Burdette Vs Jackie Robinson Apts Ltd
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 93 952762
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Burdette, Robert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weber & Nierenberg (s.f.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Weber & Nierenberg +1 415 788 3900
v.
No Logo Associated Financial Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Brentwood Housing Fund Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Jackie Robinson Apartments, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Brown +1 415 947 1702
No Logo John Stewart Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Brown +1 415 947 1702
No Logo Moses, Stephen D, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Partnership Investors Services Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo San Francisco Housing Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Westport Housing Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 58 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994
Off Calendar Settled (weber & Nierenberg/ptr1)
    Blank 57 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994
    Off-calendar-settled (weber & Nierenberg),
      Blank 56 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/14/1994
      Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
        Blank 55 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994
        Mailing (ca025) From 03/13/95 Scd1 09:00 Am For 02/23/95 Scd6 04:00 Pm
          Blank 54 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994
          Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
            Blank 53 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994
            Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial, Deft Demands (ptr1)
              Blank 52 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994
              Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                Blank 51 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994
                Request For Trial De Novo For Defts
                  Blank 50 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994
                  Memo Of Costs (summary)
                    Blank 49 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                    Arbitration Award
                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/2/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994
                      Defdts' Opposition To Motion To Compel Declaration Of Gordon W. Odell, Jr.
                        Blank 47 Filed: 5/11/1994, Entered: 5/11/1994
                        Ntc Of Mo Compelling Responses, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Jun-09-1994 At 09:00 Am In Dept 469
                          Blank 46 Filed: 4/11/1994, Entered: 4/11/1994
                          Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 04/11/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am For 04/11/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                            Blank 45 Filed: 4/8/1994, Entered: 4/8/1994
                            Plan I Arbitration: Deft Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Apr-11-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 478
                              Blank 44 Filed: 4/6/1994, Entered: 4/6/1994
                              Ntc Of Change Of Address Of Atty For Plaintiff
                                Blank 43 Filed: 4/4/1994, Entered: 4/4/1994
                                Status Conference Order
                                  Blank 42 Filed: 4/1/1994, Entered: 4/1/1994
                                  Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 04/08/94 Ptr1 10:30 Am For 04/11/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                    Blank 41 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: 3/4/1994
                                    Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Apr-08-1994 At 10:30 Am In Dept 478
                                      Blank 40 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/18/1994
                                      > Corp. (sued As Doe 1)
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/18/1994
                                        $364. Pd By: Stephen D. Moses & Westport Housing >
                                          Blank 38 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/18/1994
                                          > Corp. (sued As Doe 1)
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/18/1994
                                            Answer Of Stephen D. Moses & Westport Housing >
                                              Blank 36 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/18/1994
                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                Blank 35 Filed: 2/17/1994, Entered: 2/17/1994
                                                Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 03/04/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 04/08/94 Ptr1 10:30 Am
                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 2/17/1994, Entered: 2/17/1994
                                                  Order To Show Cause
                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/8/1994, Entered: 2/8/1994
                                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 1/28/1994, Entered: 1/28/1994
                                                      Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Mar-04-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994
                                                        Proof Of Service
                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994
                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994
                                                            $182 Pd By: Partnership Investors Services Inc
                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994
                                                              Answer Of Partnership Investors Services Inc
                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994
                                                                $182 Pd By: San Francisco Housing Corp
                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994
                                                                  Answer Of San Francisco Housing Corp
                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994
                                                                    $182 Pd By: Brentwood Housing Fund Ltd
                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/14/1994, Entered: 1/14/1994
                                                                      Answer Of Brentwood Housing Fund Ltd
                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/12/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994
                                                                        Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 01/28/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 03/04/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/12/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994
                                                                          Status Conference Order
                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/9/1993, Entered: 12/9/1993
                                                                            Request For Exception & Order Granting Extension To Serve Complt To 01-28-94
                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 12/3/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993
                                                                              Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Jan-28-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 11/30/1993, Entered: 11/30/1993
                                                                                (2) Proof Of Service
                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/24/1993, Entered: 11/24/1993
                                                                                  Status Conference Order
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/23/1993, Entered: 11/23/1993
                                                                                    Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 12/03/93 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 01/28/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/12/1993, Entered: 11/12/1993
                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Original Summons
                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/10/1993, Entered: 11/10/1993
                                                                                        $364 Pd By: John Stewart Co & Jackie Robinson Apartment Ltd
                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/10/1993, Entered: 11/10/1993
                                                                                          Answer Of John Stewart Co & Jackie Robinson Apartment Ltd
                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/4/1993
                                                                                            Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                              Substitution Of Atty For Deft(s)
                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/28/1993, Entered: 10/28/1993
                                                                                                (2) Proof Of Service
                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/22/1993, Entered: 10/22/1993
                                                                                                  Order Extending Time To Serve Complt To 12/22/93
                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/1993, Entered: 10/19/1993
                                                                                                    Association Of Atty, For Deft-galvin Brown & Boland
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/19/1993, Entered: 10/19/1993
                                                                                                      Amendment To Complt
                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/13/1993, Entered: 8/13/1993
                                                                                                        Request & Order Extending Time To Serve Complt
                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/30/1993, Entered: 7/30/1993
                                                                                                          $182 Pd By: Associated Financial Corp Dba Nat'l Afc Corp
                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/30/1993, Entered: 7/30/1993
                                                                                                            Answer Of Associated Financial Corp Dba National Afc Corp To Complt
                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/27/1993, Entered: 7/27/1993
                                                                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/1993, Entered: 6/22/1993
                                                                                                                Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Dec-03-1993 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/22/1993, Entered: 6/22/1993
                                                                                                                  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/22/1993, Entered: 6/22/1993
                                                                                                                    Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?