doe #2, Plaintiff
No Logo John Doe #3, Plaintiff
No Logo MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Advancement Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PENDA DENISE HAIR +1 202 728 9557 +1 202 728 9558 phair@advancementproject.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JADINE C. JOHNSON +1 202 728 9557 +1 202 728 9558 jjohnson@advancementproject.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donita Judge +1 202 728 9557 +1 202 728 9558 djudge@advancementproject.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise D. Lieberman +1 314 780 1833 +1 202 728 9558 dlieberman@advancementproject.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JASMYN G. RICHARDSON +1 202 728 9557 +1 202 728 9558 jrichardson@advancementproject.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY +1 202 728 9557 +1 202 728 9558 CSwain@advancementproject.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Winn Allen +1 202 879 5078 +1 202 654 9648 winn.allen@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Kenneth Anguas +1 202 879 5091 ronald.anguas@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER R. BASCH +1 212 446 5926 +1 212 446 6460 jennifer.basch@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan M. Davies +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 susan.davies@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Thomas Donovan +1 202 879 5174 +1 202 879 5200 daniel.donovan@dc.kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Adam Glick +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5100 michael.glick@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER J. MANER +1 202 879 5944 +1 202 879 5200 christopher.maner@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MADELYN A. MORRIS +1 212 446 4680 +1 212 446 6460 Madelyn.Morris@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED UZOMA N. NKWONTA +1 202 879 5259 +1 202 879 5200 uzoma.nkwonta@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bridget Kathleen O'Connor +1 202 879 5048 +1 202 879 5200 boconnor@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIMBERLY D. RANCOUR +1 202 879 5931 +1 202 879 5200 kimberly.rancour@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JODI K. WU +1 202 879 5926 +1 202 879 5200 jodi.wu@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas D. Yannucci +1 202 879 5056 +1 202 879 2115 tyannucci@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew G. Pruden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ADAM STEIN +1 919 240 7089 +1 919 240 7822 astein@tinfulton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Central University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED IRVING JOYNER +1 919 560 6293 +1 919 530 6339 ijoyner@nccu.edu
No Logo MARY PERRY, Plaintiff
No Logo NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, Plaintiff
No Logo NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Winn Allen +1 202 879 5078 +1 202 654 9648 winn.allen@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan M. Davies +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 susan.davies@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Thomas Donovan +1 202 879 5174 +1 202 879 5200 daniel.donovan@dc.kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIMBERLY D. KNUDSON +1 202 879 5931 +1 202 879 5200 kimberly.knudson@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED UZOMA N. NKWONTA +1 202 879 5259 +1 202 879 5200 uzoma.nkwonta@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JODI K. WU +1 202 879 5926 +1 202 879 5200 jodi.wu@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas D. Yannucci +1 202 879 5056 +1 202 879 2115 tyannucci@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew G. Pruden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ADAM STEIN +1 919 240 7089 +1 919 240 7822 astein@tinfulton.com
No Logo ROSANELL EATON, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo JOSHUA B. HOWARD, Defendant
No Logo JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, Defendant
No Logo KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip J. Strach +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 phil.strach@ogletree.com
No Logo MAJA KRICKER, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BOWERS LAW OFFICE LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KARL S. BOWERS +1 803 260 4124 butch@butchbowers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo PAUL J. FOLEY, Defendant
No Logo RHONDA K. AMOROSO, Defendant
No Logo DAVID R. LEWIS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo HARRY WARREN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo JAMES BOLES, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo Larry Pittman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo PHILIP E. BERGER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo RALPH E HISE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo ROBERT A. RUCHO, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo RUTH SAMUELSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo THOM GOOLSBY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo THOM TILLIS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo TIM MOORE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo TOM APODACA, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
No Logo TOM MURRY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
United States of America United States of America, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ernest Alan McFarland +1 202 307 6552 +1 202 307 3961 ernest.a.mcfarland@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Meza +1 202 305 0132 +1 202 307 3961 catherine.meza@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Albert Russ, IV +1 202 353 7738 john.russ@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (702) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Motions Submitted
Motions Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: JOINT MOTION Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. ([498] in 1:13cv660, [507] in 1:13cv658) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660(Engle, Anita)
    LREF
    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
    Set/Response Deadline: re (487 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Cost and Fees : Responses due by 8/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Motion for Cost and Fees
      JOINT MOTION Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re (497 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Cost and Fees filed by JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JOHN DOE 2, FAITH JACKSON, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ROSANELL EATON, JOHN DOE 1, MARIA PALMER, ARMENTA EATON, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, JANE DOE 1, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, JOHN DOE 3, (485 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, GOLDIE WELLS, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, SARA STOHLER, KAY BRANDON, HUGH STOHLER, OCTAVIA RAINEY, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, (487 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Cost and Fees filed by NANCY LUND, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BRIAN M. MILLER, LOUIS M. DUKE, EBONY N. WEST, BECKY HURLEY MOCK filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 8/9/2018 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(PETERS, ALEXANDER) Modified on 7/27/2018 to correct event type to a motion (Taylor, Abby).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Exhibit
        EXHIBITS from the motion hearing held July 7, 2014 to July 10, 2014, and the Exhibits from the bench trials held July 13, 2015 to July 31, 2015 and January 25, 2016 to February 1, 2016 are Destroyed pursuant to Local Rule 79.4(c) and Letter filed 6/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
          ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 06/13/2018. Upon this court's review of the Third Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, after full consideration of all matters brought before the court regarding the Motion, and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The motion is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline for filing any response, objection, or reply to Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to July 26, 2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018, Terminated: 6/13/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
            Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(PETERS, ALEXANDER)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Motions Submitted
              Motions Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Costs ([496] in 1:13cv660, [505] in 1:13cv658). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660(Engle, Anita)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Exhibit
                Exhibit Letter Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4 regarding disposition of exhibits. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                  ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 05/09/2018. Before the court is the Second Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. After full consideration of all matters brought before the court regarding the motion and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The motion is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline for filing any response, objection, or reply to Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to June 11, 2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018, Terminated: 5/9/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(PETERS, ALEXANDER)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Motions Submitted
                      Motion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs ([502] in 1:13cv658, [493] in 1:13cv660) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13CV861(Engle, Anita)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                        ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 4/9/2018. The Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline for filing any response, objection, or reply to Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to May 9, 2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Daniel, J)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 4/9/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (485 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Attorney Fees , (497 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Cost and Fees , (487 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Cost and Fees by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(PETERS, ALEXANDER)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Motions Submitted
                            Motions Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Extension of Time ([500] in 1:13cv658, [491] in 1:13cv660) to File Response/Reply as to MOTION for Attorney Fees ([485] in 1:13cv660), and MOTION for Cost and Fees ([497] in 1:13cv658 and [487] in 1:13cv660) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660(Engle, Anita)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 CORRECTED DOCUMENT
                              Corrected document re [498] Memorandum,,,. (GLICK, MICHAEL)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 MEMORANDUM
                                MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY re [497] MOTION for Cost and Fees filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (GLICK, MICHAEL)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for Cost and FeesCourt Filing
                                  MOTION for Cost and Fees by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. Response to Motion due by 4/9/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of M. Glick, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of P. Hair, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Declaration of I. Joyner, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Declaration of D. Lieberman, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Declaration of D. Judge, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Statement of Consultation, # (7) Text of Proposed Order)(GLICK, MICHAEL) (Attachment 7 replaced on 3/20/2018) (Sheets, Jamie).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Bill of Costs
                                    BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 4/2/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Memorandum in Support of NC NAACP Plaintiffs' Bill of Taxable Costs, # (2) Affidavit of M. Glick with Appendixes A-B)(GLICK, MICHAEL)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                      ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 03/09/2018, granting [494] Motion for Extension of Time To File. Plaintiffs' deadline for filing all documents related to attorneys fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to Monday, March 19, 2018. (Taylor, Abby)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018, Terminated: 3/9/2018 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until March 19, 2018 by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Motions Submitted
                                          Motions Submitted: [494] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER- (Williamson, Wanda)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                            ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 02/13/2018, granting ([492]) Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion in case 1:13-cv-00658-TDS- JEP; granting ([480]) Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion in case 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP. Plaintiffs' deadline for filing all documents related to attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to Monday, March 12, 2018. The deadlines for filing any response, objection, or reply to Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) shall be calculated according to the Local Civil Rules of the Middle District of North Carolina. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018, Terminated: 2/13/2018 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY File for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until March 12, 2018 by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                Motions Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Costs ([480] in 1:13cv660 and [492] in 1:13cv658). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660(Engle, Anita)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                  ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/04/2017, granting (490) Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion in case 1:13-cv-00658-TDS- JEP; granting (478) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:13-cv- 00660-TDS-JEP. Plaintiffs' deadline for filing all documents related to attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to Monday, February 12, 2018. The deadlines for filing any response, objection, or reply to Plaintiffs requests for attorneys fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) shall be calculated according to the Local Civil Rules of the Middle District of North Carolina. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017, Terminated: 12/4/2017 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Taxable and Non-Taxable until February 12, 2018 by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                      Motions Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (Taxable and Non-Taxable) ([478] in 1:13cv660) and Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion ([490] in 1:13cv658). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13CV861(Engle, Anita)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                        ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/02/2017, that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' deadline for filing all documents related to attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to December 4, 2017. The deadlines for filing any response, objection, or reply to Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) shall be calculated according to the Local Civil Rules of the Middle District of North Carolina. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017, Terminated: 10/2/2017 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until 12/04/2017 by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                            Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion ([488] in 1:13cv658 and [476] in 1:13cv660) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                              ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 07/11/2017, that the motion of the Private Plaintiffs (Doc. [486 ] in case No 13cv658) is GRANTED. The Private Plaintiffs' deadline for filing all documents related to attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to September 29, 2017. The deadlines for filing any response, objection, or reply to the Private Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) shall be calculated according to the Local Civil Rules of the Middle District of North Carolina. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until 9/29/2017 ([486] in 1:13cv658) and Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until 9/29/2017 ([474] in 1:13cv660) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660(Engle, Anita)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2017 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until 9/29/2017 by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                    ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 06/02/2017. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' deadline for filing all documents related to attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to July 14, 2017. The deadlines for filing any response, objection, or reply to Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) shall be calculated according to the Local Civil Rules of the Middle District of North Carolina. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017, Terminated: 6/2/2017 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees/Costs until 7/14/17 by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                        Motions Submitted: [484] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER- (Williamson, Wanda)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Appeal Remark
                                                                          SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari denied. 05/15/2017 [16-1468, 16-1469, 16-1474, 16-1529] sjcrumpton (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                            ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 01/23/2017, that the Motion to Withdraw is granted, and Adam Stein shall be discharged as counsel for Plaintiffs. Remaining counsel of record for Plaintiffs shall continue as counsel for Plaintiffs in this matter, and Mr. Irving Joyner will remain as LR 83.1 counsel for the NAACP Plaintiffs in matter 1:13-cv-658. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017, Terminated: 1/23/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                              Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ADAM STEIN by on behalf of BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (STEIN, ADAM)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ADAM STEIN ([457] in 1:13cv861, [481] in 1:13cv658 and [470] in 1:13cv660). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                  ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 01/06/2017, that the Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court will remove Robert C. Stephens from the electronic distribution list. re (478) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS terminated in case 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP; re (468) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS terminated in case 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP; re (455) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS terminated in case 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                    Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS ([478] in 1:13cv658, [468] in 1:13cv660 and [455] in 1:13cv861) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS by on behalf of PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY. Responses due by 1/18/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(STEPHENS, ROBERT)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                        Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ADAM STEIN ([477] in 1:13cv658, [467] in 1:13cv660 and [454] in 1:13cv861). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 1/23/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ADAM STEIN by on behalf of BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(STEIN, ADAM)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                            ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/19/2016 granting (475) Consent Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion (465 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) as set out herein. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                              Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion ([475] in 1:13cv658 and [465] in 1:13cv660) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY to File for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                  RULE 42(b) MANDATE of USCA as to (447 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal that this court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42 (b) takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41 (a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. USCA No. 16-2193. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 USCA order
