USA v. Roberts
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-02433-LAB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph J.M. Orabona +1 619 557 7736 +1 619 235 2757 joseph.orabona@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jimmy Lowell Roberts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Robert Garrison +1 619 234 8467 +1 619 687 2666 timothy_garrison@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 7/23/2008
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
308-mj-02012-CAB
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) - Bank Robbery
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Excludable Minute OrderCourt Filing
EXCLUDABLE MINUTE ORDER as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts, Excludable(s) started as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts: XT1 (Continuance - tendered a guilty plea) Commenced on 8/28/08 and ended on 12/1/08, XK (Proposed Plea Agreement) Commenced on 8/28/08 and ended on 12/1/08, XE (Pretrial Motions) Commenced on 8/13/08 and ended on 8/28/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/28/08. (pdc)(av1).
    LREF
    Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
    FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts : Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Objection must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/28/08. (pdc)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Plea Agreement
      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts (pdc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Consent to PleaCourt Filing
        CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo by Jimmy Lowell Roberts. (pdc)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo:Change of Plea Hearing as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts held on 8/28/2008. Plea tendered by Jimmy Lowell Roberts of Guilty on Count 1 of the Indictment. Dft referred to Probation for Presentence Report. Accept Plea with P.O. Report set for 12/1/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 09 before Judge Larry Alan Burns. All pending motions - withdrawn; all other previously pending hearings are vacated. (Tape #CAB08-10:57-11:24).(Plaintiff Attorney Joseph Orabona, AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Tim Garrison, FD). (lmh)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jimmy Lowell Roberts. At the request of defense counsel, a Change of Plea Hearing is set for 8/28/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom E before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (lmh)
              LREF
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
              ORDER Shortening Time: It is hereby ordered that time for Defendant to file his Motions in this case be shortened, with the Motion Hearing to be held on September 2, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/21/08.(pdc)
                LREF
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 8/21/2008 Motion to Shorten Time
                AMENDED MOTION to Shorten Time by Jimmy Lowell Roberts. (Garrison, Timothy) (pdc).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2008 Motion to Shorten Time
                  MOTION to Shorten Time by Jimmy Lowell Roberts. (Garrison, Timothy) SEE [18] FOR AMENDED MOTION (pdc).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Motion to Compel
                    MOTION to compel discovery, MOTION to Preserve Evidence, MOTION to Suppress Statements, MOTION to Suppress Suggestive Out-Of-Court Indentifications, MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions by Jimmy Lowell Roberts. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts, # (2) Declaration of Timothy Garrison in Support of Defendant's Motions)(Garrison, Timothy) (pdc).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Motion for Fingerprint Exemplars
                      MOTION for Fingerprint Exemplars, MOTION for Handwriting Exemplars, MOTION for Reciprocal Discovery, MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions by USA as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities and Statement of Facts, # (2) Proof of Service)(Orabona, Joseph) Atty emailed re timeliness (pdc).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Detention Hearing Proceedings (08MJ2012-CAB) as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts held on 07/17/08, before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/25/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2008. (akr)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Arraignment on Indictment as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts (1) Count 1 held on 7/24/2008. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 9/2/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 09 before Judge Larry Alan Burns. (Tape #CAB08-1:10:00-10:03). (Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Carlos Cantu S/A for AUSA Joseph J.M. Orabona N/A). (Defendant Attorney Timothy R. Garrison FD). (mjm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Indictment
                            INDICTMENT as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts (1) count(s) 1. (jmz) (jcj).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joseph J.M. Orabona appearing for USA. (Certificate of Service included in Notice) (Orabona, Joseph)(mam).[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/17/08. (ecl)[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order on Motion to DetainCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo:granting [5] Motion to Detain as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts (1); Detention Hearing as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts held on 7/17/2008. Court orders defendant detained pending trial w/o prejudice. Order of detention filed. (Tape #CAB08-15:51-15:58.)(Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Cantu).(Defendant Attorney Tim Garrison, FD). (rab)[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy R Garrison appearing for Jimmy Lowell Roberts (Garrison, Timothy)[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jimmy Lowell Roberts (jmz)(mam).[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Motion to Detain
                                        ORAL MOTION to Detain (flight/danger) by USA as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts as per #4 minute entry. (jmz)(mam).[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo:Initial Appearance as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts held on 7/14/2008. Bond set as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts (1) No Bail. Government Oral Motion to Detain (flight/danger). Detention Hearing set for 7/17/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom E before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/24/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom E before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo added. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Attorney Federal Defenders appointed for Jimmy Lowell Roberts. (Tape #11:01-11:04).(Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Cantu, AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Devin Burstein, FD). (jmz) Modified on 7/15/2008 to add gov't motion(jmz) (mam).[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                            Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts t/w documents and docket sheet from other district. (knh)[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                                              ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 7/07/08 in case as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts (1). (jjh)[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Arrest
                                                Arrest of Jimmy Lowell Roberts (jmz)[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                  ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major in case as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts. (knh)[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT as to Jimmy Lowell Roberts (1). (jmp) (mam).[3:08-mj-02012-CAB]
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?