Montgomery et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. et al
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-dp-22633
District Judge David A. Katz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 3:15 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Armelia Montgomery, Plaintiff
No Logo Puter Montgomery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calvin Carter Clay +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 carterc@pdkhlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
v.
No Logo Depuy International Ltd, Defendant
Officially listed as "DePuy International Limited"
No Logo Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren D. Godfrey +1 973 360 9831 Lauren.Godfrey@dbr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Margaret Sharko +1 973 360 1100 +1 973 360 9831 susan.sharko@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen L. Mayer +1 216 592 5000
No Logo De Puy, Inc., Defendant
Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Johnson & Johnson"
Officer/Director, Barrier Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Immunicon Corp
Officer/Director, Nevro Corp
Officer/Director, Fusion Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Officer/Director, Inno-tech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Biopsys Medical, Inc.
Officer/Director, De Puy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Femrx, Inc.
Officer/Director, Heartport, Inc.
Officer/Director, Orapharma, Inc.
Officer/Director, Tri Point Medical Corp
Officer/Director, Animas Corp
Officer/Director, Provention Bio, Inc.
Johnson & Johnson International Johnson & Johnson International, Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
    Address Change Notice by Calvin C. Clay filed by on behalf of Armelia Montgomery, Puter Montgomery. (Clay, Calvin) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Armelia Montgomery, Puter Montgomery. DePuy Inc. waiver sent on 11/10/2011, answer due 1/9/2012. filed on behalf of Armelia Montgomery; Puter Montgomery (Hellums, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Armelia Montgomery, Puter Montgomery. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. waiver sent on 11/10/2011, answer due 1/9/2012; Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 11/10/2011, answer due 1/9/2012; Johnson & Johnson International waiver sent on 11/10/2011, answer due 1/9/2012; Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. waiver sent on 11/10/2011, answer due 1/9/2012. filed on behalf of Armelia Montgomery; Puter Montgomery (Hellums, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
          Notice of Filing Answer filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 1 .(Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
            Original Summons issued for service upon DePuy International Limited. (S,J) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
              Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-5021639 Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 2197. Filed by Armelia Montgomery, Puter Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (Hellums, Christopher) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 40 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?