Siatos v. City Of Petaluma
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 93 949996
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Siatos, Anastatious, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
No Logo Siatos, Arlene, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo City Of Petaluma, Defendant
No Logo County of Sonoma, Defendant
No Logo Northwestern Pacific Railroad Co, Defendant
No Logo Southern Pacific Transportation Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Southern Pacific Transportation Co"
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 11/24/1993, Entered: 11/24/1993
Ptr1, St/cf 11-24-93 @ 10:30 Am, Off Calendar: Dismissed,
    Blank 15 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/4/1993
    Response To Osc
      Blank 14 Filed: 10/1/1993, Entered: 10/1/1993
      Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Nov-24-1993 At 10:30 Am In Dept 478
        Blank 13 Filed: 9/22/1993, Entered: 9/22/1993
        Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
          Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993
          Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 10/01/93 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 11/24/93 Ptr1 10:30 Am
            Blank 11 Filed: 9/21/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993
            Order To Show Cause
              Blank 10 Filed: 7/2/1993, Entered: 7/2/1993
              Status And Setting Conference Statement
                Blank 9 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                Order Granting Ex Parte Mtn For Change Of Venue
                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                  Notice Of Entry Of Order
                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                    Notice Of Transfer
                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                      Statement Of Facts; Pts & Authorities
                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                        Pltf's Ex Parte Mtn For Change Of Venue Prior To Service
                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                          Trial Court Delay Reduction Case Notice
                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                            Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Oct-01-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                              Summons Issued
                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993
                                Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?