City of Jersey City, et al v. Consolidated Rail Corporation, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-7175

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 6:06 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207571481 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1480538] granting motion for summary affirmance [1471300-2]; withholding issuance of the mandate. Before Judges: Tatel, Brown and Millett. [13-7175]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207559160 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
    REPLY FILED [1473289] by Consolidated Rail Corporation to response [1472583-4], [1473255-2] [Service Date: 01/02/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7175] (Jenkins, Robert)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207559097 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
      REPLY FILED [1473255] by City of Jersey City, Pennsylvania Railroad Harsimus Stem Embankment Preservation Coalition and Rails to Trails Conservancy to response [1472583-4] [Service Date: 01/02/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7175] (Montange, Charles)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207558009 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
        MODIFIED EVENT--RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1472583] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC, 446 Newark Avenue, LLC and City of Jersey City, Consolidated Rail Corporation, Paula T. Dow, Pennsylvania Railroad Harsimus Stem Embankment Preservation Coalition and Rails to Trails Conservancy to motion for summary affirmance [1471300-2], motion for summary affirmance [1470595-2] [Service Date: 12/26/2013 by CM/ECF NDA, 3rd Party] Pages: 16-20. [13-7175]--[Edited 12/27/2013 by LMC] (McCullough, Eric)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207556230 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
          CORRECTED SUPPLEMENT [1471574] to motion for summary affirmance [1471300-2] filed by City of Jersey City, Pennsylvania Railroad Harsimus Stem Embankment Preservation Coalition and Rails to Trails Conservancy [Service Date: 12/19/2013 ] [13-7175] (Montange, Charles)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207555919 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
            CORRECTED MOTION filed [1471300] by City of Jersey City, Pennsylvania Railroad Harsimus Stem Embankment Preservation Coalition and Rails to Trails Conservancy for summary affirmance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/02/2014) [Service Date: 12/18/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [13-7175] (Montange, Charles)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207554796 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
              RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1470695] by Consolidated Rail Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2013 by Email, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [13-7175] (Jenkins, Robert)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207554581 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION filed [1470595] by City of Jersey City, Pennsylvania Railroad Harsimus Stem Embankment Preservation Coalition and Rails to Trails Conservancy for summary affirmance. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/30/2013) [Service Date: 12/16/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7175] (Montange, Charles)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550405 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1468349] by City of Jersey City, Pennsylvania Railroad Harsimus Stem Embankment Preservation Coalition and Rails to Trails Conservancy [Service Date: 11/29/2013 ] [13-7175] (Montange, Charles)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550367 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                    UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1468338] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC and 446 Newark Avenue, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2013 ] [13-7175] (McCullough, Eric)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550363 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1468337] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC and 446 Newark Avenue, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [13-7175] (McCullough, Eric)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550360 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                        STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1468336] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC and 446 Newark Avenue, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2013 ] [13-7175] (McCullough, Eric)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550357 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                          JOINT STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1468335] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC and 446 Newark Avenue, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2013 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [13-7175] (McCullough, Eric)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550353 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                            DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1468334] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC and 446 Newark Avenue, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2013 ] [13-7175] (McCullough, Eric)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550350 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1468333] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC and 446 Newark Avenue, LLC [Service Date: 11/29/2013 ] [13-7175] (McCullough, Eric)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550346 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
                                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1468332] by Daniel E. Horgan and co-counsel Eric D. McCullough on behalf of Appellants 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC and 415 Brunswick Street, LLC. [13-7175] (McCullough, Eric)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550243 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1468282] by Kenneth M. Worton on behalf of Appellee Paula T. Dow. [13-7175] (Worton, Kenneth)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207550003 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1468141] by Charles Montange and co-counsel Andrea Ferster on behalf of Appellee Rails to Trails Conservancy. [13-7175] (Ferster, Andrea)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207549994 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1468138] by Charles H. Montange on behalf of Appellees City of Jersey City, Pennsylvania Railroad Harsimus Stem Embankment Preservation Coalition and Rails to Trails Conservancy. [13-7175] (Montange, Charles)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207549867 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1468068] by Consolidated Rail Corporation [Service Date: 11/26/2013 ] [13-7175] (Jenkins, Robert)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207549841 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                          ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1468054] by Robert M. Jenkins III and co-counsel Adam C. Sloane on behalf of Appellee Consolidated Rail Corporation. [13-7175] (Jenkins, Robert)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207541929 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1463710] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/29/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/16/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 11/29/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/29/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/29/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/16/2013 [13-7175]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207541829 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1463670] by 212 Marin Boulevard, LLC, 247 Manila Avenue, LLC, 280 Erie Street, LLC, 317 Jersey Avenue, LLC, 354 Cole Street, LLC, 389 Monmouth Street, LLC, 415 Brunswick Street, LLC and 446 Newark Avenue, LLC seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:09-cv-01900-ABJ. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-7175]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?