Lucas Vs Littell
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 86 867711
Superior Court Judge Richard E. Best, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo L'heureux, Jeanne Jo (pp), Plaintiff
No Logo Lucas, Frank J., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Diverbiss, Rod

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rod Diverbiss +1 415 974 1515
v.
No Logo Hybrid Investments, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reuben, Quint & Valkevich

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reuben, Quint & Valkevich +1 415 957 9000
No Logo Littell, Joyce V, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo Littell, Robert L, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo Goldberg, Stinnett, Davis & Linchey, PC, Claimant
Officially listed as "Goldberg, Stinnett & Mac Donald"
No Logo Security Pacific Natl Bank, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bingham Mccutchen Llp +1 415 393 2000
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 149 Filed: 6/23/1993, Entered: 6/23/1993
Proceedings Reported By Buron K. Watson Sc 16
    Blank 148 Filed: 6/22/1993, Entered: 6/22/1993
    Proceedings Reported By Buron K. Watson Sc 16
      Blank 147 Filed: 6/22/1993, Entered: 6/22/1993 Court Filing
      Assigned To Sc16, Judge Bea, For Trial On 6-22-93 At 9:30 A.m., Calendar Motion: Court Trial Hearing Set For Jun-22-1993 At 09:31 Am In Dept 16
        Blank 146 Filed: 6/22/1993, Entered: 6/22/1993 Court Filing
        Scd1-tr.cal.: Assigned To Sc16, Judge Bea, For Trial On 6-22-93 At 9:30 A.m.
          Blank 145 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993
          Scd1-tr.cal.: Trial Cont To 6-21-93
            Blank 144 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993
            Scd1-tr.cal.: Cont. On Trial Calendar. Dropped From 6-14-93 Calendar
              Blank 143 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993
              Tr. Cal. 6-14-93
                Blank 142 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993
                Declaration Of Mark L. Epstein
                  Blank 141 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993
                  Declaration
                    Blank 140 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993
                    Substitution Of Attorney, Moore, Divelbiss & Gulick For Pltf, Frank J. Lucas
                      Blank 139 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993
                      Scd1-tr.cal.: Trial Cont To 6-14-93
                        Blank 138 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993
                        Scd1-tr.cal.: Cont. On Trial Calendar. Dropped From 6-7-93 Calendar
                          Blank 137 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993
                          Tr. Cal. 6-7-93
                            Blank 136 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993 Court Filing
                            170.6 Ccp Disqualification As To Judge Dandurand (pltf)
                              Blank 135 Filed: 6/4/1993, Entered: 6/4/1993
                              Added To Court Calendar
                                Blank 134 Filed: 6/4/1993, Entered: 6/4/1993
                                Transferred From Jury To Court Calendar-failure To Timely Deposit Jury Fees
                                  Blank 133 Filed: 2/24/1993, Entered: 2/24/1993
                                  Substitution Of Pltf, Jeanne Jo L'heureux In Pro Per
                                    Blank 132 Filed: 2/24/1993, Entered: 2/24/1993
                                    Substitution Of Pltf, Frank J. Lucas In Pro Per
                                      Blank 131 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 1/25/1993
                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order
                                        Blank 130 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 1/25/1993
                                        (2) Substitution Of Attorney (for Plaintiffs)
                                          Blank 129 Filed: 12/28/1992, Entered: 12/28/1992
                                          Order Re Plntffs' Motion For Trial Continuance To Jan 19 1993
                                            Blank 128 Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 12/22/1992
                                            Scd1-mo.cal.: Trial Cont. By Motion To 6-7-93
                                              Blank 127 Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 12/22/1992
                                              Scd1-mo.cal.: Pltf Mo. Cont. 1-19-93 Trial Granted; Dropped From Calendar
                                                Blank 126 Filed: 12/1/1992, Entered: 12/1/1992
                                                Declaration Of David W Rudy
                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 12/1/1992, Entered: 12/1/1992
                                                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Trial Continuance
                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 12/1/1992, Entered: 12/1/1992
                                                    Ntc Of Motion/motion For Trial Continuance, Calendar Motion: Continuance Of Trial Date Hearing Set For Dec-22-1992 At 09:30 Am In Dept 1
                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 8/7/1992, Entered: 8/7/1992
                                                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Settlement Conference
                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 7/29/1992, Entered: 7/29/1992
                                                        Trial Setting/arbitration Conference Order
                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 7/29/1992, Entered: 7/29/1992
                                                          S/c 12-3-92 #5 8:30 Am,, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Dec-03-1992 At 08:30 Am In Dept 5
                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 7/29/1992, Entered: 7/29/1992
                                                            Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 7/27/1992, Entered: 7/27/1992
