Argonaut Ins Co Vs Joe Dudley Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 86 865076
Superior Court Judge Lucy K. Mccabe, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Argonaut Insurance Companies, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, Kirk M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirk M. Barry +1 209 276 0600
v.
No Logo Burgermeister, Alfred, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps, J Michael - Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Michael - Phelps +1 415 433 3733
No Logo Burgermeister, Todd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps, J Michael - Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Michael - Phelps +1 415 433 3733
No Logo Dudley, Joe, Defendant
No Logo Gen. Contractors Inspection Svc, Defendant
No Logo Janszen, Walter Louis Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler, Lynn A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn A. Altshuler +1 415 434 4774
No Logo Koenig, Peter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler, Lynn A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn A. Altshuler +1 415 434 4774
No Logo Kohn, Monteser D., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 10/13/1987, Entered: 10/13/1987
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal Without Prejudice
    Blank 15 Filed: 9/28/1987, Entered: 9/28/1987
    Request For Dismissal, Without Prejudice, Entire Action, Filed, Each Party To Bear Their Own Costs
      Blank 14 Filed: 2/9/1987, Entered: 2/9/1987
      Memo Of P/a In Opps To Demurrer Filed
        Blank 13 Filed: 2/4/1987, Entered: 2/4/1987
        Suppl Memo Of P/a In Supp Of Opps To Demurrer Filed
          Blank 12 Filed: 2/4/1987, Entered: 2/4/1987
          Reply In Support Of Demurrer Filed
            Blank 11 Filed: 1/28/1987, Entered: 1/28/1987
            Demurrer To Complaint, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Mar-13-1987 At 09:30 Am In Dept 5
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/28/1987, Entered: 1/28/1987
              Fees Of Monteser D. Kohn
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/28/1987, Entered: 1/28/1987
                Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer To Complaint
                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/1987, Entered: 1/6/1987
                  Hearing On Demurrer, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Feb-10-1987 At 09:30 Am In Dept 5
                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/6/1987, Entered: 1/6/1987
                    Amended Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer To Complaint
                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/1986, Entered: 12/16/1986
                      Fees Of Peter Koenig And Walter Janszen
                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/1986, Entered: 12/16/1986
                        Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer To Complaint
                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/16/1986, Entered: 12/16/1986
                          Fees Of Alfred And Todd Burgermeister
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/16/1986, Entered: 12/16/1986
                            Answer By Alfred And Todd Burgermeister To Complaint
                              Blank 2 Filed: 10/6/1986, Entered: 10/6/1986
                              Summons
                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/6/1986, Entered: 10/6/1986
                                Complaint By Argonaut Ins. Cos. For Declaratory Relief

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?