                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA as to ([447] in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, that upon consideration of the motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and there appearing no opposition, the court grants the motion. USCA No. 16-2193. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA that upon review of submissions relative to the motion for injunction pending appeal, the court denies the motion. Upon consideration of the unopposed motions to exceed length limitations, the court grants the motions. Entered at the direction of Judge Motz with the concurrence of Judge Wynn and Judge Floyd. No. 16-2193. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re (459 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 469 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 447 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal filed by BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NANCY J. LUND, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LYNNE M. WALTER, BRIAN M. MILLER, LOUIS M. DUKE, EBONY N. WEST. USCA Case MANAGER: RJ Warren. USCA Case Number 16-2193. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                          Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (459 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 469 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 447 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/16/2016, Entered: 10/16/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (445 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Order, by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0418-2004711. (SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/15/2016, Entered: 10/15/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Transcript of Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Order
                                                                                                                ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/13/2016, that the motion to enforce injunction and request to show cause (Doc. [439], [440] in Case 1:13CV861) are DENIED. The court warns, however, that merely because the movants have failed to demonstrate a violation of this court's injunction warranting contempt does not permit CBOEs or the SBOE who may disagree with the court's ruling implementing the Fourth Circuit's decision to engage in conduct that otherwise constitutes a violation of the Voting Rights Act and the Constitution. Such conduct will subject the participants to separate litigation for appropriate relief. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 10/11/2016 on Duke Intervenor Plaintiffs' Emergency MOTION to Enforce Injunction. Participating in the Telephone Conference were: Attorneys Glick and Hair for NAACP Plaintiffs, Attorneys Riggs and Earls for League of Women Voters Plaintiffs, Attorneys Callais, Devaney and Mackie for Duke Intervenor Plaintiffs, AUSA Beck and Attorney Meza for Plaintiff United States and Attorneys Peters, Bowers, McKnight, Strach, Farr and Stephens for State Defendants. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephonic Notice
                                                                                                                    Electronic Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 10/11/2016 at 5:00 p.m. before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE: Emergency MOTION to Enforce Injunction filed by Duke Intervenor Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re Motions Submitted filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 10/24/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-Declaration of Strach, # (2) Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Collicutt) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Order
                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/03/2016 that Defendants submit any response to Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Enforce the Injunction by 3:00 p.m. Friday, October 7, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                          Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Emergency MOTION to Enforce Injunction ([461] in 1:13cv658, [439] in 1:13cv861, and [451] in 1:13cv660) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/1/2016, Entered: 10/1/2016 Declaration
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Amanda R. Callais re (439 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Emergency MOTION to Enforce Injunction by Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Dr. Jonathan Rodden, # (2) Exhibit 2 - North Carolina State Board of Elections Memorandum 2016-11, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel dated August 5, 2016, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Email from Woodhouse posted August 17, 2016, # (5) Exhibit 5 - WRAL article dated August 17, 2016, # (6) Exhibit 6 - News & Observer article dated August 17, 2016, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Transcripts from North Carolina State Board of Elections, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel dated September 6, 2016, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Letter from State Board of Elections dated September 13, 2016, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel dated September 21, 2016, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Letter from North Carolina State Board of Elections dated September 23, 2016, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from One-Stop Voting Sites for 2012 General Election, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Letter from Kelly Shore dated August 30, 2016, # (14) Exhibit 14 - World Atlas article, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Share of EV by Race in Nash County at all Sites in 2012, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Share of EV by Race in Nash County at Braswell Sites in 2014, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Share of EV by Race in Nash County at all Sites in 2014, # (18) Exhibit 18 - Letter from NC Democratic Party dated September 5, 2016, # (19) Exhibit 19 - March 2016 Primary-One-Stop Daily Turnout by Race from New Hanover County, # (20) Exhibit 20 - Petition in Support of Expanding Voting Opportunities, # (21) Exhibit 21 - March 2016 Primary Votes per Hour from New Hanover County, # (22) Exhibit 22 - Non-Unanimous One-Stop Plan from Mecklenburg County, # (23) Exhibit 23 - Mecklenburg County One-Stop Plan Data from 2012, # (24) Exhibit 24 - Forsyth County Board of Elections Early Voting Schedule, # (25) Exhibit 25 - Share of EV by Race in Forsyth County in 2012, # (26) Exhibit 26 - Forsyth County One-Stop Voting Plan Data from 2012, # (27) Exhibit 27 - Winston-Salem Chronicle article dated October 25, 2012, # (28) Exhibit 28 - Winston-Salem State University College Portrait, # (29) Exhibit 29 - Journal Now article dated August 12, 2016, # (30) Exhibit 30 - Journal Now article dated September 8, 2016, # (31) Exhibit 31 - Greensboro.com article dated August 5, 2016, # (32) Exhibit 32 - NC Voter Statistics Report, # (33) Exhibit 33 - Guilford County Early Voting Schedule, # (34) Exhibit 34 - Greensboro.com article dated August 8, 2016, # (35) Exhibit 35 - Guilford County One-Stop Voting Plan Data from 2012, # (36) Exhibit 36 - Share of EV by Race in Guilford County at all Sites in 2012, # (37) Exhibit 37 - NC Voter Statistics Report, # (38) Exhibit 38 - One-Stop Early Voting Schedule for Nash County, # (39) Exhibit 39 - Share of EV by Race in Nash County at all Sites and Braswell) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 10/1/2016, Entered: 10/1/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST re (439 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Emergency MOTION to Enforce Injunction - Notice of Filing of Witness Declarations (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Willard Bass, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Angela Bryant, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Fleming El-Amin, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Jemma Johnson, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Deborah Maxwell, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Thomas Pollard, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Richard Poole, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Gail Robinson Mitchell, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Myra Slone, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Declaration of T. Anthony Spearman, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Linda Sutton, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Marquest Thompson, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Jane Whitley) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 10/1/2016, Entered: 10/1/2016 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST re (439 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Emergency MOTION to Enforce Injunction filed by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 10/1/2016, Entered: 10/1/2016, Terminated: 12/28/2016 motion to enforce
                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION to Enforce Injunction by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Responses due by 10/27/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/12/2016, that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' deadline for filing all documents related to attorneys' fees and costs (taxable and nontaxable) is extended to December 15, 2016. FINALLY, that Defendants' deadline for filing any response or objection to Plaintiffs' requests for attorneys' fees and costs is extended to January 20, 2017. Response or Objection due by 1/20/2017. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                      Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: [459] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until 12/15/2016. (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016, Terminated: 9/12/2016 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until 12/15/2016 by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING COUNSELS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 09/09/2016, that Motion for Leave to Withdraw as counsel of record for the NAACP Plaintiffs is GRANTED. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                            Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Edward A. Hailes, Denise D. Lieberman, Donita Judge and Jadine Johnson. ([436] in 1:13cv861, [457] in 1:13cv658, [447] in 1:13cv660) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016, Terminated: 9/9/2016 Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DENISE D LIEBERMAN Edward A. Hailes, Denise D. Lieberman, Donita Judge and Jadine Johnson by on behalf of BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Notice to Plaintiffs, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(LIEBERMAN, DENISE) Modified on 8/17/2016 (Sheets, Jamie).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                USCA ORDER denying the State's request to recall and stay Mandate. (USCA Case numbers: 16-1468, 16-1469, 16-1474, 16-1529) (Garland, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 judgment
                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 07/29/2016; In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion, Judgment, and Mandate of the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals entered this date, the Defendants are ENJOINED from implementing Session Law 2013-381's and Session Law 2015-103's requirements for photo ID and changes to early voting, same-day registration, out-of-precinct voting, and preregistration as set out. Any motion for recovery of costs and/or attorneys' fees shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, et al. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Garland, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA: The judgment of this court, entered July 29, 2016, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (USCA Case numbers: 16-1468, 16-1469, 16-1474, 16-1529) (Garland, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                      USCA JUDGMENT: In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is reversed. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (USCA Case number: 16-1468, 16-1469, 16-1474, 16-1529) (Garland, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                        USCA OPINION Reversed and remanded by published opinion. (USCA Case numbers: 16-1468, 16-1469, 16-1474, 16-1529) (Garland, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 451 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                          USCA ORDER. Upon consideration of Appellants motion for stay pending appeal, the Court extends the existing stay ordered by the district court until further order of this Court. The Court recognizes the importance of ensuring each person's right to vote and the States right to preserve the integrity of the election process. See Purcell v. Gonzalez, 549 U.S. 1 (2006). Accordingly, at oral argument the parties should be prepared to inform the Court of the timeline of implementing or dismantling electoral procedures and the rationale for that timeline, i.e.,the time required to either implement or dismantle each voting mechanism. 16-1468(L). (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                            USCA ORDER. The court consolidates Case No. 16-1468(L) and Case No. 16-1529. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary case. The previously issued expedited briefing schedule remains in effect. The briefs and appendix must conform to the Fourth Circuit Brief & Appendix Requirements. All parties to a side must join in a single brief, even in consolidated cases, unless the court has granted a motion for leave to file separate briefs pursuant to Local Rules 28(a) and 28(d).(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Order
                                                                                                                                                              USCA ORDER. The court consolidates Case No. 16-1468(L) and Case No. 16-1474. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary case. re (433 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, filed by BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NANCY J. LUND, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LYNNE M. WALTER, BRIAN M. MILLER, LOUIS M. DUKE, EBONY N. WEST, (435 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, filed by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, GOLDIE WELLS, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, SARA STOHLER, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, HUGH STOHLER, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, (431 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal,, filed by JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JOHN DOE 2, FAITH JACKSON, JANE DOE 2, ROSANELL EATON, JOHN DOE 1, ARMENTA EATON, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, JOHN DOE 3, JANE DOE 3, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, CAROLYN COLEMAN, MARY PERRY, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (426 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                  USCA ORDER. The court consolidates Case No. 16-1468(L) and Case No. 16-1469. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary case as to (433 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, filed by BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NANCY J. LUND, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LYNNE M. WALTER, BRIAN M. MILLER, LOUIS M. DUKE, EBONY N. WEST, (431 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal,, filed by JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JOHN DOE 2, FAITH JACKSON, JANE DOE 2, ROSANELL EATON, JOHN DOE 1, ARMENTA EATON, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, JOHN DOE 3, JANE DOE 3, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JANE DOE 1, CAROLYN COLEMAN, MARY PERRY, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0418-1898019. (RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re [441] Notice of Appeal, filed by JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JOHN DOE 2, FAITH JACKSON, JANE DOE 2, ROSANELL EATON, JOHN DOE 1, ARMENTA EATON, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, JOHN DOE 3, JANE DOE 3, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JANE DOE 1, CAROLYN COLEMAN, MARY PERRY, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER. USCA Case Number 16-1468. Case Manager: RJ Warren. (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (424 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal. (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (421 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Judgment, (420 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Memorandum and Opinion, by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0418-1897759. (SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (422 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal. (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (429 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 439 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 420 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Memorandum and Opinion. (421 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 430 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 440 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Judgment, by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0418-1897505. (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 4/25/2016. For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed contemporaneously with this Judgment, all claims of Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants, but that this court's injunction against the repeal of same-day registration and out-of-precinct provisional voting entered October 3, 2014, shall remain in effect until June 8, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 439 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT Regarding Testimony of Representative Rick Glazier by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Trial, Volume VI held on 02/01/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing in paper form with the Clerk's Office Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Trial, Volume V held on 01/29/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Exhibits by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PX1101 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Tracy Bucholtz re DMV Free ID Card Incident - Yancey County, # (2) Exhibit PX1102 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Jennifer Faulkner re Another possible Scotland Neck DMV Mobile Unit Issue, # (3) Exhibit PX1103 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Jennifer Faulkner re DMV Mobile Unit Issue, # (4) Exhibit PX1104 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Jennifer Faulkner re DMV Voter ID reimbursement request, # (5) Exhibit PX1105 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Tracy Bucholtz re Appointments, etc., # (6) Exhibit PX1106 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Tracy Bucholtz re No Fee ID Card FAQ Sheet, # (7) Exhibit PX1107 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Joyce Brafford re NCBA Letter, # (8) Exhibit PX1108 NCBA Letter attachment to email from Brian LiVecchi to Joyce Brafford re NCBA Letter, # (9) Exhibit PX1109 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Ted Fitzgerald, Brian Neesby re New State BOE Mailing for Voter ID, # (10) Exhibit PX1110 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Tracy Bucholtz re State ID, # (11) Exhibit PX1111 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Jennifer Faulkner re ID info cards, # (12) Exhibit PX1112 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Ted Fitzgerald re ID for seniors, # (13) Exhibit PX1113 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Ted Fitzgerald, Jennifer Faulkner re Website FAQ Edits, # (14) Exhibit PX1114 Email from Brian LiVecchi to William Smith, Jennifer Faulkner, Tracy Bucholtz re Greensboro DMV Issue - Cassandra Kimber, # (15) Exhibit PX1115 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Jennifer Faulkner re DMV Mobile Unit, # (16) Exhibit PX1116 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Ted Fitzgerald re DMV Voter ID Complaint, # (17) Exhibit PX1117 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Jennifer Faulkner re Voter ID, # (18) Exhibit PX1118 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Joshua Lawson re clarification as to training for poll workers, # (19) Exhibit PX1119 Email from Gerry Cohen to Joshua Lawson re Reasonable Impediment affidavits, # (20) Exhibit PX1120 Email from Brian LiVecchi to Tracy Bucholtz re Reimbursement Request Ms. April Adams, # (21) Exhibit PX1121 Provisional Ballot Exercises training presentation, # (22) Exhibit PX1122 Be Recognized 30 Second Radio Ad 3, # (23) Exhibit PX1123 Be Recognized 30 Second Radio Ad 4, # (24) Exhibit PX1124 Be Recognized 30 Second TV Ad, # (25) Exhibit PX1125 Be Recognized 60 Second TV Ad, # (26) Exhibit PX1126 Pre-Printed Reasonable Impediment Declaration Form, # (27) Exhibit PX1127 Statewide Elections Information Management System (on-demand) Reasonable Impediment Declaration Form, # (28) Exhibit PX1128 Provisional Ballot Application, # (29) Exhibit PX1129 Evidentiary Challenge Form, # (30) Exhibit PX1130 2016 SBOE Voting Site Training Video, # (31) Exhibit PX1131 NC Election Official Training Voter ID Training Video, # (32) Exhibit PX1132 News & Observer article entitled NC DMV says it messed up by rejecting 86-year-old woman seeking voter ID) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT (Consented) Supplemental Exhibits Submitted Pursuant to the Court's 01/14/2016 Order by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Related document: (430 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 420 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 411 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Exhibit,,, filed by JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, JAMES BAKER, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, PAUL J. FOLEY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit DX 553 - Part 1, # (2) Exhibit DX 553 - Part 2, # (3) Exhibit DX 553 - Part 3, # (4) Exhibit DX 553 - Part 4, # (5) Exhibit DX 553 - Part 5) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT (Consented) Supplemental Exhibits Submitted Pursuant to the Court's 01/14/2016 ORder by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit DX 546, # (2) Exhibit DX 547, # (3) Exhibit DX 548, # (4) Exhibit DX 549, # (5) Exhibit DX 550, # (6) Exhibit DX 551, # (7) Exhibit DX 552, # (8) Exhibit DX 554, # (9) Exhibit DX 555, # (10) Exhibit DX 556) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Trial, Volume IV held on 01/28/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Trial, Volume III held on 01/27/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Trial, Volume II held on 01/26/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Trial, Volume I held on 01/25/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 02/02/2016, that the motion to seal (Doc. [372] in case 1:13CV658; Doc. [354] in case 1:13CV861; Doc. [365] in case 1:13CV660) is DENIED for failure to provide a supporting brief, pursuant to Local Rule 5.4(d). Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit Receipt pursuant to Local Rule 79.4 for Plaintiffs Exhibits Not Admitted at Trial Commencing 1/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Bench Trial Completed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (Day 6) completed on 2/1/2016. Attorneys Mellett, Cooper, Ryan, and Meza appeared on behalf of the United States and Attorneys Glick, Lieberman and Hair appeared on behalf of NAACP Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, Strach, McKnight, Peters and Bowers appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Defendants continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list) and rested. Closing arguments made. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law of not more than 75 pages per side for Parties participating in this aspect of the trial due 2/24/2016. Written Opinion forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 2/1/2016 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (Day 5) held on 1/29/2016. Attorneys Mellett, Ryan, Garrett, Shapiro and Cooper appeared on behalf of the United States and Attorneys Lieberman, Hair, and Glick appeared on behalf of NAACP Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, Strach, McKnight, Peters and Bowers appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Defendants continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). United States moves to strike Dr. Thernstrom's testimony regarding the "no match list." Parties agree to strike from the Expert Report of Dr. Thernstrom parts of Section 7 as discussed in open court. Based on this agreement, NAACP Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Report of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom ([387] in Case No. 1:13CV861, [407] in Case No. 1:13CV658 and [397] in 1:13CV660) is deemed MOOT and NAACP Plaintiffs rest on their cross examination. United States WITHDRAWS its Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom ([389] in Case No. 1:13CV861, [409] in Case No. 1:13CV658 and [399] in Case No. 1:13CV660). Bench trial set to resume 2/1/2016 at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861 (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 1/29/2016 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (Day 4) held on 1/28/2016. Attorneys Mellett, Ryan, Garrett and Shapiro appeared on behalf of the United States and Attorneys Lieberman, Maner, Hair, Glick, Joyner and Swain-McSurely appeared on behalf of NAACP Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, Strach, McKnight, Peters and Bowers appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list) and rested. Defendants presented evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial set to resume 1/29/2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861 (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 1/28/2016 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (Day 3) held on 1/27/2016. Attorneys Ryan, Meza, Mellett and Shapiro appeared on behalf of the United States and Attorneys Lieberman, Maner, Hair, Glick, Morris and Song appeared on behalf of NAACP Plaintiffs. Attorneys Strach, McKnight and Bowers appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial set to resume 1/28/2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861 (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 1/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (Day 2) held on 1/26/2016. Attorneys Ryan, Cooper and Mellett appeared on behalf of the United States and Attorneys Donovan, Hair and Glick appeared on behalf of NAACP Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, Strach, Peters, McKnight and Bowers appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial set to resume 1/27/2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861 (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 1/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (Day 1) held on 1/25/2016. Attorneys Glick, Maner, Morris and Hair appeared on behalf of NAACP Plaintiffs, and Attorneys Meza, Mellett, Shapiro and Cooper appeared on behalf of Plaintiff United States. Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. The Court defers ruling on United States MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom ([399] in Case No. 1:13CV660, [409] in Case No. 1:13CV658 and [389] in Case No. 1:13CV861). Opening Statements presented. Plaintiffs presented evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 1/26/2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 Objection - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION - Other re (385 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 405 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 395 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures, by Plaintiffs UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Joint Objections to Defendants' Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 Objection - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION - Other re (384 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 394 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 404 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures,, by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, JAMES BAKER, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Objections to Plaintiffs' Joint Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT re (404 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures,, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Designations of Deposition Testimony by Plaintiffs UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Lasher) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING DUKE INTERVENOR-PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM FURTHER PARTICIPATION IN PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEEDINGS RELATING TO THEIR VOTER ID CLAIMS signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 01/21/2016, that the Duke-Intervenor Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. [397] in case 1:13cv861) is GRANTED, and Intervenors are excused from further pretrial and trial proceedings in these cases. Intervenors' claims will be determined based on the record submitted to date, and they have acknowledged that they will not participate in post-trial briefing for the trial from which they elected to be excused. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re ([407] in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, [409] in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 397 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 399 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 387 in 1:13-cv-00681-TDS-JEP, 389 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 2/8/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 1/21/2016 to add docket entry relationships for all related cases. (Sheets, Jamie).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (417 in 1:13cv658, 407 in 1:13cv660, 397 in 1:13cv861, ) MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM FURTHER PARTICIPATION IN PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEEDINGS RELATING TO THEIR VOTER ID CLAIMS filed by Duke Intervenor-Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016, Terminated: 1/21/2016 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM FURTHER PARTICIPATION IN PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEEDINGS RELATING TO THEIR VOTER ID CLAIMS by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN J. SONG on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SONG, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceeding held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 1/20/2016 Re: MOTION for Clarification of Pretrial Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (393 in 1:13cv861, 403 in 1:13cv660, and 413 in 1:13cv658) and Notice of Filing of Correspondence to Court (405 in 1:13cv660, 415 in 1:13cv658, and 395 in 1:13cv861). Attorneys Glick, Donovan, Hair, Cooper, Eppsteiner, Kaul, and O'Hale participated on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, McKnight, Peters and Bowers participated on behalf of the Defendants. (Court Reporter Lori Russell.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita) Modified on 1/21/2016 to include pleading numbers (Engle, Anita).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephonic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 5:00 PM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861 (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Referred to Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE: (405 in 1:13cv660, 415 in 1:13cv658, 395 in 1:13cv861) Notice of Filing of Correspondence to Court. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (393 in 1:13cv861, 403 in 1:13cv660, 413 in 1:13cv658) MOTION for Clarification of Pretrial Order. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST of Filing of Correspondence to Court (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Letter from Bruce Spiva to Judge Schroeder, Dated 1-19-2016) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 414 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016, Terminated: 1/21/2016 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Clarification of Pretrial Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, JAMES BAKER, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re (399 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom . (Attachments: # (1) Dr. Stephan Thernstrom's Dec. 30, 2015 Report) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(SHAPIRO, AVNER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: 1/18/2016, Terminated: 1/29/2016 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 1/21/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(SHAPIRO, AVNER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: 1/18/2016 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY re (387 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 397 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 407 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Report of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: 1/18/2016, Terminated: 1/29/2016 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Report of Dr. Stephan Thernstrom by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Responses due by 1/22/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT re (384 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 394 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 404 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures,, Plaintiffs' Designations of Deposition Testimony: Transcript Excerpts by Plaintiffs UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Andino, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Boyd-Malette, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Brown, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Bucholtz, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Coleman, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Dishong, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Eaton, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Foster, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Hoard, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Kent, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Manley, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Phillips, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Rouse, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Sanchez, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Thomas, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Thorpe, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Vashchenko, # (18) Exhibit 18 - Webb) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Final Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Deposition Exhibits Defendants May Use at Trial) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Final Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FINAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Witness List, # (2) Exhibit B - Deposition Designations, # (3) Exhibit C - Exhibit List (Previously Admitted), # (4) Exhibit D - Exhibit List (Not Previously Admitted)) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 01/15/2016. For the reasons set forth herein, NAACP Plaintiffs' motion to preliminarily enjoin SL 2013-381's photo-ID requirement, as amended by SL 2015- 103 and its reasonable impediment exception, (Doc. [390]) will be DENIED. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 1/14/2016 that the North Carolina NAACP Plaintiffs' motion to postpone the trial ([400] in case 1:13cv658; [390] in case 1:13cv660; and [380] 1:13cv861) is DENIED. Trial will commence on January 25, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom # 1 in Winston-Salem. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (390 in 1:13cv660, 400 in 1:13cv658, 380 in 1:13cv861) MOTION for Extension of Time. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY re (390 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 380 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 400 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Extension of Time filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016, Terminated: 1/14/2016 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT re Telephone Conference, Joint Report re Trial Presentation and Record by Plaintiffs UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2016. Attorneys Stein, O'Connor, Donovan, Judge, Joyner, Hair, Eppsteiner and Meza participated on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Peters and Bowers participated on behalf of the Defendants. By the close of business on 1/8/2016, Parties are to update the Court as to their request for trial hours and Parties are to meet and confer and notify the Court as to whether the Parties have reached an agreement regarding the scope of evidence to be supplemented to the trial record after the start of trial with respect to the Defendants' upcoming advertisements and contemplated schedule for training in February. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (371 in 1:13cv861, 390 in 1:13cv658, 381 in 1:13cv660). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Order on motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY DISCOVERY DEADLINES signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 01/05/2016, that the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED, as set out above. With more than two and one-half years to prepare for trial, the parties have regrettably found it necessary to file responses to motions in limine and Daubert motions on the business day before trial (despite the burden this will place on the court and its staff). FURTHER, that the parties shall meet and confer before filing any motion in limine or Daubert motion in an effort to reach agreement to avoid unnecessary motion practice, and if they cannot resolve their differences, they shall provide a report on the results of that effort in any motion and/or response filed, which also must be as concise as possible in recognition of the onslaught of paper with which the parties have already inundated the court in these cases. re (397) Motion to Modify in case 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP; (387) Motion to Modify in case 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP; (377) Motion to Modify in case 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016, Terminated: 1/5/2016 Motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Modify Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Motion in Limine or Daubert Motion due by 01/18/2016. Responses due by 1/22/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephonic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 10:00 AM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (397 in 1:13cv658, 377 in 1:13cv861, 387 in 1:13cv660) Joint MOTION to Modify Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: 12/29/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Regarding Photo ID Claims by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - E-mail) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY, to Response to (371 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 390 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 381 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit S, # (2) Exhibit T, # (3) Exhibit U, # (4) Exhibit V, # (5) Exhibit W, # (6) Exhibit X) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [390] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 12/31/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kim Westbrook Strach (December 11, 2015))(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Status Conference held on 12/2/215, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/3/2015. As a result of the telephonic hearing on December 2, 2015, IT IS ORDERED that all Plaintiffs are to serve revised Initial Disclosures to Defendants by 12/4/2015 to specify those individuals who will be testifying about the Reasonable Impediment Declaration aspect of SL 2013-381, as amended by SL 2015-103, and to indicate the substance of the individuals testimony sufficient to give fair notice of the anticipated testimony and to enable Defendants to make a determination whether to depose each individual. If Defendants, after receiving these revised Initial Disclosures, are not satisfied, the parties shall meet and confer in an effort to resolve any differences. If after that Defendants contend that the disclosures render the January 25, 2016 trial date unreasonable, Defendants shall timely renew their objection to the trial date and provide specific grounds for such motion. Defendants' pending objections to the Pretrial Schedule (Doc. 369 in case 1:13cv861) are therefore considered MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, when serving expert reports, the parties shall serve a separate statement indicating which witnesses address the Reasonable Impediment Declaration and what portions of each expert's report addresses the Reasonable Impediment Declaration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer and submit to the court by 12/29/2015, a joint report articulating whether there has been any narrowing of the issues regarding Plaintiff NC NAACP's motion for preliminary injunction and/or the remaining claim in this case relating to the Voter ID component of the law, and if so, what the parties contend remains in the case. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2015. Attorneys O'Connor, Glick, Lieberman, Judge, Hair, Stein, Eppsteiner, O'Hale, Meza and AUSA Beck Participated on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, Peters and Strach participated on behalf of Defendants. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv660, 1:13cv658, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephonic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL. Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2015 at 04:00 PM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 11/26/2015, Entered: 11/26/2015 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to Defendants' Objections to the Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(SHAPIRO, AVNER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY re (371 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015, Terminated: 1/15/2016 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Responses due by 12/18/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re (367 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice (Other), (366 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Statement,, filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, JAMES BAKER, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 12/7/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(PETERS, ALEXANDER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Notice of Trial Calendar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Trial Calendar Bench Trial set for 1/25/2016 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Williamson, Wanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Regarding Retention of January Trial Schedule Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT re Intention to Move for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, JOHN DOE 3, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ROSANELL EATON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, FAITH JACKSON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, CAROLYN COLEMAN, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, MARY PERRY, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 3, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2.(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 1/11/2016. Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 1/14/2016. Exhibit Lists and Deposition Designations due 1/15/2016. Pre-Trial Briefs due 1/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 11/4/2015. The court ADOPTS the Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiffs (Doc. 364 in case 1:13cv861; Doc. 382 in case 1:13cv658; Doc. 375 in case 1:13cv660) for these consolidated cases; provided, however, if Plaintiffs give notice no later than November 13, 2015 that they intend to move for preliminary injunction, then Defendants may timely object to the remainder of the pretrial schedule and propose an alternative schedule. SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Terminate Motion Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline terminated for MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (310 in 1:13cv660), (299 in 1:13cv861), and (316 in 1:13cv658). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015, Terminated: 11/4/2015 Rule 26f Report - Individual
