Justin Duane Walsh
Bankruptcy Case Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 6:12-bk-14890
District Judge Cynthia C. Jackson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 13, 2016 at 4:47 AM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arvind Mahendru, Trustee
No Logo Justin Duane Walsh, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by John L Martin Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
990 Westunder Street
Palm Bay, FL 32909
BREVARD-FL
SSN / ITIN: xxx-xx-6590 Jon L Martin +1 772 419 0057 +1 772 781 4548

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jon L. Martin, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon L. Martin, Esq. +1 772 419 0057 +1 772 781 4548 jlm@jonlmartinlaw.com
No Logo Lauren Helen Walsh, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by John L Martin Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
990 Westunder Street
Palm Bay, FL 32909
BREVARD-FL
SSN / ITIN: xxx-xx-2369 Jon L Martin +1 772 419 0057 +1 772 781 4548
No Logo United States Trustee - ORL7/13, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
Interim Report 09/30/2013 Filed by Arvind Mahendru. (Mahendru, Arvind) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
    Interim Report 03/31/13 Filed by Arvind Mahendru. (Mahendru, Arvind) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
      Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Abandonment of Property Filed by Arvind Mahendru (related document(s)21). (Mahendru, Arvind) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
        Notice of Abandonment of Property with 21 Day Negative Notice Filed by Arvind Mahendru. (Office of Arvind Mahendru Trustee (1)) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/17/2013, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 19)). Notice Date 03/17/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
            Notice of the Deadline to file Proofs of Claim, served upon all creditors and parties in interest. Proofs of Claims due by 06/17/2013. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
              Amended Schedule B,Schedule C, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Debtor Justin Duane Walsh, Joint Debtor Lauren Helen Walsh. (Martin, Jon) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 16)). Notice Date 02/21/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                  Order Vacating Order Approving Chapter 7 Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond and Closing Estate (case closed in error) - closing data removed, closing has not been sent to Statistics. (Faye) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 13)). Notice Date 02/07/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                      Order Approving Chapter 7 Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond and Closing Estate . (Faye) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                        Discharge of Debtor . (Faye) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                          Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Personal Financial Management for Lauren Helen Walsh with Certificate of Debtor Education Provided by Agency Attached. Date Course was Completed: 10/31/2012 . Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Joint Debtor Lauren Helen Walsh. (Martin, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                            Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Personal Financial Management for Justin Duane Walsh with Certificate of Debtor Education Provided by Agency Attached. Date Course was Completed: 10/31/2012 . Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Debtor Justin Duane Walsh. (Martin, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                              Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. re: 2007 Ford F150 Pickup for the amount of $14879.73 /monthly payments in the amount of $383.06 Filed by Roger A Kelly on behalf of Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Kelly, Roger) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One, N.A.. (Bass, Patti) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Roger A Kelly on behalf of Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Kelly, Roger) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                    Notice of Change of Address Creditor Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Debtor Justin Duane Walsh, Joint Debtor Lauren Helen Walsh. (Martin, Jon) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2012, Entered: None
                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 5)). Notice Date 11/03/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/04/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/5/2012 at 11:30 AM at Orlando, FL (688) Suite 1201B, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 West Washington Street. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 2/4/2013. (Kerry) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 9/18/12. Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Debtor Justin Duane Walsh, Joint Debtor Lauren Helen Walsh. (Kerry) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                            Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Petition, Schedules, and Statement of Affairs Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Debtor Justin Duane Walsh, Joint Debtor Lauren Helen Walsh. (Martin, Jon) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                              Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Debtor Justin Duane Walsh, Joint Debtor Lauren Helen Walsh. (Martin, Jon) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. (Fee Paid.). Schedules A-J and Summary of Schedules. Statement of Financial Affairs. Statement of Intentions. Disclosure of Compensation. Statement of Income and Means Test Calculation. Filed by Jon L Martin on behalf of Justin Duane Walsh, Lauren Helen Walsh. (Martin, Jon) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?