Ventures Viii Vs Lucas
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 92 944304
Superior Court Judge Stuart R. Pollak, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Flynn, Russell B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo Ventures Viii, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
v.
No Logo Lucas, Frank J., Defendant
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
Req For Dism, W/ Prej Complt Only As To M.h. Detrick Co
    Blank 13 Filed: 1/22/1993, Entered: 1/22/1993
    Off St/cf: Dismissed (ptr1),
      Blank 12 Filed: 11/25/1992, Entered: 11/25/1992
      Request For Dismissal, With Prejudice, Entire Action
        Blank 11 Filed: 9/4/1992, Entered: 9/4/1992
        Prelim Injunc Off Calendar (8)
          Blank 10 Filed: 8/21/1992, Entered: 8/21/1992
          Hrg On Mo Prelim Injunc Cont 9/4/92 (8)
            Blank 9 Filed: 8/3/1992, Entered: 8/3/1992
            Ex Parte Application To File Overlength Brief And Order Thereon
              Blank 8 Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: 7/31/1992
              Hrg On Prelim Inj Continued To 8/21/92 (8)
                Blank 7 Filed: 7/16/1992, Entered: 7/16/1992
                Summons Filed
                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/14/1992, Entered: 7/14/1992
                  Ntc / Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Calendar Motion: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Set For Jul-31-1992 At 09:00 Am In Dept 8
                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/14/1992, Entered: 7/14/1992
                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction
                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/14/1992, Entered: 7/14/1992
                      Declaration Of Roy L. Curry, M.d.
                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/1992, Entered: 7/10/1992
                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jan-22-1993 At 10:00 Am In Dept 478
                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/10/1992, Entered: 7/10/1992
                          Summons Issued
                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/1992, Entered: 7/10/1992
                            Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 21 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?