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Responses due by 11/27/2015 by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-23-15, before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter Calhoun, Telephone number 336-332-6033. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Calhoun, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Motion Hearing and Status Conference held on 10/23/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Glick, Lieberman, Earls, Russ, Garrett and O'Hale appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, Peters and Bowers appeared on behalf of Defendants. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (310 in 1:13cv660), (299 in 1:13cv861), and (316 in 1:13cv658), is DENIED. Plaintiffs who made claims with respect to the Photo ID portion of the case may file an amended complaint by 11/6/2015. Defendants have 2 weeks to file a Response. Parties are to consult and propose a Rule 26(f) Pretrial Schedule within 10 days. Discovery is limited to the effect of the amended law on the claims in the amended complaint. Parties are to update Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures as to the amended claims. (Court Reporter Jane Calhoun.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Telephonic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Notice to counsel on 10/21/2015. Motion Hearing and Status Conference reset for 10/23/2015 at 10:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Regarding Voter Photo ID Claims by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re (358 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Status Report filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 10/26/2015. (Attachments: # (1) H.B. 373) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION to Seal Documents (354 in 1:13cv861, 372 in 1:13cv658, 365 in 1:13cv660). Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing and Status Conference set for 10/23/2015 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority by Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST, Plaintiffs UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Regarding Voter Photo ID Claims by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JOHN A. RUSS, IV is substituted as counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney SPENCER ROSS FISHER terminated. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Redacted Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Redacted Transcript of Trial/Day 3 held on July 15, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:13cv660, 1:13cv658, 1:13cv861(Nesbit, Brianna) Modified on 2/3/2016 to add date of redacted transcript (Engle, Anita). Modified to unseal on 2/16/2016 (Israel, Lisa).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Transcript Redaction Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript Redaction Request re (331 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Transcript,,,, by attorney EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1 - Requested Redaction) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015, Terminated: 2/2/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 10/2/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Order on Motion to supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE TRIAL RECORD signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 08/26/2015. This matter is before this court on Defendants' Consent Motion to Supplement the Trial Record (Doc. 370 in case no. 1:13CV658; Doc. 363 in case no. 1:13CV660; Doc. 352 in case no. 1:13CV861). For good cause shown, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the exhibits marked as DX 378 and DX 379 and attached to Defendants Motion are hereby added to the trial record in the above-captioned matters. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motions Submitted: (370 in 1:13cv658) Consent MOTION to Supplement The Trial Record, (363 in 1:13cv660) Consent MOTION to Supplement The Trial Record, and (352 in 1:13cv861) Consent MOTION to Supplement The Trial Record to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015, Terminated: 8/26/2015 Motion to supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Supplement The Trial Record by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 9/18/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit DX378 - 04.03.13 House Elections Committee Transcript, # (2) Exhibit DX379 - Designation of Rev Jimmie Hawkins, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motions Submitted: (345 in 1:13cv658, 338 in 1:13cv660, 327 in 1:13cv861) MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Exhibit BN-3 and to Strike Brian Neesby's Testimony Regarding Mail-Verification Failure Rates Among Preregistrants, (324 in 1:13cv861, 342 in 1:13cv658, 335 in 1:13cv660) MOTION to Exclude Certain Rebuttal Testimony, and (326 in 1:13cv861, 344 in 1:13cv658, 337 in 1:13cv660) MOTION to Exclude and Strike certain testimony of Brian Neesby to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re (324 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 342 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 335 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Certain Rebuttal Testimony by Dr. Allan Lichtman filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Replies due by 9/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re (327 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Exhibit BN-3 and to Strike Brian Neesby's Testimony Regarding Mail-Verification Failure Rates Among Preregistrants, Filed, (326 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude and Strike certain testimony of Brian Neesby filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Part 1-Degraffenreid Deposition, # (2) Exhibit B - Part 2-Degraffenreid Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR re (331 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Transcript,,,,. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix 1 - Proposed Redaction) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS is substituted as counsel for Defendants. Attorney KATHERINE A. MURPHY terminated. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(PETERS, ALEXANDER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RYAN, ELIZABETH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT for All Plaintiffs Regarding Photo ID by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Status Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS MEMORANDUM on the Effect of S.L. 2015-103 on the Voter Identification Claims by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Trial Day 15 held on 7/31/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Trial Day 14 held on 7/30/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Trial Day 13 held on 7/29/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Trial Day 12 held on 7/28/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Trial Day 11 held on 7/27/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Trial Day 10 held on 7/24/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Trial Day 9 held on 7/23/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Trial Day 8 held on 7/22/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Trial Day 7 held on 7/21/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Trial Day 6 held on 7/20/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Trial Day 5 held on 7/17/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP( Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Trial Day 4 held on 7/16/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Trial Day 2 held on 7/14/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Trial Day 1 held on 7/13/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST re (327 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Exhibit BN-3 and to Strike Brian Neesby's Testimony Regarding Mail-Verification Failure Rates Among Preregistrants, Filed filed by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Redacted 7-18-15 Depo Transcript of Brian Neesby) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015, Terminated: 4/25/2016 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Exhibit BN-3 and to Strike Brian Neesby's Testimony Regarding Mail-Verification Failure Rates Among Preregistrants, Filed by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Responses due by 9/3/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015, Terminated: 4/25/2016 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude and Strike certain testimony of Brian Neesby by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 9/3/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re (324 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Certain Rebuttal Testimony Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Unpublished Opinions) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015, Terminated: 4/25/2016 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Certain Rebuttal Testimony by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 9/3/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Bench Trial Completed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial completed on 7/31/2015. Attorneys Donovan, OConnor, Hair, Riggs, Earls, Russ, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Bowers, Peters, Murphy, Strach and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Closing arguments made. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law of not more than 150 pages due 8/17/2015. Written Opinion forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motions Submitted: (316 in 1:13cv658) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (310 in 1:13cv660) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , and (299 in 1:13cv861) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply BRIEF re (299 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit H.B. Rowe Co., Inc. v. Tippett, # (2) Exhibit Khakhn v. Holder) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(STRACH, PHILLIP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/31/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 14) continued from 7/29/2015 held on 7/30/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Glick, Riggs, Earls, Eppsteiner, Cooper, Meza, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Bowers, Peters, Murphy, Strach and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Defendants continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Oral Motion by Plaintiffs to exclude the testimony of Brian Neesby as undisclosed expert testimony. Court reserves ruling on Plaintiffs motion. Plaintiffs permitted 10 days to file a motion to strike with respect to the testimony of Brian Neesby and Defendants are permitted 10 days to respond. Defendants rested. Plaintiffs presented rebuttal evidence and rested. Oral Motion by Defendants to exclude the Mail Verification Analysis Testimony of Dr. Allan Lichtman. Court reserves ruling on Defendants motion. Defendants permitted 10 days to file a motion to strike with respect to the Mail Verification Analysis Testimony of Dr. Lichtman and Plaintiffs are permitted 10 days to respond. Bench trial to resume 7/31/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 13) continued from 7/28/2015 held on 7/29/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Hair, Riggs, Earls, Eppsteiner, Cooper, Garrett, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Bowers, Peters, Murphy Strach and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Defendants continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/30/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/29/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 12) continued from 7/27/2015 held on 7/28/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Hair, Riggs, Earls, Cooper, Ho, Russ, Fisher, Meza, Ryan, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Bowers, Peters, Murphy, Strach and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Defendants continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/29/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/28/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 11) continued from 7/24/2015 held on 7/27/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Riggs, Earls, Cooper, Ho, Russ, Fisher, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Bowers, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Defendants continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/28/2015 at 9:00 a.m.(Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/27/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 10) continued from 7/23/2015 held on 7/24/2015. Attorneys Donovan, O'Connor, Hair, Riggs, Earls, Cooper, Russ, Shapiro, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list) and rested. Defendants presented evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/27/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re (310 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Replies due by 8/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Judicial Notice by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(EPPSTEINER, GEORGE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re (316 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Replies due by 7/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re (310 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (299 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (316 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 8/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/24/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 9) continued from 7/22/2015 held on 7/23/2015. Attorneys Donovan, O'Connor, Maner, Lieberman, Riggs, Eppsteiner, Russ, Shapiro, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena of Sen. Bill Cook (326 in 1:13cv660, 315 in 1:13cv861, 333 in 1:13cv658) GRANTED. Bench trial to resume 7/24/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re (315 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Sen. Bill Cook filed by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Replies due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Article from Lumina News (PX0079)) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/23/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 8) continued from 7/21/2015 held on 7/22/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Hair, Joyner, Riggs, Earls, Eppsteiner, Russ, Fisher, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/23/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/22/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 7) continued from 7/20/2015 held on 7/21/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Hair, Riggs, Earls, Ho, Eppsteiner, Russ, Fisher, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/22/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearing: Bench Trial set to resume 7/21/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 6) continued from 7/17/2015 held on 7/20/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Hair, Judge, Riggs, Earls, Brook, Eppsteiner, Cooper, Russ, Fisher, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/21/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: 7/19/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, Movants Bill Cook, Bill Cook, Bill Cook re (315 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 333 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Sen. Bill Cook filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, Bill Cook, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: 7/19/2015, Terminated: 7/23/2015 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Sen. Bill Cook by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, Bill Cook. Responses due by 8/13/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs-Intervenors Subpoena to Sen. Bill Cook) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY re (324 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 331 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 313 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice (Other), (325 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 319 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 308 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice (Other), (309 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 292 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 303 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures, (304 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 293 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 310 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Statement, of Filing of Corrected Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations and Transcript Excerpt Together with Defendants' Counter-Designation Excerpt for Quisha Mallette (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Mallette) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial (day 5) continued from 7/16/2015 held on 7/17/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Glick, Riggs, Earls, Ho, Meza, Fisher, Kaul, and Spiva appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/20/2015 at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Hearing: Bench Trial to resume 7/17/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial held on 7/16/2015. Attorneys Donovan, OConnor, Hair, Riggs, Earls, Ho, Eppsteiner, Ryan, Garrett, Meza, Russ, Shapiro, Kaul, Spiva and OHale appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/17/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearing: Bench Trial to continue 7/16/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial held on 7/15/2015. Attorneys Donovan, OConnor, Hair, Ebenstein, Riggs, Eppsteiner, Garrett, Meza, Russ, Callais and Kaul appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs continued to present evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Hearing: Bench Trial set for 7/15/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial held on 7/14/2015. Attorneys Donovan, OConnor, Hair, Riggs, Eppsteiner, Garrett, Meza, Russ, Fisher, Shapiro and Kaul appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters, Murphy and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Plaintiffs presented evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Hearing: Bench Trial set for 7/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial held on 7/13/2015. Attorneys Donovan, Hair, Riggs, Kaul, Meza and Shapiro appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters and McKnight appeared on behalf of the Defendants. Opening Statements presented. Plaintiffs presented evidence (see witness/exhibit list). Bench trial to resume 7/14/2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/12/2015, Entered: 7/12/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY re (325 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 308 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 319 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice (Other), 304 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 293 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 310 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Statement, of Filing of Corrected Plaintiffs' Deposition Designation Transcript Excerpts Together with Defendants' Counter-Designation Excerpts for Jay DeLancy, Alexander Ealy, and Quisha Mallette (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit DeLancy, # (2) Exhibit Ealy, # (3) Exhibit Mallette) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/12/2015, Entered: 7/12/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION by All Parties Regarding 2,726 Letters Sent by NC SBOE, Filed by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Attachment to Stipulation - Dep. Ex. 470 (Example Letter)) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/12/2015, Entered: 7/12/2015 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Charles M. Gray by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re (313 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 302 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 319 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Objection to Pretrial Disclosures, Regarding Defendants' Summaries of Deposition Designations Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY re (325 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 319 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 308 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice (Other), of Filing of CORRECTED Plaintiffs' Deposition Designation Transcript Excerpt Together with Defendants' Counter-Designation Excerpt for Doris Burke (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Burke) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RONALD K. ANGUAS, JR on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY (ANGUAS, RONALD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY re (304 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 293 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 310 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Statement, of Filing of Plaintiffs' Deposition Designation Transcripts with Defendants' Counter-Designation Excerpts (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Abercrombie, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Banks, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Beatty, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Berduo, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Boyd-Malette, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Brown, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Bucholtz, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Burke, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Burris, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Carr, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Chislom, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Churchill, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Cohen, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Coleman, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Compton, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Cosner, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Cunningham, # (18) Exhibit 18 - Degraffenreid, # (19) Exhibit 19 - DeLancy, # (20) Exhibit 20 - Deters, # (21) Exhibit 21 - Dickerson, # (22) Exhibit 22 - Dill, # (23) Exhibit 23 - Duke, # (24) Exhibit 24 - Durant, # (25) Exhibit 25 - Dykes, # (26) Exhibit 26 - Ealy, # (27) Exhibit 27 - Eaton, # (28) Exhibit 28 - Ellis, # (29) Exhibit 29 - Farrington, # (30) Exhibit 30 - Fisher, # (31) Exhibit 31 - Fitzgerald, # (32) Exhibit 32 - Garth, # (33) Exhibit 33 - Gignac, # (34) Exhibit 34 - Harris, # (35) Exhibit 35 - Hatley, # (36) Exhibit 36 - Hawkins, # (37) Exhibit 37 - Jensen, # (38) Exhibit 38 - Jordan, # (39) Exhibit 39 - Justice, # (40) Exhibit 40 - Kearns, # (41) Exhibit 41 - Kennedy, # (42) Exhibit 42 - Kittrell, # (43) Exhibit 43 - Kuniholm, # (44) Exhibit 44 - LiVecchi, # (45) Exhibit 45 - Lund, # (46) Exhibit 46 - Mallette, # (47) Exhibit 47 - Manley, # (48) Exhibit 48 - McCue, # (49) Exhibit 49 - McGowan, # (50) Exhibit 50 - Meadows, # (51) Exhibit 51 - Mendez, # (52) Exhibit 52 - Miller, # (53) Exhibit 53 - Mock, # (54) Exhibit 54 - Moss, # (55) Exhibit 55 - Neesby, # (56) Exhibit 56 - Palmer, # (57) Exhibit 57 - Paylor, # (58) Exhibit 58 - Perry, # (59) Exhibit 59 - Pitt, # (60) Exhibit 60 - Pleasant, # (61) Exhibit 61 - Poucher, # (62) Exhibit 62 - Rhinehart, # (63) Exhibit 63 - Roberts, # (64) Exhibit 64 - Schaffer, # (65) Exhibit 65 - Sidbury, # (66) Exhibit 66 - Sims, # (67) Exhibit 67 - Smith, # (68) Exhibit 68 - Strach, # (69) Exhibit 69 - Suggs, # (70) Exhibit 70 - Thomas, # (71) Exhibit 71 - Tutor, # (72) Exhibit 72 - Vernon-Feagans, # (73) Exhibit 73 - Walter, # (74) Exhibit 74 - Ward, # (75) Exhibit 75 - Washington, Timothy, # (76) Exhibit 76 - Washington, Yvonne, # (77) Exhibit 77 - Weant, # (78) Exhibit 78 - Webb, # (79) Exhibit 79 - West, # (80) Exhibit 80 - Williams, # (81) Exhibit 81 - Wilson, # (82) Exhibit 82 - Windsor, # (83) Exhibit 83 - Woodard) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re (302 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Objection to Pretrial Disclosures, of Filing of Deposition Transcripts Containing Defendants' Counter-Designations to Plaintiff' Designations of Deposition Testimony for Trial (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Lue Alice Abercrombie, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Victoria Banks, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Sandra Beatty, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Josue Berduo, # (5) Exhibit 5- Charlotte Boyd-Malette, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Carnell Brown, # (7) Exhibit 8 - Doris Burke, # (8) Exhibit 9 - Marc Burris, # (9) Exhibit 10 - Emma Carr, # (10) Exhibit 11 - Jason Chislom, # (11) Exhibit 13 - Nadia Cohen, # (12) Exhibit 14 - Carolyn Coleman, # (13) Exhibit 15 - Helen Compton, # (14) Exhibit 16 - Kate Cosner, # (15) Exhibit 17 - Terrilin Cunningham, # (16) Exhibit 20 - Allison Deters, # (17) Exhibit 21 - Michael Gary Dickerson, # (18) Exhibit 22 - Cherise Dill, # (19) Exhibit 23 - Louis Duke, # (20) Exhibit 24 - Sherry Durant, # (21) Exhibit 25 - Hakeem Dykes, # (22) Exhibit 26 - Alexander Ealy, # (23) Exhibit 27 - Armenta Eaton, # (24) Exhibit 29 - Gwendolyn Farrington, # (25) Exhibit 30 - Kelvin Fisher, # (26) Exhibit 31 - Ted Fitzgerald, # (27) Exhibit 32 - Lynnette Garth, # (28) Exhibit 33 - Elizabeth Gignac, # (29) Exhibit 34 - Anna-Patrice Harris, # (30) Exhibit 35 - Bishop Lonnie Gene Hatley, # (31) Exhibit 36 - Rev. Jimmie Hawkins, # (32) Exhibit 37 - Jorgen Jensen, # (33) Exhibit 38 - Carlton Augustus Jordan, Jr., # (34) Exhibit 40 - Paul Kearns, # (35) Exhibit 42 - William Kittrell, # (36) Exhibit 44 - Brian LiVecchi, # (37) Exhibit 45 - Nancy Lund, # (38) Exhibit 46 - Quisha Mallette, # (39) Exhibit 47 - James Manley, # (40) Exhibit 48 - George McCue, # (41) Exhibit 49 - Bryan McGowan, # (42) Exhibit 51 - Rev. John Mendez, # (43) Exhibit 52 - Brian Miller, # (44) Exhibit 53 - Becky Mock, # (45) Exhibit 54 - Gregory Moss, # (46) Exhibit 56 - Maria Palmer, # (47) Exhibit 57 - Yolanda Paylor, # (48) Exhibit 58 - Mary Perry, # (49) Exhibit 59 - Tawanda Pitt, # (50) Exhibit 60 - Marcia Pleasant, # (51) Exhibit 61 - Cherie Poucher, # (52) Exhibit 62 - Candi Rhinehart, # (53) Exhibit 63 - Dean Roberts, # (54) Exhibit 64 - Susan Schaffer, # (55) Exhibit 66 - Gary Sims, # (56) Exhibit 67 - Brandi Smith, # (57) Exhibit 69 - Gerrick Suggs, # (58) Exhibit 70 - Kelly Thomas, # (59) Exhibit 71 - Marshall Tutor, # (60) Exhibit 72 - Lynne Vernon-Feagans, # (61) Exhibit 73 - Lynne Walter, # (62) Exhibit 74 - Bessie Ward, # (63) Exhibit 75 - Timothy Washington, # (64) Exhibit 76 - Yvonne Washington, # (65) Exhibit 78- Barbara Webb, # (66) Exhibit 79 - Ebony West, # (67) Exhibit 80 - Stephanie Williams, # (68) Exhibit 81 - Malcolm Wilson) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re (298 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION in Limine filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 7/27/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FISHER, SPENCER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re (298 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 287 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 304 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION in Limine filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Replies due by 7/27/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS re (289 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Designation of Deposition Transcript,,,, by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS re (290 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures,, by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 319 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Objection to Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Pretrial Disclosures by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Objection - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION - Other re (292 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures,,, by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Objection to Plaintiffs' Joint Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re [316] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Web Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Editorial)(STRACH, PHILLIP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015, Terminated: 1/6/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 8/3/2015 (STRACH, PHILLIP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re (275 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Janet Thornton and to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Dr. Janet Thornton, (271 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Sean P. Trende, (273 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Thomas Hofeller at Trial and to Strike Hofeller's Declarations filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 7/24/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Sean Trende Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Thomas Hofeller Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Janet Thornton Deposition Excerpts) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION (Second) by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, GOLDIE WELLS. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re (291 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Untimely Discovery Materials filed by JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JOHN DOE 2, FAITH JACKSON, JANE DOE 2, ROSANELL EATON, JOHN DOE 1, ARMENTA EATON, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, JOHN DOE 3, JANE DOE 3, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JANE DOE 1, CAROLYN COLEMAN, MARY PERRY, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 7/24/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT on State Court Proceeding by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Defendants' Motion in Currie, # (2) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motions in Currie) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(EARLS, ANITA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION First by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT re (292 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Final Pretrial Disclosures,,, Plaintiffs' Designations of Deposition Testimony: Transcript Excerpts by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Abercrombie, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Banks, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Beatty, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Berduo, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Boyd-Malette, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Brown, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Bucholtz, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Burke, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Burris, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Carr, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Chislom, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Churchill, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Cohen, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Coleman, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Compton, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Cosner, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Cunningham, # (18) Exhibit 18 - Degraffenreid, # (19) Exhibit 19 - DeLancy, # (20) Exhibit 20 - Deters, # (21) Exhibit 21 - Dickerson, # (22) Exhibit 22 - Dill, # (23) Exhibit 23 - Duke, # (24) Exhibit 24 - Durant, # (25) Exhibit 25 - Dykes, # (26) Exhibit 26 - Ealy, # (27) Exhibit 27 - Eaton, # (28) Exhibit 28 - Ellis, # (29) Exhibit 29 - Farrington, # (30) Exhibit 30 - Fisher, # (31) Exhibit 31 - Fitzgerald, # (32) Exhibit 32 - Garth, # (33) Exhibit 33 - Gignac, # (34) Exhibit 34 - Harris, # (35) Exhibit 35 - Hatley, # (36) Exhibit 36 - Hawkins, # (37) Exhibit 37 - Jensen, # (38) Exhibit 38 - Jordan, # (39) Exhibit 39 - Justice, # (40) Exhibit 40 - Kearns, # (41) Exhibit 41 - Kennedy, # (42) Exhibit 42 - Kittrell, # (43) Exhibit 43 - Kuniholm, # (44) Exhibit 44 - LiVecchi, # (45) Exhibit 45 - Lund, # (46) Exhibit 46 - Mallette, # (47) Exhibit 47 - Manley, J., # (48) Exhibit 48 - McCue, # (49) Exhibit 49 - McGowan, # (50) Exhibit 50 - Meadows, # (51) Exhibit 51 - Mendez, # (52) Exhibit 52 - Miller, # (53) Exhibit 53 - Mock, # (54) Exhibit 54 - Moss, # (55) Exhibit 55 - Neesby, # (56) Exhibit 56 - Palmer, # (57) Exhibit 57 - Paylor, # (58) Exhibit 58 - Perry, # (59) Exhibit 59 - Pitt, # (60) Exhibit 60 - Pleasant, # (61) Exhibit 61 - Poucher, # (62) Exhibit 62 - Rhinehart, # (63) Exhibit 63 - Roberts, # (64) Exhibit 64 - Schaffer, # (65) Exhibit 65 - Sidbury, # (66) Exhibit 66 - Sims, # (67) Exhibit 67 - Smith, # (68) Exhibit 68 - Strach, # (69) Exhibit 69 - Suggs, # (70) Exhibit 70 - Thomas, # (71) Exhibit 71 - Tutor, # (72) Exhibit 72 - Vernon-Feagans, # (73) Exhibit 73 - Walter, # (74) Exhibit 74 - Ward, # (75) Exhibit 75 - Washington, T., # (76) Exhibit 76 - Washington, Y., # (77) Exhibit 77 - Weant, # (78) Exhibit 78 - Webb, # (79) Exhibit 79 - West, # (80) Exhibit 80 - Williams, # (81) Exhibit 81 - Wilson, # (82) Exhibit 82 - Windsor, # (83) Exhibit 83 - Woodard) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Final Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Witness List, # (2) Exhibit B - Deposition Designations, # (3) Exhibit C - Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Untimely Discovery Materials by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Responses due by 7/8/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Final Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINAL PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - List of Exhibits from Depositions taken in these matters) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Designation of Deposition Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Charles Underwood, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Dean Roberts, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Depositions of Cherie Poucher 07.02.14 and 04.21.15, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Erika Churchill, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Sen. Earline Parmon, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Rep. Rick Glazier, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Michael Dickerson, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Deposition of Gary Bartlett, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Carolyn Justice, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Deposition of James Hope, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Deposition of Lottie Hope) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re (287 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION in Limine filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 7/24/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-Supplemental Report of Allan Lichtman) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 303 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 302 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF Filed by NAACP and LOWV Plaintiffs and by Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 301 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST for Notice by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D, # (5) Exhibit Ex. E, # (6) Exhibit Ex. F, # (7) Exhibit Ex. G, # (8) Exhibit Ex. H) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RYAN, ELIZABETH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 6/26/2015, that by noon on August 17, 2015, each party shall file a status report on the effect of SL 2015-103 on the voter identification claims in this case and how the party requests the court to proceed, if at all, on the adjudication of such claims. Defendants have until July 8, 2015, to file any motions to dismiss. Responsive briefs are due July 23, 2015. Any reply brief is due July 30, 2015. By noon on June 29, 2015, each party shall serve on all parties in these consolidated cases an updated, non-binding list of all witnesses that the party, in good faith, expects to call at trial. All pretrial disclosures as contemplated by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3), including all deposition designations, shall be filed and served no later than 2 p.m. on June 30, 2015. All objections, including counter-designations, shall be filed and served no later than noon on July 8, 2015. By noon on June 26, each party having filed a Daubert motion shall file a brief one-page supplement to that motion. Responses to the motions shall be filed and served by noon on July 8, 2015. By noon on June 29, 2015, the parties shall file and serve joint trial briefs. Any motions in limine shall be filed and served by 2 p.m. on June 30, 2015. Responses shall be filed and served by 2:00 p.m. on July 8, 2015. Trial will begin at 9:30 a.m., on Monday July 13, 2015, in Courtroom # 1 in Winston-Salem. By 5:00 p.m. on July 3, 2015, the parties shall file a report as to the status of the related North Carolina State court proceeding challenging the voter identification portion of North Carolina law. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/26/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT re (271 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Sean P. Trende, (275 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Janet Thornton and to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Dr. Janet Thornton, (276 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Memorandum,,,,,,, (274 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Memorandum,, (272 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Memorandum,,,, (273 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Thomas Hofeller at Trial and to Strike Hofeller's Declarations by Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT re (270 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 287 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 281 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Memorandum,, (281 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 276 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 265 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Improper Expert Opinion Testimony of Brian Neesby, (269 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 286 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 280 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony by the United States' Expert, Dr. Charles Stewart by United States and Defendants on Stewart and Neesby Motions in Limine by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 6/26/2015. Attorney Daniel Donovan spoke on behalf of NAACP plaintiffs; Attorney Allison Riggs spoke on behalf of the League of Women Voters Plaintiffs; Attorney Joshua Kaul spoke on behalf of the Duke Intervenors; Attorney John Russ spoke on the behalf of the United States of America; and Attorney Alexander Peters spoke on behalf of the Defendants. Status Reports regarding pending Daubert Motions due by noon today, June 26, 2015. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/26/2015 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Counsel notified via Electronic Notice. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/23/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Lori Russell, Telephone number 336-734-2547. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Russell, Lori)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/24/2015, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/24/2015. Attorney Daniel Donovan spoke on behalf of NAACP plaintiffs; Attorney Allison Riggs spoke on behalf of the League of Women Voters Plaintiffs; Attorney Joshua Kaul spoke on behalf of the Duke Intervenors, Attorney John Russ spoke on the behalf of the United States of America, and Attorney Alexander Peters spoke on behalf of the Defendants. Matter taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST re (275 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Janet Thornton and to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Dr. Janet Thornton filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Janet Thornton and to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Dr. Janet Thornton by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Responses due by 7/6/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST re (273 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Thomas Hofeller at Trial and to Strike Hofeller's Declarations filed by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 4-4-14 Hofeller Depo Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit B - 4-8-15 Hofeller Depo Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit C - Hofeller Resume, # (4) Exhibit D - Second Hofeller Declaration, # (5) Exhibit E - Hillygus Depo Excerpt) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Thomas Hofeller at Trial and to Strike Hofeller's Declarations by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Responses due by 7/17/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS re (271 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Sean P. Trende filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - First Trende Rep., # (2) Exhibit 2 - Trende Supplement, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Second Trende Rep., # (4) Exhibit 4 - Trende Dep. Excerpts, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Burden Sur-Rebuttal, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Burden Rep., # (7) Exhibit 7 - Gronke 2014 Sur-reply, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Hood Dep. Excerpts, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Stewart 2014 Surrebuttal, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Dep. Ex. 117, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Dep. Ex. 116, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Dep. Ex. 110, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Dep. Ex. 109, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Bernstein et al., # (15) Exhibit 15 - McKee et al., # (16) Exhibit 16 - Dep. Ex. 378) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(HO, DALE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Sean P. Trende by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. Responses due by 7/17/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(HO, DALE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re (269 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Exclude Testimony by the United States' Expert, Dr. Charles Stewart filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Testimony by the United States' Expert, Dr. Charles Stewart by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 7/17/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Charles Stewart, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Brian Neesby, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Second Declaration of Janet Thornton) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/24/2015 04:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Associated Cases: 1:13cv861, 1:13cv658, and 1:13cv660) (Kemp, Donita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/23/2015. Attorney Daniel Donovan spoke on behalf of NAACP plaintiffs; Attorney Allison Riggs spoke on behalf of the League of Women Voters Plaintiffs; Attorney Joshua Kaul spoke on behalf of the Duke Intervenors, Attorney John Russ spoke on the behalf of the United States of America, and Attorney Alexander Peters spoke on behalf of the Defendants. Parties advised that the Court has elected to delay the merits of the voter ID portion of the trial; parties instructed to determine a schedule for reaching resolution of whether there is any further dispute as to the merits of the voter ID claim in light of the new law; in light of the voter ID portion being removed from the July 13, 2015 trial, the parties are instructed to advise the Court as to how much trial time is needed to present their case; Trial briefs, pretrial disclosures, etc. due by noon on Monday, June 29, 2015; Motions in Limine due by noon on Monday, June 29, 2015; parties further instructed to confer and report back at 4:00 p.m. on June 24, 2015, for a follow-up Telephonic Status Conference. (Court Reporter Lori Russell; Associated Cases: 1:13cv861, 1:13cv658, and 1:13cv660) (Kemp, Donita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Terminate Motion Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadlines terminated. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/23/2015 at 03:30 PM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Counsel notified via Electronic Notice. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660P, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita) Modified on 6/23/2015 to correct date of Telephone Conference. (Engle, Anita).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER the motion to expedite will be DENIED, and the court will consider the motions of the parties according to the schedule previously indicated. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 6/22/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015, Terminated: 6/23/2015 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JADINE C. JOHNSON on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY (JOHNSON, JADINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motions Submitted: (277 in 1:13cv660, 282 in 1:13cv658, 266 in 1:13cv861) MOTION to Expedite Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Expert Opinion Testimony of Brian Neesby to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv861, 1:13cv658, 1:13cv60(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015, Terminated: 6/22/2015 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Expedite Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Expert Opinion Testimony of Brian Neesby by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Improper Expert Opinion Testimony of Brian Neesby by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Order on Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/17/2015, that the parties' Joint Motion is GRANTED, and the deposition of Ms. Erika Churchill may be taken on or before June 18, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP; 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Third Stipulation Regarding Information in the SEIMS Database by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Second Stipulation Regarding Information in the SEIMS Database by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION First Stipulation Regarding Information in the SEIMS Database by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(COOPER, DAVID)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015, Terminated: 6/17/2015 Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTIONto Take Deposition Out of Time by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FISHER, SPENCER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motions Referred: RE: (260 in 1:13cv861, 271 in 1:13cv660, 276 in 1:13cv658) JOINT MOTION to Take Deposition Out of Time to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Joint Stipulations Re Preliminary Injunction Record by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/9/2015, that the Consent Motion and Stipulation Regarding the Completion of Fact Witness Depositions (Doc. #[273]) is GRANTED IN PART in that the deadline to complete depositions is extended to June 12, 2015 for the limited purpose of completing the depositions contemplated in the instant Motion; however, rather than allow further extensions by stipulation, should the parties need additional time beyond June 12, 2015, they must file an appropriate motion with the Court. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motions Referred: RE: (257 in 1:13cv861, 273 in 1:13cv658, 268 in 1:13cv660) Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and Stipulation Regarding the Completion of Fact Witness Depositions to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:13cv660, 1:13cv658, 1:13cv861.(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015, Terminated: 6/9/2015 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order and Stipulation Regarding the Completion of Fact Witness Depositions by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 6/29/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY (SWAIN-MCSURELY, CAITLIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 06/04/2015. This matter is before the court following a pretrial scheduling conference held telephonically on May 27, 2015, during which all parties were represented by counsel. Following that hearing, the parties were asked to meet and confer on a number of topics. They have reported the result of their meeting to the Deputy Case Manager. Based on the requests of counsel reported to the court and for good cause shown, the following pretrial procedures and deadlines are therefore established herein. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH R. DANGEL on behalf of Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DANGEL, ELIZABETH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2015 with Attorneys Donovan, Lieberman, Hair, Stein, Riggs, Earls, Kaul, AUSA Beck, Meza, Bowers, Peters, and Farr. Trial Briefs due 6/15/2015. Objections to Pretrial Disclosures may be due as early as 6/22 or as late as 6/26 as stated. Parties to consult and notify the court of any agreements reached on the matters discussed by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 5/29/2015. (Court Reporter Briana Nebsbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Telephone Conference set for 5/27/2015 09:30 AM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Notice of Trial Calendar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Trial Calendar Bench Trial set for 7/13/2015 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Winchester, Robin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTIONto Set Telephonic Conference Call and Trial Date by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Set Conference Call, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Set Trial Date) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 05/05/2015, that the three cases (1:13CV658, 1:13CV660, and 1:13CV861) are consolidated for trial purposes only, and otherwise remain distinct cases. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA as to [187] Notice of Appeal, that the judgment of this court, entered October 1, 2014, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41 (a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.(Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 5/5/2015. No Motions to Compel having been filed by May 1, 2015, no hearing will be set for May 7, 2015. See Text Order dated 4/20/2015. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Order on Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISCOVERY DEADLINES signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 04/28/2015, that the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Discovery Deadlines [Doc. #[249]] is GRANTED, as set out herein. re (264) Joint Motion in case 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP; (260) Joint Motion in case 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP; (249) Joint Motion in case 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015, Terminated: 4/28/2015 Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION to Modify Discovery Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP (RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motions Referred: RE: (249 in 1:13cv861, 264 in 1:13cv658, 260 in 1:13cv660) JOINT MOTION to Modify Discovery Deadlines, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Referred to Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED RE: (244 in 1:13cv861, 259 in 1:13cv658, 255 in 1:13cv660) Notice (Joint Statement Regarding Consolidation) to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, 1:13cv861(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SOPHIA L. LAKIN on behalf of Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(LAKIN, SOPHIA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 04/20/15, granting [262] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motions To Compel. Motions to Compel will be due on May 1, 2015, Responses will be due May 6, 2015, and, to the extent a hearing is necessary, it will be set for May 7, 2015 at 2 pm. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motions Referred: RE: (262 in 1:13cv658, 258 in 1:13cv660, 247 in 1:13cv861) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motions To Compel Filed Jointly by all Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors until 5/1/15 to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE Associated Cases: 1:13cv861, 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660(Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015, Terminated: 4/20/2015 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motions To Compel Filed Jointly by all Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors until 5/1/15 by JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re (249 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 238 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Intent to File Dispositive Motions,, Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AMANDA R. CALLAIS on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(CALLAIS, AMANDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: 4/15/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re (239 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Order, Joint Statement Regarding Consolidation Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP (RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 4/13/2015; The Parties shall have until April 17, 2015 to file motions to compel regarding document production requests that were timely served and pending as of March 24, 2015. Any responses to those motions shall be due by April 21, 2015, and a telephonic hearing regarding any such motions will be held on April 24, 2015 at 2 p.m. ORDERED that the NAACP Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Motions to Compel [Doc. #242] is GRANTED as set forth above. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015, Terminated: 4/13/2015 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion Motions to Compel by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motions Referred: RE: [257] MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion Motions to Compel , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Order on Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 04/02/2015, that Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Deem Requests for Admission to Comply with Scheduling Order [Doc. #[234]] is GRANTED and Defendants shall respond to the unanswered requests for admission by April 24, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Order on motion for clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CLARIFY DISCOVERY DEADLINES signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 04/02/2015, that the parties' Joint Motion is GRANTED, and with respect to document production requests that were timely served and pending as of March 24, 2015, the parties may agree by April 9, 2015 regarding the production of documents, with production to occur by April 17, 2015, but if the parties are unable to reach agreement by April 9, 2015, any motions to compel must be filed by April 10, 2015, with responses due on April 14, 2015, and a telephonic hearing on those matters on April 16, 2015 at 2 p.m. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motions Referred: RE: (249 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 234 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 245 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) JOINT MOTIONto Deem Requests for Admission to Comply with Scheduling Order, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motions Referred: RE: [251] Joint MOTION for Clarification regarding Discovery Deadlines to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Engle, Anita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Intent to File Dispositive Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re (234 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) JOINT MOTIONto Deem Requests for Admission to Comply with Scheduling Order filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 4/16/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(MURPHY, KATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 4/2/2015 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Clarification regarding Discovery Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/23/15. The Motion to Expedite [250] is GRANTED, and the Court will consider the Joint Motion to Deem Requests for Admission to Comply with Scheduling Order on an expedited basis, in light of the impending close of discovery. If Defendants intend to file a response to the Joint Motion [249], they should do so no later than Monday, March 30, 2015. If the parties are able to reach an agreement on this dispute, the Court will extend the deadline to respond to the Requests for Admission to April 22, 2015, and the Joint Motion will be terminated as moot. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motions Referred: RE: [250] Joint MOTION to Expedite , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Williamson, Wanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015, Terminated: 3/23/2015 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Expedite by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015, Terminated: 4/2/2015 Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTIONto Deem Requests for Admission to Comply with Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 4/10/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JASMYN G. RICHARDSON on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY (RICHARDSON, JASMYN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRUCE V. SPIVA on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPIVA, BRUCE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Clinton Tabernacle AME Zion Church as Consented to by All Parties by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff-Intervenors Barrantes and Ritchie, as Consented to by All Parties and Filed by ASGOD BARRANTES, MARY-WREN RITCHIE. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Order on Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 3/9/2015; that the parties' Joint Motion to Amend Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED, ((237) in case 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP; (233) in case 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP; (223) in case 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) as set out above. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT , Notice of Filing, and Renewed Request for Expedited Consideration of Objection by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Order on Parties' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Order on Defendants' Motion to Reconsider Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT re Advisory on Trial Scheduling by ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Referred to Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED RE: Status Reports filed Regarding July 6, 2015 Trial Setting to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Currie Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER R. BASCH on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(BASCH, JENNIFER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MADELYN A. MORRIS on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(MORRIS, MADELYN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL A. GLICK on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(GLICK, MICHAEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motions Referred: RE: [237] JOINT MOTIONto Amend Discovery Deadlines, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015, Terminated: 3/9/2015 Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTIONto Amend Discovery Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERNEST A. MCFARLAND on behalf of Movant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MCFARLAND, ERNEST)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Order on Motion to withdraw document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 02/23/2015, that the Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel [Doc. #[233]] is GRANTED. (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motions Referred: RE: [233] MOTION to Withdraw Counsel Kimberly Rancour and Uzoma Nkwonta, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/06/2015, re: Telephone Conference, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Lori Russell, Telephone number 336-734-2547. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP( Russell, Lori) Modified on 7/12/2017 (Contreras, Jamie).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015, Terminated: 2/23/2015 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Counsel Kimberly Rancour and Uzoma Nkwonta by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephonic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Telephone Notice to/from Attorneys Donovan and Peters on 2/12/2015 that [232] Joint MOTION to Enforce and Request for Telephonic Status Conference has been resolved.(Williamson, Wanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015, Terminated: 2/12/2015 motion to enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Enforce and Request for Telephonic Status Conference by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, BRIAN M. MILLER, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Responses due by 3/5/2015 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2015 with Attorneys Donovan, Stein, Earls, Riggs, AUSAs Beck and Russ, Strach, Peters, and O'Hale regarding Objections to July 2015 Trial Date. (Court Reporter Lori Russell.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 02/04/2015, that the Plaintiffs' Objection (Doc. [201]) and the Defendants' Objection (Doc. [204]) are OVERRULED. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Order on Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO AMEND EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 02/04/2015, granting (229) Joint Motion in case 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP; granting (227) Joint Motion in case 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP; granting (217) Joint Motion in case 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Amend Expert Disclosure Deadlines is GRANTED, as set out herein. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2015 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Electronic Notice to Counsel on 2/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motions Referred: RE: [229] JOINT MOTIONto Amend Expert Disclosure Deadlines, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015, Terminated: 2/4/2015 Joint Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTIONto Amend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015, Terminated: 2/6/2015 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Pending Objection to Order of 5 December 2014 Denying Defendants' Motion to Reschedule Trial by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Defendants' Motion to Reconsider Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(STRACH, PHILLIP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015, Terminated: 2/3/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***Deficient***STIPULATION and Order Regarding Expert Disclosure Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE) Attorneys instructed to file as a motion and submit proposed order on 2/3/2015 (Garrett, Kim).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Referred to Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER re [209], [212], [213], [214] Objections to Judge Peake's 12/5/2014 Order Denying Motion to Reschedule 7/6/2015 Trial Date. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Response to Objection to Recommended RulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to Order by Judge Peake filed December 5, 2014 Denying Motion to Reschedule Trial Date re (220 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 222 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 209 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Response to Objection to Recommended RulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to Order by Judge Peake filed December 5, 2014 Denying Motion to Reschedule Trial Date re (209 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (RIGGS, ALLISON) Modified on 1/6/2015 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 Response to Objection to Recommended RulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to Order by Judge Peake filed December 5, 2014 Denying Motion to Reschedule Trial Date re (220 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 222 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 209 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 Notice of Master Calendar Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Master Trial Calendar: JULY Bench Trial set for 7/6/2015 09:30 AM in Unassigned Courtroom before UNASSIGNED. Trial Briefs due 6/15/2015.