Jarvis Vs Jordan
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 91 934456
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jarvis, Herby Kay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
v.
No Logo Abercrombia, Dorothy, Defendant
No Logo Jordan, Louise, Defendant
No Logo Jordan, Vern E, Defendant
No Logo Miller, Donald, Defendant
No Logo Miller, Yvette, Defendant
No Logo Parish, Vernetha, Defendant
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 1/27/1992, Entered: 1/27/1992
Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar, Stip For Entry Of Judgment Signed
    Blank 15 Filed: 1/27/1992, Entered: 1/27/1992
    Stip/order For Entry Of Judgt
      Blank 14 Filed: 1/27/1992, Entered: 1/27/1992
      Substitution Of Attorney [louise & Vern Jordan]
        Blank 13 Filed: 12/20/1991, Entered: 12/20/1991
        Short Cause Trial 1-27-92 (ptr1),
          Blank 12 Filed: 11/27/1991, Entered: 11/27/1991
          Joint Status And Setting Conference Statement
            Blank 11 Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: 10/21/1991
            > Miller; Donald Miller
              Blank 10 Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: 10/21/1991
              > Abercrombia Aka Dorothy Abercrombie; Yvette >
                Blank 9 Filed: 10/21/1991, Entered: 10/21/1991
                Request To Enter Default-entered As To: Dorothy >
                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/18/1991, Entered: 9/18/1991
                  $ 267. Pd By: Louise Jordan; Vern E Jordan
                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/18/1991, Entered: 9/18/1991
                    General Denial Of Louise Jordan; Vern E Jordan
                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: 9/9/1991
                      Summons Filed
                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/9/1991, Entered: 9/9/1991
                        Request For Dismissal, Without Prejudice, Entire Action
                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/22/1991, Entered: 7/22/1991
                          Notice Of Pending Action
                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/16/1991, Entered: 7/16/1991
                            Plan 1 Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Dec-20-1991 At 09:00 Am In Dept X-1
                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/16/1991, Entered: 7/16/1991
                              Summons Issued
                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/16/1991, Entered: 7/16/1991
                                Complaint For Partition,accounting,and Appointment Of Receiver

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?