Woodcraft Telesis,inc Vs Turner Construc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 89 913989
Superior Court Judge William Cahill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Woodcraft Telesis,inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell, Mark Trautner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell, Mark Trautner +1 415 617 4515
v.
No Logo Knecht, Haley Lawrence & Smith, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 76 Filed: 10/14/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Blank 75 Filed: 8/25/1994, Entered: 8/25/1994
    Off Calendar Settled (sc12/ptr1)
      Blank 74 Filed: 8/24/1994, Entered: 8/24/1994
      Proceedings Reported By Robert Balian (sc12)
        Blank 73 Filed: 8/24/1994, Entered: 8/24/1994
        Sett Conf Held, Case Settled, Terms Placed On Record (sc12)
          Blank 72 Filed: 8/17/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994
          Ntc Of Unavailability Of Counsel
            Blank 71 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994
            Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer (10)
              Blank 70 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994
              Mo For Judg On Pleadings Denied (10)
                Blank 69 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994
                Declaration Of O. Laird Huntsman
                  Blank 68 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994
                  Declaration Of Mark T. Mitchell
                    Blank 67 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994
                    Pltf's Opposition To Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings
                      Blank 66 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994
                      Substitution Of Attorney For Pltf
                        Blank 65 Filed: 8/3/1994, Entered: 8/3/1994
                        (2) Proof Of Service
                          Blank 64 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/2/1994
                          Ex Parte Application & Order For Permitting Mo To Be Heard Within 30 Days Of Trial, Calendar Motion: Judgment On Pleadings Hearing Set For Aug-12-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                            Blank 63 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/2/1994
                            Declaration Of [barbara A. Jagiello] In Support Of Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings
                              Blank 62 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/2/1994
                              Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings
                                Blank 61 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/2/1994
                                Ntc Of Mo For Judgment On The Pleadings, Calendar Motion: Judgment On Pleadings Hearing Set For Aug-12-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                  Blank 60 Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 7/21/1994
                                  Amended Proof Of Service
                                    Blank 59 Filed: 7/20/1994, Entered: 7/20/1994
                                    Proof Of Service
                                      Blank 58 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                                      Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
                                        Blank 57 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                                        Mo W/d Atty--grnt, Ord Signed In Open Crt (10)
                                          Blank 56 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                                          Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 6/28/1994
                                            Ntc Of Mo To Withdraw As Atty Of Record Hearing Set For Jul-15-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                              Blank 54 Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 6/28/1994
                                              Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion To Withdraw As Attor-ney Of Record
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 6/28/1994
                                                Declaration Of Joseph M. Sweeney
                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 6/21/1994, Entered: 6/21/1994
                                                  Amended Answer Of Turner Construction Co
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 6/14/1994, Entered: 6/14/1994
                                                    Order Granting Motion To File Amended Answer
                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/1/1994
                                                      Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/1/1994
                                                        Mo Amend Answer - Granted (10)
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 5/11/1994, Entered: 5/11/1994
                                                          Ntc Of Mo To File An Amended Answer, Calendar Motion: To Amend Hearing Set For Jun-01-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 5/11/1994, Entered: 5/11/1994
                                                            Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo To File An Amended Answer
                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/8/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994
                                                              Settlement Conference Order
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 4/7/1994, Entered: 4/7/1994
                                                                Mailing, Settlement Conference Notice From 08/24/94 Sc12 08:45 Am For 08/24/94 Sc12 08:45 Am
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/7/1994, Entered: 4/7/1994
                                                                  Settlement Conference Continued, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Aug-24-1994 At 08:45 Am In Dept 12
                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 4/7/1994, Entered: 4/7/1994
                                                                    Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 3/2/1994, Entered: 3/2/1994
                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 2/28/1994, Entered: 2/28/1994
                                                                        Ntc Of Entry Of Order
                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 2/23/1994, Entered: 2/23/1994
                                                                          Order Denying Mo To Dismiss
                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 2/17/1994, Entered: 2/17/1994
                                                                            Settlem Conf,
                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 2/17/1994, Entered: 2/17/1994
                                                                              Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 2/10/1994, Entered: 2/10/1994
                                                                                Mailing (ca025) From 02/17/94 Ofar 09:00 Am For 08/22/94 Sc17 09:00 Am
                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 2/10/1994, Entered: 2/10/1994
                                                                                  Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994
                                                                                    Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994
                                                                                      Mo To Dismiss--denied (10)
                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 2/2/1994, Entered: 2/2/1994
                                                                                        Response To Pltf's Reply To Deft's Response
                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/31/1994, Entered: 1/31/1994
                                                                                          Reply To Deft's Response To Pltf's Oppos To Mo To Dismiss
                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994
                                                                                            Deft's Response To Pltf's Oppos To Mo To Dismiss Action
                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994
                                                                                              Declaration Of Robert Foster
                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994
                                                                                                Proof Of Service
                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994
                                                                                                  Declaration Of Barbara A. Jagiello
                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 1/13/1994, Entered: 1/13/1994
                                                                                                    Declaration Of Personal Service
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 1/13/1994, Entered: 1/13/1994
                                                                                                      Declaration Of Joseph M. Sweeney
                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 1/13/1994, Entered: 1/13/1994
                                                                                                        Declaration Of Laird Huntsman
                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 1/13/1994, Entered: 1/13/1994
                                                                                                          Memo Of Pts & Auths In Oppos To Mo To Dismiss Action
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 1/5/1994, Entered: 1/5/1994
                                                                                                            Added To Calendar Hearing Set For Feb-17-1994 At 09:00 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/29/1993, Entered: 12/29/1993
                                                                                                              Proof Of Service By Mail
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 12/16/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993
                                                                                                                Declaration Of Barbara A. Jagiello
                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/16/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993
                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Mike Iker
                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/16/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993
                                                                                                                    Mo To Dismiss Woodcraft Telesis Inc V. Turner Construction Co
                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 12/16/1993, Entered: 12/16/1993
                                                                                                                      Ntc Of Mo To Dismiss, Calendar Motion: To Dismiss Hearing Set For Feb-04-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 9/22/1993, Entered: 9/22/1993
                                                                                                                        At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: 8/18/1993
                                                                                                                          Substitution Of Attorney [for Pltf]
                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 1/21/1993
                                                                                                                            $182. Pd By: Tishman Speyer Properties
                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 1/21/1993
                                                                                                                              Answer Of Tishman Speyer Properties
                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/1992, Entered: 11/30/1992
                                                                                                                                Notice Of Order
                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/19/1992, Entered: 11/19/1992
                                                                                                                                  Stip & Order Setting Aside Default Microfilmed Reel/batch F:061/30
                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/1992, Entered: 8/7/1992
                                                                                                                                    $182 Pd By:turner Construction Company
                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/7/1992, Entered: 8/7/1992
                                                                                                                                      Answer Of Turner Construction Co
                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/1992, Entered: 7/30/1992
                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/17/1992, Entered: 7/17/1992
                                                                                                                                          Request To Enter Default-entered As To:tishman Speyer Prop-erties Turner Construction Co Default Not Entered
                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/17/1992, Entered: 7/17/1992
                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/1992, Entered: 7/17/1992
                                                                                                                                              Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/2/1990, Entered: 3/2/1990
                                                                                                                                                Request For Dismissal, Without Prejudice, Complaint As To Deft Knecht, Haley, Lawrence & Smith Only
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/12/1990, Entered: 1/12/1990
                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Action Pending
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/26/1989, Entered: 12/26/1989
                                                                                                                                                    Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/18/1989, Entered: 12/18/1989
                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/18/1989, Entered: 12/18/1989
                                                                                                                                                        Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?