                                                              S/c 12-3-92 #12 9:00 Am,
                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 7/27/1992, Entered: 7/27/1992
                                                                A/i 11-21-92,
                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 7/27/1992, Entered: 7/27/1992
                                                                  Tsc, Jury Trial 1-19-93, Deft Demands, Settl Conf 12-3-92, #12 9:00 Am (ptr1),
                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 6/1/1992, Entered: 6/1/1992
                                                                    Notice Of Trial Setting Conference
                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 5/29/1992, Entered: 5/29/1992
                                                                      Ntc Of Motion To Compel & For Sanctions, Calendar Motion: Compel, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Jun-17-1992 At 10:30 Am In Dept 469
                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 11/21/1991, Entered: 11/21/1991
                                                                        At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 12/21/1990, Entered: 12/21/1990
                                                                          Answer Of Frank Lucas & Jeanne Jo L'heureux To X-complaint Of Robert L Littell
                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 11/20/1990, Entered: 11/20/1990
                                                                            Substitution Of Attorney [joyce V Littell]
                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 11/20/1990, Entered: 11/20/1990
                                                                              Substitution Of Attorney [robert L Littell]
                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 11/20/1990, Entered: 11/20/1990
                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 11/20/1990, Entered: 11/20/1990
                                                                                  First Amended Cross-complaint For Breach Of Contract
                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 8/5/1988, Entered: 8/5/1988
                                                                                    Order On Demurrer
                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 8/4/1988, Entered: 8/4/1988
                                                                                      Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Quash Deposition Notice On Supoena
                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 8/2/1988, Entered: 8/2/1988
                                                                                        Notice Of Order Overruling Demurrer
                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 8/1/1988, Entered: 8/1/1988
                                                                                          Opposition To Motion To Quash Deposition Notice And Subpoena
                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 8/1/1988, Entered: 8/1/1988
                                                                                            Declaration Of Robert L. Littell In Opps To Motion For Order Allowing Discovery
                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 8/1/1988, Entered: 8/1/1988
                                                                                              Memo Of P/a In Opps To Motion For Order Allowing Discovery Of Defts' Financial Condition
                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 7/28/1988, Entered: 7/28/1988
                                                                                                Demurrer To 2nd Amended Complt (each C/a) Is Overruled W/30 Days Leave To Answer (15) Chesney
                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 7/26/1988, Entered: 7/26/1988
                                                                                                  Reply Memo In Support Of Demurrer By Does 1-3
                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 7/25/1988, Entered: 7/25/1988
                                                                                                    Cross-compaint Of Robert L Littell & Joyce V Littell-- No Summons Issued
                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 7/25/1988, Entered: 7/25/1988
                                                                                                      Answer Of Robert L Littell & Joyce V Littell To 2nd Amd Complt
                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 7/22/1988, Entered: 7/22/1988
                                                                                                        Temporary Protective Order
                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 7/22/1988, Entered: 7/22/1988
                                                                                                          Stipulation To Temporary Protective Order
                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 7/21/1988, Entered: 7/21/1988
                                                                                                            Pltfs' Opps To Demurrer
                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 7/15/1988, Entered: 7/15/1988
                                                                                                              Court Of Appeal Order Denying Writ Of Mandate/prohibition
                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 7/8/1988, Entered: 7/8/1988
                                                                                                                Demurrer Robert Littell, Joyce Littell, Hybrid Invest- Ments, Inc.
                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 7/8/1988, Entered: 7/8/1988
                                                                                                                  $253. Pd By:robert Littell, Joyce Littell, Hybrid Investments, Inc.
