USA v. Lindsley
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-02492-JAH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy F Salel +1 619 557 6074 +1 619 235 2757 Timothy.Salel@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Robert Lindsley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bernard G Skomal +1 619 230 6500 +1 619 230 6505 BGSkomal@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 8/1/2008
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - Filing a False Income Tax Return
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Acknowledgment of Next Court Date
Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Robert Lindsley to appear on Dec. 15, 2008. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Skomal, Bernard) (jpp).
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
    Minute Entry Pursuant to an agreement of the parties, with notice to the Court, the Accept Plea with P.O. Report as to Robert Lindsley, set for 10/14/08, is vacated and reset to 12/15/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. Excludable started in the intereset of justice as to Robert Lindsley: XT - 8/25/08 to 12/15/08. Defendant shall file an acknowledgment of next court date within ten (10) days of this order. (Court Reporter n/a). (lwm)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Timothy F Salel appearing for USA. 08cr2492-JAH (Salel, Timothy) (jpp).
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Abstract of OrderCourt Filing
        ABSTRACT OF ORDER releasing Robert Lindsley.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 08/01/08. (jpp)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Bond
          P/S Bond Entered as to Robert Lindsley in amount of $ 5,000, (jpp)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Defendant Robert Lindsley (1),. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 08/01/08. (jpp)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Speedy Trial - Excludable Start/StopCourt Filing
              Excludable(s) started 08/01/08 and ending 10/14/08 for proposed plea agreement and continuance - tendered a guilty plea as to Robert Lindsley:. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 08/01/08. (jpp)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION as to Robert Lindsley :Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Objection must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. Sentencing set for 10/14/08 at 10:30am in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 08/01/08. (jpp)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Plea Agreement
                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to Robert Lindsley (jpp)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Consent to PleaCourt Filing
                    CONSENT TO PLEA before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler by Robert Lindsley. (jpp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler:Arraignment as to Robert Lindsley (1) Count 1 held on 8/1/2008. Retained attorney Bernard G Skomal for Robert Lindsley. Bond set as to Robert Lindsley (1) $5,000 P/S. Change of Plea Hearing as to Robert Lindsley held on 8/1/2008. Plea tendered by Robert Lindsley (1) Count 1. ( Accept Plea with P.O. Report set for 10/14/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston.) (Tape #JMA08-01-16:39-17:03).(Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Tim Salel).(Defendant Attorney Bernard Skomal, CJA). (r1r)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Waiver of Indictment
                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Robert Lindsley (r1r)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Information - Felony
                          INFORMATION as to Robert Lindsley (1) count(s) 1. (r1r)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 92 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?