Ng Vs Lavigne
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 87 884316

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ng, Tillie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
v.
No Logo Lavigna, Lauren, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Low, Ball & Lynch +1 415 981 6630
No Logo Lavigna, Ronald M, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Low, Ball & Lynch +1 415 981 6630
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 2/6/1990, Entered: 2/6/1990
Acknowledgment Of Satisfaction Of Judgment, Full
    Blank 14 Filed: 9/8/1989, Entered: 9/8/1989
    Amended Memorandum Of Costs (summary)
      Blank 13 Filed: 8/31/1989, Entered: 8/31/1989
      Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
        Blank 12 Filed: 8/14/1989, Entered: 8/14/1989
        Memorandum Of Costs (summary)
          Blank 11 Filed: 7/7/1989, Entered: 7/7/1989
          Arbitration Award - Microphotocopied (8/8/89)
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/21/1989, Entered: 2/21/1989
            Trial Setting/arbitration Conference Order
              Blank 9 Filed: 2/17/1989, Entered: 2/17/1989
              Ordered To Arbitration; S/c 3-28-89, #11, 2:30 Pm (ptr1)
                Blank 8 Filed: 2/8/1989, Entered: 2/8/1989
                Added To Calendar Hearing Set For Feb-17-1989 At 09:30 Am In Dept 98
                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/20/1989, Entered: 1/20/1989
                  Counter At-issue Memo
                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/1989, Entered: 1/12/1989
                    At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/19/1988, Entered: 1/19/1988
                      Summons Filed
                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/1988, Entered: 1/11/1988
                        $ 175. Pd By: Lauren Lavigna & Ronald M Lavigna
                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/1988, Entered: 1/11/1988
                          Answer Of Lauren Lavigna & Ronlad M Lavigna To Complaint
                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/17/1987, Entered: 11/17/1987
                            Summons Issued On Complaint
                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/17/1987, Entered: 11/17/1987
                              Complaint For Negligence (personal Injury) Jury Trial Requested

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?