                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 7/8/1988, Entered: 7/8/1988
                                                                                                                    Ntc Of Hearing On Demurrer By Robert Littell, Joyce Littell, Hybrid Investments, Inc., Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Jul-28-1988 At 09:30 Am In Dept 15
                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 7/8/1988, Entered: 7/8/1988
                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Lawrence R. Sussman Re: Request Fro Judicial Notice In Support Of Demurrer
                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 7/8/1988, Entered: 7/8/1988
                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Demurrer
                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 6/28/1988, Entered: 6/28/1988
                                                                                                                          Notice Of Motion To Allow Disc Re Financial Condition, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-13-1988 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 469
                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 6/28/1988, Entered: 6/28/1988
                                                                                                                            (2) Declarations
                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 6/14/1988, Entered: 6/14/1988
                                                                                                                              Motion To Quash Deposition, Calendar Motion: To Quash Hearing Set For Jul-11-1988 At 09:00 Am In Dept 469
                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 6/10/1988, Entered: 6/10/1988
                                                                                                                                Applctn For Temp Protective Order After Rt To Attach Order Issued, Ex Parte
                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 6/10/1988, Entered: 6/10/1988
                                                                                                                                  Temporary Protective Order
                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 6/9/1988, Entered: 6/9/1988
                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 6/8/1988, Entered: 6/8/1988
                                                                                                                                      Declaration
                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 6/8/1988, Entered: 6/8/1988
                                                                                                                                        Declaration
                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 6/8/1988, Entered: 6/8/1988
                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 6/8/1988, Entered: 6/8/1988
                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 6/8/1988, Entered: 6/8/1988
                                                                                                                                              Memo Of P/a In Oppos To Motin To Compel Answers
                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 6/7/1988, Entered: 6/7/1988
                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 6/6/1988, Entered: 6/6/1988
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 6/6/1988, Entered: 6/6/1988
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration In Support Of Motion To Compel
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 6/6/1988, Entered: 6/6/1988
                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion To Compel & Sanctions, Calendar Motion: Compel, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Jun-09-1988 At 11:00 Am In Dept 469
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 6/3/1988, Entered: 6/3/1988
                                                                                                                                                        Applic For Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 6/1/1988, Entered: 6/1/1988
                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 5/31/1988, Entered: 5/31/1988
                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Motion For An Order Compelling Depos & For Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 5/31/1988, Entered: 5/31/1988
                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Lawrence R. Sussman
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 5/31/1988, Entered: 5/31/1988
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Joel Yodowitz
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Serrice By Hand Delivery
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Taylor-price
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of David Hirshchi-cypers
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Elizabeth R. F. Monnet
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                          Application For Order Shortening Time
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                            Order Shortening Time Re: Service Of Pltf's Motion To Compel
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of David W. Rudy
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 5/25/1988, Entered: 5/25/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion To Compel & Sanctions & Memo P/a, Calendar Motion: Compel, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Jun-07-1988 At 10:00 Am In Dept 469
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 5/24/1988, Entered: 5/24/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 5/24/1988, Entered: 5/24/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request For Sanctions At Exparte Applic.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 5/12/1988, Entered: 5/12/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 5/12/1988, Entered: 5/12/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                        Temporary Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 5/9/1988, Entered: 5/9/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                          (2) Applic. & Order For Appearance & Examination, Calendar Motion: Order Of Examination Hearing Set For May-12-1988 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 469
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 5/6/1988, Entered: 5/6/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                            Application For Attachment, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. (attachment)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 5/6/1988, Entered: 5/6/1988
                                                                                                                                                                                              Temporary Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 11/25/1987, Entered: 11/25/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Writ Of Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 8/31/1987, Entered: 8/31/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                  2nd Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 8/20/1987, Entered: 8/20/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Re Pltfs' Attys Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 8/3/1987, Entered: 8/3/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 7/31/1987, Entered: 7/31/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order For Disposition Of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 7/31/1987, Entered: 7/31/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 7/30/1987, Entered: 7/30/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Re Littell's Demurrer & Mo To Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 7/30/1987, Entered: 7/30/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Order Re: Entitling Pltf & 3rd-party Claimant To Satisfy &/or To Secure Their Claims Against Deft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 7/21/1987, Entered: 7/21/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                *complaint Is Denied (5)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 7/21/1987, Entered: 7/21/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *is Overruled. Mo To Strike The Emotional Distress Allegations To Plaintiff's First Amended *conn'd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 7/21/1987, Entered: 7/21/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *of Action); Dem Is Sustained With 30 Days Leave To Amend As To 6 And 7 Cause Of Action, 5 *conn'd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 7/21/1987, Entered: 7/21/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Robert L & Joyce V. Littel Dem To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (5,6, & 7 Cause Of *conn'd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 7/14/1987, Entered: 7/14/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pltf's Oppos To Demurrer And Mo To Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 7/14/1987, Entered: 7/14/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply To Memo Of P/a In Oppos To Mo For Atty Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 7/9/1987, Entered: 7/9/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Security Pacific National Bank's Memo In Opposition To Pltfs' Motion For Order Awarding Attys' Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 7/9/1987, Entered: 7/9/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memo Of P/a In Oppos To Mo For Atty Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 7/1/1987, Entered: 7/1/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Elizabeth R.f. Monnet In Support Of Mo For Awarding Atty Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 7/1/1987, Entered: 7/1/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memo Of P/a In Support Of Mo For Atty Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 7/1/1987, Entered: 7/1/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ntc Of Mo For Order, Awarding Atty Fees, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-16-1987 At 09:30 Am In Dept 469
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 6/25/1987, Entered: 6/25/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memo Of P/a In Support Of Demurrer & Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 6/25/1987, Entered: 6/25/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion To Strike Emotional Distress Allegation Of 1st Amended Complaint, Calendar Motion: Hearing, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-21-1987 At 09:30 Am In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 6/25/1987, Entered: 6/25/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Demurrer Of Robert L Littell & Joyce V Littell To 1st Amended Complaint, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-21-1987 At 09:30 Am In Dept 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 6/25/1987, Entered: 6/25/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ntc Of Hearing On Demurrer Of Littells
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 6/10/1987, Entered: 6/10/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ntc Of Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 6/9/1987, Entered: 6/9/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Court Judgment - Microphotocopied Re 3rd Party Claim Of Security Paicifc Natl Bank
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/14/1987, Entered: 5/14/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  1st Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/27/1987, Entered: 4/27/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Order Sustaining 3rd Party Claim Of Security Pacific Natl Bank (best)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/24/1987, Entered: 4/24/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (2) Declarations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/14/1987, Entered: 4/14/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ntc Of Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 4/10/1987, Entered: 4/10/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order On Demurrer & Motion To Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 3/31/1987, Entered: 3/31/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memo Of Littells In Support Of Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 3/17/1987, Entered: 3/17/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Table Of Contents - Plaintiffs' Oppos To Demurrer & Mo To Stirke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 3/6/1987, Entered: 3/6/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Oppos To Demurrer & Mo To Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 2/18/1987, Entered: 2/18/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Writ Of Attachment (ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 2/18/1987, Entered: 2/18/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Memo In Oppos To Security Pacific Natl Bank's 3rd Party Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 2/11/1987, Entered: 2/11/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Court Judgment - Microphotocopied
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/28/1987, Entered: 1/28/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oppos To Petition Of Security Pacific Re 3rd Party Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/27/1987, Entered: 1/27/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Re Funds Held By The Sf Sheriff's Office - File No. 00567
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/22/1987, Entered: 1/22/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ntc Of Hearing To Determine 3rd-party Claim Of Security Pacific Natl Bank
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/22/1987, Entered: 1/22/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Petition For Hearing On 3rd-party Claim Of Security Pacific Natl Bank
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 1/20/1987, Entered: 1/20/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo Of P/a In Support Of Demurrer & Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/20/1987, Entered: 1/20/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion To Strike Punitive & Emotional Distress Allega- Tions Of Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/1987, Entered: 1/20/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Demurrer Of Robert Littell & Joyce Littell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/20/1987, Entered: 1/20/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      $175 Pd By: Robert Littell & Joyce Littell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/20/1987, Entered: 1/20/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ntc Of Hearing On Demurrer By Littells
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/15/1987, Entered: 1/15/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Oppos To Petition Of Goldberg, Stinnett & Mac Donald Re 3rd Party Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/13/1987, Entered: 1/13/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ntc Of Hearing On 3rd Party Claim - Goldberg, Stinnett & Mac Donald
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/8/1987, Entered: 1/8/1987
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Re 3rd Party Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/22/1986, Entered: 12/22/1986
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application & Order For Appearance & Examination, Attach Ment, Third Person
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/17/1986, Entered: 12/17/1986
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment (resident)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/4/1986, Entered: 12/4/1986
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Lawyer's Surety Bond Gct859565, $7500.00 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/4/1986, Entered: 12/4/1986
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Rt To Attach Order & Order For Issuance Of Writ Of Attachment (resident)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/1986, Entered: 12/1/1986
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/1/1986, Entered: 12/1/1986
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Complaint For Fraud, Constructive Trust, Negligent Mis- Representation, Breach Of Contract, Etc

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?