Harris v. Molyneaux

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 93 949673
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Harris, Jeanne, Plaintiff

Represented by Bostwick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bostwick & Associates +1 415 421 8300
No Logo Harris, Obadiah, Plaintiff

Represented by Bostwick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bostwick & Associates +1 415 421 8300
v.
No Logo Leung & Molyneaux, Defendant

Represented by Molyneaux, Edward (fremont) L. Iii

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molyneaux, Edward +1 510 792 3534
No Logo Attorney at Law, Defendant
Officially listed as "Leung, Hanna"

Represented by Molyneaux, Edward (fremont) L. Iii

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molyneaux, Edward +1 510 792 3534
No Logo Molyneaux, Edward L. Iii, Defendant
Attributes
Cause of Action Professional Negligence
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 6/24/1994, Entered: 6/24/1994
Release And Settlement Agreement
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 25 Filed: 5/26/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994
Off Calendar Settled (bostwick & Tehin/ptr1)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 24 Filed: 5/26/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994
Added To Court Calendar
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 23 Filed: 5/26/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994
Transferred From Jury To Court Calendar-failure To Timely Deposit Jury Fees
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 22 Filed: 5/17/1994, Entered: 5/17/1994
Settlement Conference Held. Cause Did Not Settle. (14)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 21 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 20 Filed: 12/14/1993, Entered: 12/14/1993
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 19 Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: 12/13/1993
Mailing (ca025) From 12/10/93 Ptr1 02:00 Pm For 05/17/94 Sc14 04:00 Pm
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 18 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
Proceedings Reported By Karan Held Csr
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 17 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For May-17-1994 At 04:00 Pm In Dept 14
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 16 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial, Pltf Demands (ptr1)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 15 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
> & Leung & Molyneaux
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 14 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
$546 Pd By Edward L Molyneaux 111, Hanna Leung >
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 13 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
> & Leung & Molyneaux
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 12 Filed: 12/10/1993, Entered: 12/10/1993
Answer Of Edward L Molyneaux 111, Hanna Leung >
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 11 Filed: 10/22/1993, Entered: 10/22/1993
Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Dec-10-1993 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 478
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 10 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/14/1993
Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 9 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/14/1993
Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 10/22/93 Ptr1 10:30 Am For 12/10/93 Ptr1 02:00 Pm
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 8 Filed: 9/17/1993, Entered: 9/17/1993
Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Oct-22-1993 At 10:30 Am In Dept 478
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 7 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993
Order To Show Cause
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993
Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 09/17/93 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 10/22/93 Ptr1 10:30 Am
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 5 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/1/1993
Status And Setting Conference Statement
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 4 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/1/1993
(3) Proof Of Service
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/1993, Entered: 2/23/1993
Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Sep-17-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 2/23/1993, Entered: 2/23/1993
Summons Issued
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 1 Filed: 2/23/1993, Entered: 2/23/1993
Complaint For Damages (prof Negligence)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 25 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?