Molyneaux v. Pacific Bell

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 89 910215
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Attorney at Law, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Leung, Hanna"

Represented by Kaus, Stephen Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaus, Stephen Law Offices +1 415 981 7780
No Logo Molyneaux, Edward L. Iii, Plaintiff

Represented by Kaus, Stephen Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaus, Stephen Law Offices +1 415 981 7780
v.
No Logo Pacific Bell (140 New Montgomery), Defendant
No Logo Pacific Bell Directory Corp, Defendant

Represented by Rathfon, Steven D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven D Rathfon +1 415 542 2206
Attributes
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
Timeline
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 10/22/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991
Request For Dismissal, With Prejudice, Entire Action
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 7 Filed: 2/20/1990, Entered: 2/20/1990
Request For Dismissal, Without Prejudice, Pacific Bell
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/1990, Entered: 1/2/1990
$108 Pd By: Pacific Bell Directory
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/1990, Entered: 1/2/1990
Answer Of Pacific Bell Directory
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 4 Filed: 10/25/1989, Entered: 10/25/1989
1st Amended Complaint
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/1989, Entered: 8/29/1989
Civil Cover Sheet Received
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 8/29/1989, Entered: 8/29/1989
Summons Issued
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/1989, Entered: 8/29/1989
Complaint For Cc 3344
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 19 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?