Thompson Vs Hospital Bldg. Equipment Co.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 92 945866
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thompson, Richard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler, Herbert R

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert R Kessler +1 415 952 1550
v.
No Logo Hbe Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Langley, Lamberto, Barnum & Kreger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Langley, Lamberto, Kreger & Moher +1 415 428 1100
No Logo Hospital Building & Equipment Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hospital Building Equipment Co."
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Krimen, Richard A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A Krimen +1 415 565 1238
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 7/28/1993, Entered: 7/28/1993
Off-calendar-settled (kessler/ptr1),
    Blank 14 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/19/1993
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 13 Filed: 4/9/1993, Entered: 4/9/1993
      Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference: Hearing Set For May-10-1993 At 02:30 Am In Dept 8
        Blank 12 Filed: 4/9/1993, Entered: 4/9/1993
        Plan I Arbitration: Deft Demands,
          Blank 11 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: 3/31/1993
          Status Conference Order
            Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: 3/31/1993
            Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 04/09/93 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 05/10/93 Scd8 09:00 Am
              Blank 9 Filed: 3/12/1993, Entered: 3/12/1993
              Defnt Hbe Corp's Status & Setting Conference Statement
                Blank 8 Filed: 3/10/1993, Entered: 3/10/1993
                Status And Setting Conference Statement
                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/1993, Entered: 2/1/1993
                  Notice Of Lien - State Compensation Ins Fund
                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/1993, Entered: 1/29/1993
                    Summons Filed
                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 11/13/1992
                      $182 Pd By: Hbe Corporation
                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 11/13/1992
                        Answer Of Hbe Corporation
                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/14/1992, Entered: 9/14/1992
                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Apr-09-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/14/1992, Entered: 9/14/1992
                            Summons Issued
                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/1992, Entered: 9/14/1992
                              Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?