Rizzo Vs Cortez
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 92 945761
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rizzo, Salomon Sairam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weltin Law Office, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Weltin Law Pc +1 510 251 6060
v.
No Logo Cortez, William Flamenco, Defendant
No Logo San Francisco Conservation Corps, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: 9/27/1993
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Blank 25 Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 9/16/1993
    $172 Overpayment Refund To Weltin # 28785
      Blank 24 Filed: 8/20/1993, Entered: 8/20/1993
      Off Calendar Settled (sc20/ptr1)
        Blank 23 Filed: 8/16/1993, Entered: 8/16/1993
        Sett Conf - Case Was Settled. (20)
          Blank 22 Filed: 8/11/1993, Entered: 8/11/1993
          $78 Jury Fee Deposit By Deft Galvin # 16464
            Blank 21 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: 8/2/1993
            $172 Overpayment Pd. By Weltin #16388
              Blank 20 Filed: 8/2/1993, Entered: 8/2/1993
              $78.00 Jury Fee Dep By Pltf Weltin #16388
                Blank 19 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/12/1993
                Settlement Conference Order
                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/8/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993
                  Mailing, Settlement Conference Notice From 08/16/93 Sc20 04:00 Pm For 08/16/93 Sc20 04:00 Pm
                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/8/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993
                    Settlement Conference Continued, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Aug-16-1993 At 04:00 Pm In Dept 20
                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/8/1993, Entered: 7/8/1993
                      Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: 5/7/1993
                        Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                          Blank 14 Filed: 5/7/1993, Entered: 5/7/1993
                          Plan I Trial , Plaintiff Demands;
                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/27/1993, Entered: 4/27/1993
                            Status Conference Order
                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/27/1993, Entered: 4/27/1993
                              Mailing, Trial Settlement From 05/07/93 Ptr1 10:30 Am For 08/09/93 Scd7 09:00 Am
                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/1993, Entered: 4/2/1993
                                Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For May-07-1993 At 10:30 Am In Dept 478
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/1/1993
                                  Plaintiff's Status Conference Statement
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/1/1993
                                    $182. Pd By: S.f. Conservation Corps
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/1/1993
                                      Answer Of S.f. Conservation Corps
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/23/1993, Entered: 3/23/1993
                                        Order To Show Cause
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/23/1993, Entered: 3/23/1993
                                          Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 04/02/93 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 05/07/93 Ptr1 10:30 Am
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: 3/19/1993
                                            Proof Of Service
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/9/1992, Entered: 9/9/1992
                                                Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Apr-02-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/9/1992, Entered: 9/9/1992
                                                  Summons Issued
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/9/1992, Entered: 9/9/1992
                                                    Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?