Winsted Construction Co Vs Intelisano Co
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 92 943131
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Winsted Construction Company,inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Day Law Corporation +1 415 638 6100
v.
No Logo Intelisano Construction,inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo Lincoln, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lincoln 455 Market Street"
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994
Req For Dism, W/ Prej Entire Action As To Lincoln 455 Market Street And Doe One Through Doe Twenty-five Only
    Blank 29 Filed: 7/7/1993, Entered: 7/7/1993
    Substitution Of Attorney [for Pltf(s)]
      Blank 28 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 6/28/1993
      Notice Of Change Of Address Of Barbara A. Jagiello, Atty For Defdt, Intelisano Construction Inc.
        Blank 27 Filed: 4/30/1993, Entered: 4/30/1993
        Notice Of Settlement And Conditional Request For Dismissal
          Blank 26 Filed: 4/30/1993, Entered: 4/30/1993
          Judgment Pursuant To Stipulation & Order- Microfilmed R/b F: 076/40
            Blank 25 Filed: 4/26/1993, Entered: 4/26/1993
            Interest Computation
              Blank 24 Filed: 4/26/1993, Entered: 4/26/1993
              Stipulation For Entry Of Judgment
                Blank 23 Filed: 4/16/1993, Entered: 4/16/1993
                Off Calendar Settled Out Of Court (sc15/ptr1)
                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/16/1993, Entered: 4/16/1993
                  Off-calendar-settled (out Of Court/sc15/ptr1),
                    Blank 21 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 11/13/1992
                    Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                      Blank 20 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 11/13/1992
                      Plan I Trial
                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/6/1992, Entered: 11/6/1992
                        Defnt Lincoln 455 Market St's Status & Setting Conference Statement
                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/5/1992, Entered: 11/5/1992
                          Status Conference Order
                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/4/1992, Entered: 11/4/1992
                            Trial Settlement Mailing From 11/13/92 Ptr1 10:00 Am For 03/30/93 Sc15 08:30 Am
                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/2/1992, Entered: 11/2/1992
                              Defn Intelisano Construction's Status & Setting Conference Statement
                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/29/1992, Entered: 10/29/1992
                                Proof Of Service
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/29/1992, Entered: 10/29/1992
                                  Plntff's Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/16/1992, Entered: 9/16/1992
                                    Notice Of Change Of Address & Telephone No
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/10/1992, Entered: 9/10/1992
                                      Proof Of Service
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 9/8/1992, Entered: 9/8/1992
                                        >lincoln 455 Market Street For Equitable Indemnity
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/8/1992, Entered: 9/8/1992
                                          Answer Of Intelisano Construction,inc., To Xc Of>
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/29/1992, Entered: 7/29/1992
                                            $152 Pd By: Intelisano Construction Inc
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/29/1992, Entered: 7/29/1992
                                              Answer Of Intelisano Construction Inc To Complt
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/17/1992, Entered: 7/17/1992
                                                Cross-complaint Of Lincoln 455 Market Street
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/1992, Entered: 7/17/1992
                                                  $152. Pd By: Lincoln 455 Market Street
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/17/1992, Entered: 7/17/1992
                                                    Answer Of Lincoln 455 Market Street, A Calif Limited Part- Nership
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/9/1992, Entered: 7/9/1992
                                                      Notice Of Action Pending
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 5/22/1992
                                                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Nov-13-1992 At 10:00 Am In Dept 478
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 5/22/1992
                                                          Summons Issued
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 5/22/1992
                                                            Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?