Jackson Vs Thomas I Pendergast Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 92 948101
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jackson, Eric C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blackman Legal Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blackman Legal Group +1 650 692 8124
v.
No Logo Bill Graham Presents, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Perrin, Jeffrey John, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Thomas I Pendergast Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andersen & Shinnick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andersen & Shinnick +1 415 397 6700
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 7/9/1993
Ptr1, St/cf 7-9-93 @ 8:30 Am, Off Calendar: Dismissed,
    Blank 11 Filed: 5/12/1993, Entered: 5/12/1993
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 10 Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 2/25/1993
      Cross-complaint Of Bill Graham Presents Inc & Jeffrey John Perrin For Damages-apportionment Of Fault; Indemnification; Declaratory Relief & Contractual Indemnity
        Blank 9 Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 2/25/1993
        $364 Pd By: Bill Graham Presents Inc & Jeffrey John Perrin
          Blank 8 Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 2/25/1993
          Answer Of Bill Graham Presents Inc And Jeffrey John Perrin To Complt
            Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/1993, Entered: 2/10/1993
            $182 Pd By: Thomas I. Pendergast Inc
              Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/1993, Entered: 2/10/1993
              Answer Of Thomas I. Pendergast Inc.
                Blank 5 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 1/21/1993
                Proof Of Service (summons / Complaint)
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/1993, Entered: 1/13/1993
                  Proof Of Service
                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/17/1992, Entered: 12/17/1992
                    Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jul-09-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/17/1992, Entered: 12/17/1992
                      Summons Issued
                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/17/1992, Entered: 12/17/1992
                        Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?