Aqua Duct Plumbing Vs Aberthaw Constr.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 92 947732
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aqua Duct Plumbing, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackl, Katzen, Hulchiy & Murray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jackl, Katzen, Hulchiy & Murray +1 510 932 8500
v.
No Logo Aberthaw Construction Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Van Hoesen, David

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Van Hoesen, David +1 415 398 2200
No Logo Aberthaw West, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Garvin Fire Protection, Defendant
No Logo Garvin Fire Protection Systems Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gassett, Perry & Frank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gassett, Perry & Frank +1 510 645 1487
No Logo United Parcel System, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher +1 408 998 2000
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: 6/25/1993
Ptr1, St/cf 6-25-93 @ 8:30 Am, Off Calendar: Settled (slone),
    Blank 21 Filed: 6/21/1993, Entered: 6/21/1993
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 20 Filed: 5/11/1993, Entered: 5/11/1993
      Status And Setting Conference Statement
        Blank 19 Filed: 4/26/1993, Entered: 4/26/1993
        Status & Setting Conference Statement
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/14/1993, Entered: 4/14/1993
          $182 Pd By: Aberthaw West
            Blank 17 Filed: 4/14/1993, Entered: 4/14/1993
            Answer Of Aberthaw West To X-complt Of Garvin Fire Protection System
              Blank 16 Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: 3/30/1993
              Association Of Attorney Galvin, Brown & Boland For Defdt, Aberthaw West
                Blank 15 Filed: 3/30/1993, Entered: 3/30/1993
                Substitution Of Attorney Galvin, Brown & Boland For Defdt, Aberthaw West
                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/16/1993, Entered: 3/16/1993
                  $182 Pd By: United Parcel Service
                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/16/1993, Entered: 3/16/1993
                    Answer Of United Parcel Service To First Amended Complt
                      Blank 12 Filed: 2/26/1993, Entered: 2/26/1993
                      Cross-complaint Of Garvin Fire Protection System Inc
                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/1993, Entered: 2/26/1993
                        Summons Issued On Cross-complaint
                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/16/1993, Entered: 2/16/1993
                          $182. Pd By: Garvin Fire Protection Systems, Inc.
                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/16/1993, Entered: 2/16/1993
                            Ans Of Defdt Garvin Fire Protection Systems, Inc.
                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/1993, Entered: 2/3/1993
                              $182 Pd By: Aberthaw West
                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/3/1993, Entered: 2/3/1993
                                General Denial Of Aberthaw West
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/1993, Entered: 1/19/1993
                                  Summons Filed
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/14/1992, Entered: 12/14/1992
                                    Summons On 1st Amended Complt Issued
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/14/1992, Entered: 12/14/1992
                                      1st Amended Complaint For Breach Of Contract
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 12/3/1992
                                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jun-25-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 12/3/1992
                                          Summons Issued
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 12/3/1992
                                            Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?