Corporate Mortgage Invst Vs Beta Propert
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 87 874760

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Corporate Mortgage Investors, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Adleson, Hess & Kelly, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adleson, Hess, Christensen & Kelly +1 408 341 0234
v.
No Logo Beta Properties, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space City Attorney Of San Francisco +1 415 554 3924
No Logo Lee, Helen S, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pettit & Martin (sj)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pettit & Martin +1 408 295 3210
No Logo Lee, Sui T, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pettit & Martin (sj)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pettit & Martin +1 408 295 3210
No Logo Littell, Robert L, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo Powers, Jane Bernard, Defendant
No Logo Powers, Thomas Shelton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo Security Pacific National Bank, Defendant
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 4/23/1990, Entered: 4/23/1990
Notice Of Withdrawal Of Lis Pendens
    Blank 39 Filed: 4/23/1990, Entered: 4/23/1990
    Request For Dismissal, With Prejudice, Entire Action
      Blank 38 Filed: 4/17/1990, Entered: 4/17/1990
      Scd1-mo.cal.: Case Settled Per Adleson, Pltf. Atty
        Blank 37 Filed: 2/28/1990, Entered: 2/28/1990
        Added To Calendar
          Blank 36 Filed: 2/1/1990, Entered: 2/1/1990
          Request For Entry Of Default - Entered As To: Sui T Lee & Helen S Lee
            Blank 35 Filed: 2/1/1990, Entered: 2/1/1990
            At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
              Blank 34 Filed: 9/21/1989, Entered: 9/21/1989
              (2) Proof Of Service
                Blank 33 Filed: 9/5/1989, Entered: 9/5/1989
                Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar; Stip & Order Removing From Tr. Cal. And Striking At Issue Filed 9-1-89
                  Blank 32 Filed: 9/1/1989, Entered: 9/1/1989
                  Stipulation And Order Re Removing Case From Trial Calendar & Striking At-issue Memo
                    Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/1989, Entered: 8/15/1989
                    Added To Calendar
                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/26/1989, Entered: 7/26/1989
                      At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/7/1989, Entered: 3/7/1989
                        Stipulation And Order Re Removing Case From Trial Calendar & Striking At-issue Memo
                          Blank 28 Filed: 3/6/1989, Entered: 3/6/1989
                          Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar, Stip & Order
                            Blank 27 Filed: 3/3/1989, Entered: 3/3/1989
                            (2) Proof Of Service
                              Blank 26 Filed: 2/3/1989, Entered: 2/3/1989
                              Added To Calendar
                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/13/1989, Entered: 1/13/1989
                                At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/10/1989, Entered: 1/10/1989
                                  Request To Enter Default - Not Entered
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/10/1989, Entered: 1/10/1989
                                    Request To Enter Default-entered As To: Office Of The District Directors Of The Internal Revenue Service
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/10/1989, Entered: 1/10/1989
                                      Stipulation Of Facts And Legal Effect
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/10/1989, Entered: 1/10/1989
                                        Proof Of Service
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/15/1988, Entered: 12/15/1988
                                          Proof Of Service
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/15/1988, Entered: 12/15/1988
                                            (2) Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: 11/21/1988
                                              Request To Enter Default-entered As To: Shiver, Mcgrane & Martin
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: 11/21/1988
                                                Request To Enter Default - Not Entered
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: 11/21/1988
                                                  Request To Enter Default-entered As To: Joyce Littell
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: 11/21/1988
                                                    Request To Enter Default-entered As To: Catalyst Financialcorp
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: 11/21/1988
                                                      Summons Filed
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 11/8/1988, Entered: 11/8/1988
                                                        Summons Filed
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 11/8/1988, Entered: 11/8/1988
                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/8/1988, Entered: 11/8/1988
                                                            Proof Of Service
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/8/1988, Entered: 11/8/1988
                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/1/1988, Entered: 9/1/1988
                                                                (4) Proof Of Service
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/22/1988, Entered: 8/22/1988
                                                                  Answer Of Ccsf To Amd Complt
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/14/1988, Entered: 4/14/1988
                                                                    Summons Issued
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/14/1988, Entered: 4/14/1988
                                                                      Amended Complaint For Foreclosure Of Deed Of Trust And For Deficiency Judgment
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/14/1988, Entered: 4/14/1988
                                                                        Stipulation And Order To File An Amended Complaint Under Sections 473 And 474 Ccp
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/1987, Entered: 6/17/1987
                                                                          (3)proof Of Personal Service
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/17/1987, Entered: 6/17/1987
                                                                            Notice Of Action Pending
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/27/1987, Entered: 4/27/1987
                                                                              Summons
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/27/1987, Entered: 4/27/1987
                                                                                Complaint For Foreclosure Of Deed Of Trust

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?