Gullickson Vs Washauer
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 87 884095
Superior Court Judge Lucy K. Mccabe, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gullickson, Gary, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman, Cindy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy Gilman +1 415 421 7111
v.
No Logo Washauer, William, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 10/31/1988, Entered: 10/31/1988
Request For Dismissal, With Prejudice, Entire Action & X-complaint With Prejudice
    Blank 19 Filed: 8/22/1988, Entered: 8/22/1988
    Court Granted Deft's Motin To Expunge Lis Pendens (15) Chesney
      Blank 18 Filed: 7/29/1988, Entered: 7/29/1988
      Notice Of Motion To Expunge Lis Pendens, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Aug-22-1988 At 09:30 Am In Dept 15
        Blank 17 Filed: 7/28/1988, Entered: 7/28/1988
        Application And Order For Order Shortening Time
          Blank 16 Filed: 7/7/1988, Entered: 7/7/1988
          At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
            Blank 15 Filed: 5/4/1988, Entered: 5/4/1988
            General Denial Of Gary Gullickson
              Blank 14 Filed: 3/4/1988, Entered: 3/4/1988
              Cross-complaint Of William Washauer
                Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/1988, Entered: 3/4/1988
                General Denial Of William Washauer [as Executor Of The Estate Of Ruth H Gambo, Deceased]
                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/18/1988, Entered: 2/18/1988
                  Order Re Demurrer
                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/3/1988, Entered: 2/3/1988
                    *action) Is Overruled, 30 Days To Answer (5)
                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/3/1988, Entered: 2/3/1988
                      Deft William Washauer, Executor Of The Estate Of Ruth N. Gumbo, Deceased, Demurrer To Complt (1-3 Cause Of *conn'd
                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/29/1988, Entered: 1/29/1988
                        Deft's Response To Pltf's Opps To Deft's Demurrer To Complt
                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/1988, Entered: 1/27/1988
                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Deft's Demurrer
                            Blank 7 Filed: 12/28/1987, Entered: 12/28/1987
                            $103 Pd By: William Washauer
                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/28/1987, Entered: 12/28/1987
                              Ntc Of Hrg On Dem To Complt By Washauer
                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/28/1987, Entered: 12/28/1987
                                Demurrer Of William Washauer, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Feb-03-1988 At 09:30 Am In Dept 5
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/28/1987, Entered: 12/28/1987
                                  Memo Of P/a In Suppt Of Washauer's Dem To Complt
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 11/12/1987, Entered: 11/12/1987
                                    Proof Of Service By Mail
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/12/1987, Entered: 11/12/1987
                                      Notice Of Pendency Of Action
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/12/1987, Entered: 11/12/1987
                                        Complaint For Breach Of Oral Contract - Summons Issued

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?