Frederick Meiswindel,inc Vs Turner Const
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 91 932598

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Frederick Meiswinkel Inc, Plaintiff

Represented by Robb & Ross, P.c.

v.
No Logo 235 Pine Associates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reuben & Alter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reuben & Alter Llp +1 415 567 9000
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
Cause of Action Construction
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 4/15/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992
Request For Dismissal, With Prejudice, Entire Action
    Blank 19 Filed: 12/4/1991, Entered: 12/4/1991
    Notice Of Early Settlement Conference-early Settlement Program
      Blank 18 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/22/1991
      Notice Of Early Settlement Conference
        Blank 17 Filed: 11/6/1991, Entered: 11/6/1991
        Counter At-issue Memo
          Blank 16 Filed: 10/23/1991, Entered: 10/23/1991
          At-issue Memo/arbitration Conference Statement
            Blank 15 Filed: 10/10/1991, Entered: 10/10/1991
            General Denial Of 235 Pine Associates To X Complt
              Blank 14 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991
              Notice Of Pending Action
                Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991
                General Denial Of Turner Construction Co To X-complaint
                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991
                  $ 152. Pd By: Turner Construction Co
                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991
                    General Denial Of Turner Construction Co
                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991
                      Summons Filed On X-complt
                        Blank 9 Filed: 8/22/1991, Entered: 8/22/1991
                        Cross-complaint Of Turner Construction Company
                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/24/1991, Entered: 7/24/1991
                          Summons Issued On Cross-complaint
                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/24/1991, Entered: 7/24/1991
                            $152 Pd By: 235 Pine Associates
                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/24/1991, Entered: 7/24/1991
                              Answer Of 235 Pine Assiciates
                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/24/1991, Entered: 7/24/1991
                                Proof Of Service
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/1991, Entered: 7/24/1991
                                  Cross-complaint Of 235 Pine Associates
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/24/1991, Entered: 5/24/1991
                                    Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/24/1991, Entered: 5/24/1991
                                      Summons Issued
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/24/1991, Entered: 5/24/1991
                                        Complaint For Damages And Foreclosure Of Mechanic's Lien

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?