Poehlman Vs Parts Place International
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 89 912478

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Poehlman, Beverly A, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
v.
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space City Attorney Of San Francisco +1 415 554 3924
No Logo Parts Place International, Defendant
No Logo San Francisco Municipal Railway, Defendant
No Logo Wong, Jerry, Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/1990, Entered: 6/4/1990
Request For Dismissal, With Prejudice, Entire Action
    Blank 7 Filed: 12/11/1989, Entered: 12/11/1989
    Cross-complaint Of Ccsf
      Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/1989, Entered: 12/6/1989
      Answer Of City & County Of San Francisco
        Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/1989, Entered: 11/17/1989
        Summons Filed
          Blank 4 Filed: 11/17/1989, Entered: 11/17/1989
          First Amended Complaint--summons Issued
            Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/1989, Entered: 11/2/1989
            Civil Cover Sheet Received
              Blank 2 Filed: 11/2/1989, Entered: 11/2/1989
              Summons Issued
                Blank 1 Filed: 11/2/1989, Entered: 11/2/1989
                Complaint For Personal Injury

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 18 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?