(Williamson, Wanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION TO Order by Judge Peake filed December 5, 2014 Denying Motion to Reschedule Trial Date re (203 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 203 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 203 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Response to Objections to R&R due by 1/5/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Scheduling Order, # (2) Exhibit B, Guidelines) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. (MURPHY, KATHERINE) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Referred to Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED RE: (217 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 215 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 204 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge; (194 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 207 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 205 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Order; (201 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 214 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 212 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge; (219 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 221 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 208 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Response to Objection to Recommended Ruling; and (218 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 207 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 220 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Response to Objection to Recommended Ruling to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Response to Objection to Recommended RulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to Order by Judge Peake filed November 20, 2014 (217 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 215 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 204 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP (RYAN, ELIZABETH) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Response to Objection to Recommended RulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to Order by Judge Peake filed November 20, 2014 (201 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 214 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 212 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Recommended Ruling filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, TOM APODACA, PHILIP E. BERGER, JAMES BOLES, PAUL J. FOLEY, THOM GOOLSBY, RALPH E HISE, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, DAVID R. LEWIS, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, TOM MURRY, LARRY PITTMAN, ROBERT A. RUCHO, RUTH SAMUELSON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, THOM TILLIS, HARRY WARREN, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(STRACH, PHILLIP) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/15/2014; that the Court adopts the discovery resolution and scheduling as addressed during the December 12, 2014, hearing and as set out above. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2014 with Attorneys Allen, Judge and Stein for the NAACP Plaintiffs, Attorneys Riggs, Eppsteiner, and Brook for the League of Women Voters Plaintiffs, Attorney O'Hale for the Duke Intervenors, Attorneys Beck, Cooper, Russ, Fisher, Meza, and Garrett for the United States of America, and Attorneys Peters and Farr for the Defendants. The court heard from the parties as to [218] Joint Status Report Regarding Outstanding Discovery and Production Issues filed by all parties; Written Orders Forthcoming; Proceedings Recorded. Associated Cases: 1:13cv658, 1:13cv660, and 1:13cv861(Kemp, Donita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  case referred to magistrate judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED RE: [218] Joint Status Report, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Outstanding Discovery and Production Issues filed by all parties.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION TO Order by Judge Peake filed November 20, 2014 re (207 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 205 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 194 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, Movants TOM APODACA, PHILIP E. BERGER, JAMES BOLES, THOM GOOLSBY, RALPH E HISE, DAVID R. LEWIS, TIM MOORE, TOM MURRY, LARRY PITTMAN, ROBERT A. RUCHO, RUTH SAMUELSON, THOM TILLIS, HARRY WARREN, TOM APODACA, PHILIP E. BERGER, JAMES BOLES, THOM GOOLSBY, RALPH E HISE, DAVID R. LEWIS, TIM MOORE, TOM MURRY, LARRY PITTMAN, ROBERT A. RUCHO, RUTH SAMUELSON, THOM TILLIS, HARRY WARREN, TOM APODACA, PHILIP E. BERGER, JAMES BOLES, THOM GOOLSBY, RALPH E HISE, DAVID R. LEWIS, TIM MOORE, TOM MURRY, LARRY PITTMAN, ROBERT A. RUCHO, RUTH SAMUELSON, THOM TILLIS, HARRY WARREN. Response to Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2014 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - O. Walker Reagan Memo re Constituent Correspondence, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from NAACP Plaintiffs' Document Responses and Objections, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from LWV Plaintiffs' Document Responses and Objections, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Blueprint North Carolina's Objections to Subpoena, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from Democracy North Carolina's Objection to Subpoena) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 12/9/2014 to correct title of document (Taylor, Abby). Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Email Notification to Attorney K. Winn Allen with instructions regarding Telephone Conference set for 12/12/14 at 11:00 am with Judge Peake. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Order on motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/05/2014, that Defendants' Motion to Reschedule Trial [Doc. #[211] in 1:13CV658] is DENIED, and this matter will remain on the July 2015 Trial Calendar. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Pre-Trial Schedule Order [Doc. #[208] in 1:13CV658] is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the discovery schedule in this matter is modified as set forth above. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite [Doc. #[215] in 1:13CV658] is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that all responses to objections to the Court's November 20, 2014 Discovery Order are due on or before Thursday, December 18, 2014, as set forth above. FINALLY, that, by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, December 9, 2014, the Parties must file a joint status report regarding current document production and any other outstanding discovery issues. Any related motions to compel or other requests for Court intervention must be filed on or before Wednesday, December 10, 2014, and this matter is set for a telephonic status conference at 11:00 a.m. on Friday, December 12, 2014, to address any pending discovery production issues that remain outstanding. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Joint Status Report Deadline due by 12/9/2014 by 5:00 p.m.. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/12/2014 at 11:00 AM. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/23/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2015. Notice of Dispositive Motions due 03/30/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2014 re (202 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 215 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 213 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Expedite , (209 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 198 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 211 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Reset Trial Date , and (206 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 195 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 208 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Modify Discovery Deadlines (Opposed). Attorneys Donovan, Judge and Stein appeared for the NAACP Plaintiffs, Attorneys Riggs and Eppsteiner for the League of Women Voters Plaintiffs, Attorney O'Hale appeared for the Intervenor Plaintiffs, Attorneys Meza, Ryan, Russ, Garrett, and Beck appeared for the United State of America, and Attorneys Peters, Murphy, Farr and Strach appeared for the Governor and the State of North Carolina. The court heard from the parties and a written order is forthcoming. (Proceedings Recorded.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014, Terminated: 12/5/2014 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RYAN, ELIZABETH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Objection to Recommended Ruling - Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PARTIAL JOINT OBJECTION TO Order by Judge Peake filed November 20, 2014 re (207 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 205 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 194 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER, MARY PERRY. Response to Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2014 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP (RYAN, ELIZABETH) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Powell, Gloria).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re (198 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Reset Trial Date , (197 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Response in Opposition to Motion,, and Reply to Opposition to Modify Discovery Deadlines filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(EPPSTEINER, GEORGE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re (209 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 198 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 211 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Reset Trial Date , (210 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 197 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 208 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Response in Opposition to Motion,, Reply In Support of Modifying Discovery Deadlines and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Reschedule Trial filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 12/22/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014, Terminated: 12/5/2014 Motion to Reset Trial Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Reset Trial Date by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 12/29/2014 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(MURPHY, KATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re (195 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Modify Discovery Deadlines (Opposed) filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 12/22/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(MURPHY, KATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephonic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Email notification on 12/2/2014 to Attorney Daniel T. Donovan with instructions for Telephone Conference which is scheduled for December 5, 2014 at 11:00 am with Judge Peake.(Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearings: Telephone Conference as to [208] Motion to Modify set for 12/5/2014 11:00 AM with MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/26/14: Plaintiffs [209] Motion to Expedite is granted, to the extent that any response by Defendants as to [208] Motion to Modify Scheduling Order must be filed by Wednesday, December 3, 2014; any Reply by Plaintiffs must be filed by Thursday, December 4, 2014; and this matter is set for a telephone hearing and scheduling conference on Friday, December 5, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motions Referred: RE: (209 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 207 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 196 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Expedite Resolution of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Modify Discovery Deadlines, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014, Terminated: 11/26/2014 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite Resolution of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Modify Discovery Deadlines by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014, Terminated: 12/5/2014 Motion to modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify Discovery Deadlines (Opposed) by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY J. LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, LYNNE M. WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY N. WEST, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, FAITH JACKSON, MARIA TERESA UNGER PALMER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/20/2014, that, with respect to communications between legislators and third parties, the Motions to Quash and related discovery objections are DENIED, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is GRANTED, and Defendants must produce communications with third parties as requested by Plaintiff's. FURTHER that, with respect to communications between legislators and outside counsel prior to the commencement of this litigation on August 12, 2013, the Motion to Quash and discovery objections as to these requests based on a blanket claim of legislative privilege is DENIED and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is GRANTED to the extent that a privilege log must be prepared setting out sufficient details as to any such document withheld on the basis of privilege. However, with respect to internal legislative communications solely among North Carolina state legislators or North Carolina state legislators and legislative staff, the Motion to Quash and discovery objections based on legislative privilege are GRANTED, the Motion to Compel is DENIED, and Defendants need not produce, nor create a privilege log regarding, communications solely among legislators or communications between legislators and legislative staff. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/07/2014, that the discovery schedule in this matter is modified as set forth herein. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/6/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2015. Notice of Intent to File Dispositive Motions due by 03/13/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2014 with Attorneys Allen, Lieberman, Hair and Stein for the NAACP Plaintiffs, Attorneys Riggs, Eppsteiner, Brook, and Ebenstein for the League of Women Voters Plaintiffs, Attorneys O'Hale and Frost for the Duke Intervenors, Attorneys Beck, Cooper, Ryan, Fisher, Meza, Garrett for the United States of America, and Attorneys Peters, Farr, Strach, McKnight, Bowers and Murphy for the Defendants. The court heard from the parties as to [205] Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for a Status Conference on Outstanding Discovery Issues and the legislative immunity issue. Written orders forthcoming. Proceedings Recorded. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 11/7/2014 10:00 AM with MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Attorney K. Winn Allen given instructions as to initiating call to chambers. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/20/14, granting [205] The Joint Motion for Telephonic Pretrial Status Conference to the extent that this matter will be set for a telephonic discovery and scheduling status conference on Friday, November 7, 2014, at 10:00 am. (Garrett, Kim)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014, Terminated: 10/20/2014 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Telephonic Pre-Trial Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FISHER, SPENCER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motions Referred: RE: [205] Joint MOTION for Telephonic Pre-Trial Status Conference , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA RECALL AND STAY OF MANDATE Re: Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 202 in case 1:13-cv-658; Doc. 200 in case 1:13-cv-660; Doc. 189 in case 1:13-cv-861): On October 8, 2014, the Supreme Court granted Defendants' motion to recall and stay the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit (Doc. 201 in case 1:13-cv-658; Doc. 199 in case 1:13-cv-660; Doc. 188 in case 1:13-cv-861) and STAYED the preliminary injunction pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for writ of certiorari. On October 9, 2014, the Fourth Circuit entered an Order recalling and staying the mandate in this case. USCA Case Number 14-1845(L). (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/07/2014, re: Status Conference, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Lori Russell, Telephone number 336-734-2547. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Russell, Lori)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Status Conference held on 10/7/2014. Attorneys Donovan and Stein for the North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al; Attorneys Riggs, Earls, Eppensteiner and Brooks for the League of Women Voters of NC, et al; AUSA Russ and Beck for the United States of America; and Attorney O'Hale for the Intervenor Plaintiffs. The court heard from the parties as to compliance with injunction and the parties to work together to address issues as they arise. (Court Reporter Lori Russell.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/03/2014 as set out herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties appear before the court on Tuesday October 7, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in Winston-Salem, Courtroom # 2 for a status conference to address how Defendants intend to comply with this Order. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Status Conference for 10/7/2014 at 3:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #2. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA, that the judgment of this court, entered 10/01/2014, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. USCA No. 14-1845. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA JUDGMENT, in accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is reversed in part and affirmed in part. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. USCA No. 14-1845. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA OPINION. USCA No. 14-1845. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Order on Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/25/2014 as set out herein. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014, Terminated: 9/25/2014 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RYAN, ELIZABETH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motions Referred: RE: (197 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 184 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 195 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Consent MOTION for Protective Order , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit to US Court of Appeals re [185] Notice of Appeal, [187] Notice of Appeal, [188] Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 14-1856. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA ORDER. The court consolidates Case No. 14-1845 with Case No. 14-1856 and Case No. 14-1859. Entry of appearance forms and disclosure statements filed by counsel and parties to the lead case are deemed filed in the secondary cases. USCA Case Number 14-1845(L). (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA ORDER. Upon consideration of submissions relative to the Duke appellants' emergency motion for preliminary injunction pending appeal, the court denies the motion. The court grants appellants' motions to expedite and to proceed on the original record. The parties may supplement their memoranda in the district court with appellate briefs of no more than 15 pages. All parties must file their briefs by September 17, 2014. The United States is also invited to file a statement of its views on or before September 17, 2014. This appeal is calendared for oral argument in Charlotte, North Carolina, on September 25, 2014. USCA Case Numbers 14-1845, 14-1856, 14-1859. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (FILED IN ERROR) Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re ([172] in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, [183] in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, [185] in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Appeal Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY J. LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE M. WALTER, EBONY N. WEST for proceedings held on July 7 to 10, 2014 before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder, (SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER on behalf of Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(EPPSTEINER, GEORGE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re (175 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 188 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 187 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, filed by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, SARA STOHLER, GOLDIE WELLS, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, KAY BRANDON, HUGH STOHLER, A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, OCTAVIA RAINEY, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA. USCA Case Manager: Cathi Bennett. USCA Case Number 14-1859. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re (186 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 187 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 174 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, filed by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, MARIE TERESA UNGER PALMER. USCA Case Manager: Cathie Bennett. USCA Case Number 14-1856. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (187 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 186 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 174 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, (188 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 187 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 175 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (182 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 182 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 171 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 171 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 184 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 184 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Memorandum and Opinion, Order, by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0418-1565791. Appeal Record due by 8/29/2014. (EARLS, ANITA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014, Terminated: 5/5/2015 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (182 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 182 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 171 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 171 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 184 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 184 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Memorandum and Opinion, Order, by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, MARIE TERESA UNGER PALMER. