Hospital Bldg & Equip Vs Jwp Mechanical
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 93 954763
Superior Court Judge William Cahill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Hospital Building & Equipment Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stubbs & Leone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stubbs And Leone +1 925 974 8600
v.
No Logo Dunham-bush, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bronson, Bronson & McKinnon LLP

No Logo E.h. Morrill Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McInerney & Dillon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcinerney & Dillon P.c. +1 510 465 7100
No Logo Jwp Mechanical Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McInerney & Dillon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcinerney & Dillon P.c. +1 510 465 7100
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996
Closing Brief On Behalf Of Pltfs & X-defts
    Blank 54 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 53 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 1/26/1995
      Proceedings Reported By Laurie Warner (kay) D19
        Blank 52 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 1/26/1995
        Setl Conf Held. Case Settled On Record (19)
          Blank 51 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995
          Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar, No Appearance
            Blank 50 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995
            Added To Court Calendar
              Blank 49 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995
              Transferred From Jury To Court Calendar-failure To Timely Deposit Jury Fees
                Blank 48 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                Trial Cont. To 1-23-95 (scd1/ptr1)
                  Blank 47 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                  Trial Cont. From 8-29-94 To 1-23-95; Dropped From Calendar (scd1/ptr1)
                    Blank 46 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                    Settlement Conference Continued, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Jan-11-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 19
                      Blank 45 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                      Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                        Blank 44 Filed: 7/13/1994, Entered: 7/13/1994
                        Order & Joint Appl For Continuation Of Trial Date; Waiver Of Ntc & Hrg
                          Blank 43 Filed: 5/17/1994, Entered: 5/17/1994
                          Certificate Of Service By Mail
                            Blank 42 Filed: 5/17/1994, Entered: 5/17/1994
                            Certificate Of Service By Mail
                              Blank 41 Filed: 5/13/1994, Entered: 5/13/1994
                              X-complt Of Dunham-bush Inc
                                Blank 40 Filed: 5/13/1994, Entered: 5/13/1994
                                $182. Pd By: Dunham-bush Inc
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 5/13/1994, Entered: 5/13/1994
                                  Answer Of Dunham-bush To E H Morrill Co's X-complaint
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/10/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994
                                    Settlement Conference Order
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/9/1994
                                      Mailing, Settlement Conference Notice From 08/19/94 Scd3 02:00 Pm For 08/19/94 Scd3 02:00 Pm
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/9/1994
                                        Settlement Conference Continued
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/9/1994
                                          Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 4/5/1994, Entered: 4/5/1994
                                            Proof Of Service
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994
                                              Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/1994, Entered: 3/25/1994
                                                Plan I Trial , Plaintiff Demands;
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994
                                                  Summons Issued
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994
                                                    X-complt Of E.h. Morrill
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994
                                                      Stip & Order To File X-complt
                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: 3/18/1994
                                                        Osc Status Conference Order
                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: 3/18/1994
                                                          Mailing (ca033) From 03/25/94 Ptr1 10:30 Am For 08/11/94 Scd3 08:45 Am
                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 3/7/1994, Entered: 3/7/1994
                                                            Response To Osc
                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 3/7/1994, Entered: 3/7/1994
                                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 2/18/1994, Entered: 2/18/1994
                                                                Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Mar-25-1994 At 10:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                  Order To Show Cause
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                    Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 02/18/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 03/25/94 Ptr1 10:30 Am
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/18/1994, Entered: 1/18/1994
                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/12/1994, Entered: 1/12/1994
                                                                        Answer Of Jwp Mechanical Services
                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/29/1993, Entered: 12/29/1993
                                                                          Order On Consolidation 954763 W/muni Court No. 090-203
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: 11/16/1993
                                                                            Proceedings Reported By Laurie Warner
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: 11/16/1993
                                                                              Mot Consol W/ Muni 090203/mot Stri - Grant Mot Consolidate,deny Mot Strike (10)
                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/12/1993, Entered: 11/12/1993
                                                                                Reply Memorandum To Opposition To Motion To Strike Complt
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/12/1993, Entered: 11/12/1993
                                                                                  Reply To Opposition To Motion To Consolidate
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/9/1993, Entered: 11/9/1993
                                                                                    Oppos To Mo To Consolidate
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: 11/5/1993
                                                                                      Opposition To Motion To Strike Complaint
                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: 11/5/1993
                                                                                        Declaration Of Dale Watson
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: 10/29/1993
                                                                                          Ntc Of Mo To Consolidate Hearing Set For Nov-16-1993 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/25/1993
                                                                                            Amended Ntc Of Mo To Strike Complt, Calendar Motion: Strike Complaint Hearing Set For Nov-16-1993 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/25/1993
                                                                                              Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion To Strike Complaint
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/25/1993, Entered: 10/25/1993
                                                                                                Proof Of Service
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: 10/21/1993
                                                                                                  $182 Pd By: Jwp Mechanical Services
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: 10/21/1993
                                                                                                    Ntc Of Mo To Strike Complt, Calendar Motion: Strike Complaint Hearing Set For Nov-11-1993 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: 10/21/1993
                                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/21/1993, Entered: 10/21/1993
                                                                                                        Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Mo To Strike Complt
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993
                                                                                                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Feb-18-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993
                                                                                                            Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993
                                                                                                              Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?