Sherman Vs Nico Industries Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 88 896945

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sherman, Christine J, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
v.
No Logo Miller, Russell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hendrickson, Higbie & Cole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henrickson, Higbie & Cole +1 415 434 1474
No Logo Nico Industries Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hendrickson, Higbie & Cole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henrickson, Higbie & Cole +1 415 434 1474
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 10/2/1989, Entered: 10/2/1989
Off Calendar, Removed To Federal Court, Ab3300, Scd3
    Blank 40 Filed: 7/7/1989, Entered: 7/7/1989
    Dropped From Calendar
      Blank 39 Filed: 6/23/1989, Entered: 6/23/1989
      Attachments To Notice Of Removal
        Blank 38 Filed: 6/22/1989, Entered: 6/22/1989
        Notice Of Removal
          Blank 37 Filed: 6/20/1989, Entered: 6/20/1989
          Pre Trial Settlement Conf, Did Not Settle Ab3300 Sc20
            Blank 36 Filed: 6/20/1989, Entered: 6/20/1989
            Notice To Appear At Trial
              Blank 35 Filed: 6/19/1989, Entered: 6/19/1989
              (5) Notice To Appear At Trial
                Blank 34 Filed: 6/12/1989, Entered: 6/12/1989
                Pretrial Statement
                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/12/1989, Entered: 6/12/1989
                  Pretrial Conference Statement
                    Blank 32 Filed: 6/6/1989, Entered: 6/6/1989
                    $78 Jury Fees Dep. By Robert Wilson #02476
                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/23/1989, Entered: 5/23/1989
                      Request For Jury Trial
                        Blank 30 Filed: 4/19/1989, Entered: 4/19/1989
                        Dropped From Calendar
                          Blank 29 Filed: 2/7/1989, Entered: 2/7/1989
                          Notice Of Status & Setting Conference Order
                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/17/1989, Entered: 1/17/1989
                            Status & Setting Conference Order
                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/12/1989, Entered: 1/12/1989
                              Ab3300 Jury Trial
                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/12/1989, Entered: 1/12/1989
                                Ab3300 Pre Trial Conference Hearing Set For Jun-20-1989 At 04:00 Am In Dept 20
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 12/27/1988, Entered: 12/27/1988
                                  Proof Of Service
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/27/1988, Entered: 12/27/1988
                                    Status & Setting Confernce Statement
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 12/21/1988, Entered: 12/21/1988
                                      Status & Setting Conference Statement
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 12/15/1988, Entered: 12/15/1988
                                        Proof Of Service
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/1988, Entered: 12/15/1988
                                          Answer Of Nico Industries Inc & Russell Miller
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 12/14/1988, Entered: 12/14/1988
                                            Stip & Order Re Answer To Complaint
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/1988, Entered: 12/12/1988
                                              Substitution Of Attorney
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/12/1988, Entered: 12/12/1988
                                                Substitution Of Attorney
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: 11/21/1988
                                                  Pltf's Oppos To Defts' Demurrer & Motion To Strike; Conditional Request For Judicial Notice
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/31/1988, Entered: 10/31/1988
                                                    Amended Notice Of Defts' Demurrers & Motion To Strike
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/31/1988, Entered: 10/31/1988
                                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Of Notice Of Defts' Demurrer & Motion To Strike
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/25/1988, Entered: 10/25/1988
                                                        $179. Pd By: Nico Industries, Inc. & Russell Miller
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/25/1988, Entered: 10/25/1988
                                                          Ntc Of Defendants' Demurrers And Motion To Strike By Nico Industries, Inc. And Russell Miller
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/25/1988, Entered: 10/25/1988
                                                            Demurrers And Motion To Strike
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 10/25/1988, Entered: 10/25/1988
                                                              Declaration Of Judith L. Baxter
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/25/1988, Entered: 10/25/1988
                                                                Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/25/1988, Entered: 10/25/1988
                                                                  Memo Of Points And Authorities
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/11/1988, Entered: 10/11/1988
                                                                    Summons Filed
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/29/1988, Entered: 9/29/1988
                                                                      Ab3300 Status Conference Hearing Set For Jan-12-1989 At 08:45 Am In Dept 20
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/15/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988
                                                                        Due Date - Status And Setting Conference Statement, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Dec-22-1988 At 06:00 Am In Dept 20
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/15/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988
                                                                          Due Date - Proof Of Service, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Nov-03-1988 At 05:00 Am In Dept 20
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/15/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988
                                                                            Due Date - 4 Years, Calendar Motion: Hearing Hearing Set For Sep-01-1992 At 04:00 Am In Dept 20
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/15/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988
                                                                              Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/15/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988
                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/15/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988
                                                                                  Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?