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0418-1565429. (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re (172 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 185 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 183 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal, filed by NANCY LUND, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BRIAN M. MILLER, ASGOD BARRANTES, CHARLES M. GRAY, LOUIS M. DUKE, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE. USCA Case Manager: Cathi Bennett. USCA Case Number 14-1845. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (172 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 183 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 185 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Notice of Appeal. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (171 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 184 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 182 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Memorandum and Opinion, Order, by ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE WALTER, EBONY WEST. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0418-1563708. (SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 08/08/2014; that Defendants' motions for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. [94] in case 1:13CV861, Doc. [106] in case 1:13CV658, and Doc. [110] in case 1:13CV660) are DENIED. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' and Intervenors' motions for a preliminary injunction (Docs. [96] & [98] in case 1:13CV861; Docs. [108] & [110] in case 1:13CV658; and Docs. [112] & [114] in case 1:13CV660) are DENIED. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' motions to strike Defendants' experts (Docs. [146], [148], & [150] in case 1:13CV861; Docs. [156], [158], & [160] in case 1:13CV658; and Docs. [157], [159], & [161] in case 1:13CV660) are DENIED AS MOOT. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiff LOUIS M. DUKE, to Response to (146 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude and to Strike, (150 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Strike Declaration of Thomas Hofeller, (148 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and to Strike Declaration of Donald Schroeder filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Unpublished Cases) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re (158 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 148 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 159 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and to Strike Declaration of Donald Schroeder, (146 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 157 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 156 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude and to Strike, (150 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 161 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 160 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Strike Declaration of Thomas Hofeller, (175 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 173 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 162 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Designation of Deposition Transcript,,, filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 8/7/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Deposition of Donald Schroeder, # (2) Exhibit B Emails) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(MURPHY, KATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re (172 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 170 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 159 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Memorandum,,, filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 8/4/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/10/2014, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/9/2014, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/8/2014, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Brianna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/7/2014, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.( Redaction Request due 8/11/2014., Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2014., Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2014.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Brianna) Modified on 7/18/2014 to change event type and language (Contreras, Jamie).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re (162 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Designation of Deposition Transcript,,, . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit E, # (5) Exhibit F, # (6) Exhibit G, # (7) Exhibit H, # (8) Exhibit I, # (9) Exhibit J, # (10) Exhibit K, # (11) Exhibit L, # (12) Exhibit M) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Designation of Deposition Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, BRIAN M. MILLER, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document re (172 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 170 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 159 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Memorandum,,, Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of N.C. State Board of Elections by Kim W. Strach. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 1 of 8), # (2) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 2 of 8), # (3) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 3 of 8), # (4) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 4 of 8), # (5) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 5 of 8), # (6) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 6 of 8), # (7) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 7 of 8), # (8) Exhibits to 30(b)(6) SBOE Deposition (Part 8 of 8), # (9) Exhibit Deposition of Kim W. Strach and Exhibits) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document re (169 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 171 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 158 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Designation of Deposition Transcript,,, Excerpts and Selected Exhibited from Sen. Earline Parmon Deposition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Rep. Rick Glazier Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit Michael Dickerson Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit Complete Deposition of Gary Bartlett, # (4) Exhibits to Gary Bartlett Deposition, # (5) Exhibit Excerpts and Selected Exhibits from Janet Thornton Deposition, # (6) Exhibit Excerpts and Selected Exhibits from Sean Trende Deposition, # (7) Exhibit Excerpts and Selected Exhibits from Cherie Poucher Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, BRIAN M. MILLER, Select Role Types NANCY LUND, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE WALTER, EBONY WEST re Bench Trial - Completed,, (114 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 98 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, NANCY LUND, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE WALTER, EBONY WEST. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Louis Duke, # (2) Affidavit Declaration of Josue Berduo, # (3) Affidavit Declaration of Nancy Lund) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Designation of Deposition Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Complete Deposition of Charles Stewart, III, # (2) Exhibits to Deposition of Charles Stewart, III, # (3) Complete Deposition of J. Morgan Kousser, # (4) Exhibits to Deposition of J. Morgan Kousser, # (5) Complete Deposition of Theodore Allen, # (6) Exhibits to Theodore Allen Deposition) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP (FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Bench Trial Completed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial completed on 7/10/2014. Attorneys Russ, Donovan, Ho, Riggs for the Plaintiffs and Attorney Elias for the Intervenor Plaintffs. Attorneys Strach, Peters and Farr for the Defendants and Attorney Coates for the Intervenor Defendant. Joint deposition designations due Friday, 7/11/2014 at 5:00 PM. Intervenor Plaintiffs brief as to issue of standing due Friday, 7/11/2014 at 5:00 p.m. and the response from the State due 7/18/2014 and limited to 10 pages each. Matter taken under advisement and written opinion forthcoming. (Court Reporter Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Bench Trial continued to 7/10/2014 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial held on 7/9/2014. Attorneys O'Connor, Cooper, and Russ for the Plaintiffs and Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers and Peters for the Defendants. Evidence presented and concluded; joint deposition designations due 7/11/2014 05:00 PM; Closing arguments begun. Matter continued to 7/10/2014 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem, Courtroom No. 1. (Court Reporter Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Bench Trial continues on 7/9/2014 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Bench Trial held on 7/8/2014. Attorneys Donovan, Riggs, O'Connor, Donovan, Joyner and Cooper appeared for the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Farr, Strach, Bowers, Peters and Stephens for the Defendant. Evidence presented; matter continued to Wednesday, 7/9/2014 09:00 a.m. in Winston-Salem, Courtroom No. 1. (Court Reporter Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Bench Trial continues on 7/8/2014 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2014. Attorneys Hair, Riggs, Ebenstein, Meza, Russ for the Plaintiffs and Marc Elias for the Intervenor Plaintiff(s). Attorneys Peters, Bowers, Jr, Farr, Strach and Stephenson for the Defendants. Opening Statements made; Plaintffs presented evidence; the court addressed the motions to strike; matter continued to Tuesday, 7/8/2014 09:00 AM in Winston-Salem, Courtroom No. 1. (Court Reporter Nesbit.) (Solomon, Dianne) Modified to edit text on 9/16/2014 (Solomon, Dianne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority Veasey v. Perry Opinion by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Veasey Order) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(RUSS, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY re [167] Declaration, [166] Declaration, (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Plaintiff LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA. MEGHAN JONES is substituted as counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney RAUL PINTO terminated. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(JONES, MEGHAN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Rev. Dr. John Mendez by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY. (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Carolyn Coleman by Plaintiffs BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY. (DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motions Submitted: (106 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 110 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 94 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , and (112 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 108 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 96 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for the Appointment of Federal Observers, to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER- Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2014 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE to all Counsel of Record: Please be advised the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings will be heard on Monday, July 7, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Winston-Salem, Courtroom No. 1. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, to Response to (112 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 108 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 96 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for the Appointment of Federal Observers filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(MEZA, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX re (153 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, BRIAN M. MILLER. (Attachments: # (1) JA2776-2847, # (2) JA2848-3078, # (3) JA3079-3288, # (4) JA3289-3377) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 163 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, BRIAN M. MILLER, to Response to (110 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 114 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 98 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, BRIAN M. MILLER, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(DONOVAN, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY, filed by Defendants RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, to Response to (106 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , (110 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , (94 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Unreported Decision - Armbruster Prods., Inc. v. Wilson) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Movants BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, DAVID R. LEWIS, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, BRIAN M. MILLER, Select Role Types NANCY LUND, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE WALTER, EBONY WEST re (150 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Strike Declaration of Thomas Hofeller filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, CHARLES M. GRAY, FAITH JACKSON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, DAVID R. LEWIS, NANCY LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY WEST, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Hofeller Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit B - Hofeller Resume) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014, Terminated: 8/8/2014 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Strike Declaration of Thomas Hofeller by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, CHARLES M. GRAY, FAITH JACKSON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY WEST, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3. Responses due by 7/24/2014 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Movants BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, BRIAN M. MILLER, Select Role Types NANCY LUND, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE WALTER, EBONY WEST re (148 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and to Strike Declaration of Donald Schroeder filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, CHARLES M. GRAY, FAITH JACKSON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY WEST, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Schroeder Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit B - Schroeder CV, # (3) Exhibit C - AcceptableID, # (4) Appendix 1 - Unpublished Cases) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014, Terminated: 8/8/2014 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and to Strike Declaration of Donald Schroeder by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, CHARLES M. GRAY, FAITH JACKSON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY WEST, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3. Responses due by 7/24/2014 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(SPEAS, EDWIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, KAY BRANDON, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, OCTAVIA RAINEY, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, GOLDIE WELLS, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Movants BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, FAITH JACKSON, BAHEEYAH MADANY, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, Intervenor Plaintiffs ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, LOUIS M. DUKE, CHARLES M. GRAY, BRIAN M. MILLER, Select Role Types NANCY LUND, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, LYNNE WALTER, EBONY WEST re (146 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude and to Strike filed by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, CHARLES M. GRAY, FAITH JACKSON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY WEST, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Trende Deposition, # (2) Exhibit B - Deposition Exhibit 117, # (3) Exhibit C - 6-9-14 Farr Email, # (4) Exhibit D - Deposition Exhibit 116, # (5) Exhibit E - Deposition Exhibit 109, # (6) Exhibit F - Deposition Exhibit 110) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(HO, DALE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014, Terminated: 8/8/2014 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Exclude and to Strike by A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, BARBEE'S CHAPEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH, INC., ASGOD BARRANTES, JOSUE E. BERDUO, BETHEL A. BAPTIST CHURCH, KAY BRANDON, CLINTON TABERNACLE AME ZION CHURCH, CAROLYN COLEMAN, COMMON CAUSE NORTH CAROLINA, COVENANT PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH, LOUIS M. DUKE, ARMENTA EATON, ROSANELL EATON, EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, JOCELYN FERGUSON-KELLY, CHARLES M. GRAY, FAITH JACKSON, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NORTH CAROLINA, NANCY LUND, BAHEEYAH MADANY, BRIAN M. MILLER, BECKY HURLEY MOCK, NEW OXLEY HILL BAPTIST CHURCH, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MARY PERRY, OCTAVIA RAINEY, MARY-WREN RITCHIE, HUGH STOHLER, SARA STOHLER, UNIFOUR ONESTOP COLLABORATIVE, LYNNE WALTER, GOLDIE WELLS, EBONY WEST, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JOHN DOE 3. Responses due by 7/24/2014 Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(HO, DALE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motions Submitted: (158 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 148 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 159 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and to Strike Declaration of Donald Schroeder, (160 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 161 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 150 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Strike Declaration of Thomas Hofeller to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER- Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motions Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motions Submitted: (157 in 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 146 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP, 156 in 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP) Joint MOTION to Exclude and to Strike to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER- Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 6/30/2014. Daniel Donovan, Esq. for the Plaintiffs and Alec Peters, Esq. for the Defendants. The court heard from counsel regarding conduct of the hearing. Cases consolidated for conducting hearings only. The court will hear from the parties as to the request for preliminary injunction and the motion for judgment on the pleadings. Each side allotted 18 hours with Amici coordinated with other parties. Witness declarations to be filed by 12:00 noon on Wednesday, 7/1/2014. Opposition may file motions to strike. Parties to work out sharing of witness and exhibit lists prior to the hearing. Supplemental transcripts excerpts will be allowed as outlined on the record. Post hearing briefs to be determined later date. The hearing will commence on Monday, 7/7/2014 at 9:30 a.m. and continuing from day to day as stated on the record. Courtroom location to be decided later and counsel advised in advance of the hearing. (Court Reporter Nesbit.) (Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 06/27/2014, that Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite and Motion to Compel are GRANTED, and Defendants must make declarants Kim Westbrook Strach, Cherie Poucher, and Carolyn Justice available on July 1, 2014, for depositions of up to two hours each on the topics covered by their respective declarations. The date and time limitations may be modified by agreement of all parties. (Case 1:13CV658) Re [148] MOTION to Compel Depositions of Kim Westbrook Strach, Cherie Poucher, and Carolyn Justice, [149] MOTION to Expedite the Court's Resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Depositions of Kim Westbrook Strach, Cherie Poucher, and Carolyn Justice. Related cases 1:13CV660, 1:13CV861. (Taylor, Abby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: 6/26/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re (140 in 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Compel Depositions of Kim Westbrook Strach, Cherie Poucher, and Carolyn Justice filed by RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, THE, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, RHONDA K. AMOROSO, PAUL J. FOLEY, JOSHUA B. HOWARD, MAJA KRICKER, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, PATRICK LLOYD MCCRORY, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 7/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00658-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00660-TDS-JEP, 1:13-cv-00861-TDS-JEP(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  case referred to magistrate judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED RE: [133] - [135} Memorandum regarding Legislative Immunity and [150] through [153] Response regarding Legislative Immunity to Judge MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Solomon, Dianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 520 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?