Carey Vs Travel Directions,inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 92 945135
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arrington, Douglas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahern Mooney & Rodriguez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ahern,mooney & Rodriguez +1 510 733 2288
No Logo Blazic, Frank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahern Mooney & Rodriguez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ahern,mooney & Rodriguez +1 510 733 2288
No Logo Carey, Gerolyn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahern Mooney & Rodriguez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ahern,mooney & Rodriguez +1 510 733 2288
v.
No Logo Travel Directions,inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 61 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995
Dropped From Calendar
    Blank 60 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995
    Off Trial Calendar, Summary Judgment (sc10/ptr1)
      Blank 59 Filed: 5/25/1995, Entered: 5/25/1995
      Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
        Blank 58 Filed: 5/25/1995, Entered: 5/25/1995
        Mo Sum Jgt -- Granted. Order Signed. (10)
          Blank 57 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995
          Pts & Auths In Oppos To Mo For Summ Judgment
            Blank 56 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995
            Pltfs' Separate Statement Of Disputed Facts
              Blank 55 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995
              Declaration Of Atty Re Exhibits In Oppos To Mo For Summary Judgment
                Blank 54 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Supp Of Mo For Summ Judg- Ment
                  Blank 53 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                  Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion For Summ Judgment
                    Blank 52 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                    Declaration Of Michael J. Boland
                      Blank 51 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                      $100 Pd By: Travel Directions Inc/mo For Summ Judgment
                        Blank 50 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                        Ntc Of Mo For Summ Judgment, Calendar Motion: Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Adjudication Of Issues Hearing Set For May-25-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                          Blank 49 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995
                          Order & Stip To Continue Settlement Conference & Trial
                            Blank 48 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995
                            Proceedings Reported By Easteller Bruihl, Csr
                              Blank 47 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995
                              #cd1-tr.cal.: Trial Cont To 8-21-95
                                Blank 46 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995
                                Scd1-tr.cal.: Cont. On Trial Calendar. Dropped From 4-3-95 Calendar
                                  Blank 45 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995
                                  Tr. Cal. 4-3-95
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995
                                    Settlement Conference Continued
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995
                                      Added To Court Calendar
                                        Blank 42 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995
                                        Transferred From Jury To Court Calendar-failure To Timely Deposit Jury Fees
                                          Blank 41 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995
                                          $78 Jury Fee Deposit By - Galvin # 22321
                                            Blank 40 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995
                                            Proceedings Reported By Jennifer Rodriguez
                                              Blank 39 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995
                                              Motion Summ Judg/summ Adj - Ordered Off Calendar (10)
                                                Blank 38 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995
                                                Proof Of Service
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995
                                                  $100 Pd By: Travel Directions Inc/mo For Summary Judgment
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995
                                                    Ntc Of Mo For Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Adjudication Of Issues Hearing Set For Mar-02-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: 10/6/1994
                                                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 10/5/1994, Entered: 10/5/1994
                                                        Mailing (ca025) From 04/03/95 Scd1 09:00 Am For 03/21/95 Scd2 08:30 Am
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/5/1994, Entered: 10/5/1994
                                                          Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Mar-21-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 2
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 10/5/1994, Entered: 10/5/1994
                                                            Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial, Pltf Demands (ptr1)
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 9/30/1994, Entered: 9/30/1994
                                                              Request For Trial De Novo For Pltfs
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994
                                                                Arbitration Award
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/9/1994
                                                                  Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 05/09/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am For 05/09/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/5/1994, Entered: 5/5/1994
                                                                    Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For May-09-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 478
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 5/2/1994, Entered: 5/2/1994
                                                                      Declaration Of William H Ahern
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/29/1994, Entered: 4/29/1994
                                                                        Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 05/05/94 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 05/09/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 4/29/1994, Entered: 4/29/1994
                                                                          Status Conference Order
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/19/1994, Entered: 4/19/1994
                                                                            Supplemental Declaration Of Defense Counsel Re: Osc
                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994
                                                                              Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For May-05-1994 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 478
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994
                                                                                Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For Mar-25-1994 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 478
                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/21/1994, Entered: 3/21/1994
                                                                                  Mailing (ca068) From 03/25/94 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 05/05/94 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/21/1994, Entered: 3/21/1994
                                                                                    Order To Show Cause
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/2/1994, Entered: 3/2/1994
                                                                                      Declaration Of Defense Counsel Re: Osc
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: 1/26/1994
                                                                                        Order To Show Cause
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: 1/26/1994
                                                                                          Mailing (ca068) From 03/25/94 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 03/25/94 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/4/1994, Entered: 1/4/1994
                                                                                            Stipulation And Order Allowing Arbitration More Than 90 Days After Appointemnt Of Arbitrator
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/28/1993, Entered: 12/28/1993
                                                                                              Declaration Of William H Ahern
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993
                                                                                                Stip & Order Allowing Arbitration More Than 90 Days
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993
                                                                                                  Declaration Of William H. Ahern
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/19/1993
                                                                                                    Stipulation To Continue Arbitration Hearing
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/18/1993, Entered: 3/18/1993
                                                                                                      Summons Filed
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 3/5/1993
                                                                                                        Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Apr-12-1993 At 08:00 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: 3/3/1993
                                                                                                          Substitution Of Attorney (for Travel Directions Inc)
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/1993, Entered: 2/23/1993
                                                                                                            Status Conference Order
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/23/1993, Entered: 2/23/1993
                                                                                                              Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 03/05/93 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 04/12/93 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/27/1992, Entered: 10/27/1992
                                                                                                                Verification Of Ans Of Travel Directions, Inc.
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/26/1992, Entered: 10/26/1992
                                                                                                                  $182 Pd By: Travel Directions, Inc.
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/26/1992, Entered: 10/26/1992
                                                                                                                    Answer Of Travel Directions, Inc.
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 8/11/1992
                                                                                                                      Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Mar-05-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 8/11/1992
                                                                                                                        Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 8/11/1992
                                                                                                                          Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?