Kassabian Vs Lambert
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 93 954975
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kassabian, Elizabeth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jelinek & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jelinek & Associates +1 510 841 4787
No Logo Kassabian, Mihran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jelinek & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jelinek & Associates +1 510 841 4787
No Logo Chen, Eileen, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Bogard Construction Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Dart, Lonnie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian J Har, Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Har, Law Offices +1 415 777 3114
No Logo Lakeshore Shopping Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinder & Wuerfel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kinder & Wuerfel +1 415 398 1551
No Logo Lambert, Robert Thompson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian J Har, Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Har, Law Offices +1 415 777 3114
No Logo Menlo Management Co Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinder & Wuerfel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kinder & Wuerfel +1 415 398 1551
No Logo Pacific Real Estate Investment Trust Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinder & Wuerfel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kinder & Wuerfel +1 415 398 1551
No Logo Sgpa Architecture & Planning, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Higginbotham, J Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Michael Higginbotham +1 415 546 1292
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 88 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Blank 87 Filed: 12/23/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994
    > And Roes On Through 20
      Blank 86 Filed: 12/23/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994
      >estate Investment Trust Inc;menlo Management Co >
        Blank 85 Filed: 12/23/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994
        >thompson Lambert & Lonnie Dart Vs. Pacific Real>
          Blank 84 Filed: 12/23/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994
          Req For Dism, W/ Prej X-complt Only Of Robert >
            Blank 83 Filed: 11/15/1994, Entered: 11/15/1994
            Declaration Re Osc
              Blank 82 Filed: 10/7/1994, Entered: 10/7/1994
              Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: Nov. 16, 1994 - 1:30 Pm
                Blank 81 Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: 10/6/1994
                Mailing (ca068) From 11/16/94 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 11/16/94 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                  Blank 80 Filed: 10/6/1994, Entered: 10/6/1994
                  Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For Nov-16-1994 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 478
                    Blank 79 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994
                    Ex Parte Stip For Continuance Of Arb
                      Blank 78 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994
                      Ex Parte Order For Continuance Of Arb Beyond 120 Days
                        Blank 77 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994
                        Proof Of Service
                          Blank 76 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/2/1994
                          Order For Continuance Of Arbitration
                            Blank 75 Filed: 7/28/1994, Entered: 7/28/1994
                            > X-complt Of Bogard Construction, Inc.
                              Blank 74 Filed: 7/28/1994, Entered: 7/28/1994
                              Answer Of X-defdt, Robert Thompson Lambert To >
                                Blank 73 Filed: 7/28/1994, Entered: 7/28/1994
                                Ex Parte Stipulation For Continuance Of Arbitration
                                  Blank 72 Filed: 6/22/1994, Entered: 6/22/1994
                                  Summons Filed
                                    Blank 71 Filed: 5/16/1994, Entered: 5/16/1994
                                    Req For Dism, W/ Prej Complt Only As To Eileen Chen Only
                                      Blank 70 Filed: 4/22/1994, Entered: 4/22/1994
                                      Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 04/18/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am For 04/18/94 Scd8 09:00 Am
                                        Blank 69 Filed: 4/18/1994, Entered: 4/18/1994
                                        Ptr1-pre.arb S/c: Cont. To 6-30-94 @ 3:30 Pm
                                          Blank 68 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 3/30/1994
                                          Ex Parte Order Granting Continuance Of Settlement Conference-arbitration
                                            Blank 67 Filed: 3/30/1994, Entered: 3/30/1994
                                            Ex Parte Appl For Continuance Of Settlement Conference
                                              Blank 66 Filed: 3/29/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994
                                              $182. Pd By: Sgpa Architecture & Planning
                                                Blank 65 Filed: 3/29/1994, Entered: 3/29/1994
                                                Answer Of Sgpa Architecture & Planning
                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994
                                                  $182. Pd By: Bogard Construction Inc
                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994
                                                    Answer Of Bogard Construction Inc
                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994
                                                      Attorney's Certificate Of Merit
                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994
                                                        Proof Of Service
                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: 3/9/1994
                                                          Answer Of Robert Thompson Lambert; Lonnie Dart To X-complaint Of Pacific Real Estate Investment; Menlo Mangmt
                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 3/8/1994, Entered: 3/8/1994
                                                            Proof Of Service
                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 2/25/1994
                                                              Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference: Hearing Set For Apr-18-1994 At 03:30 Am In Dept 8
                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 2/25/1994
                                                                Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Apr-18-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 478
                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 2/14/1994
                                                                  Substitution Of Atty For Defts
                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 2/8/1994, Entered: 2/8/1994
                                                                    Status Conference Order
                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 2/8/1994, Entered: 2/8/1994
                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 2/7/1994, Entered: 2/7/1994
                                                                        Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 02/25/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 04/18/94 Scd8 09:00 Am
                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994
                                                                          Amendment To Substitute True Name(s) For Fictitious Name(s)(2)
                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994
                                                                            Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/4/1994
                                                                              Notice Of Change Of Defdts, Robert Thompson Lambert & Lonnie Dart's Attys Name
                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 2/2/1994, Entered: 2/2/1994
                                                                                Order Denying Petition For Coordination
                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                  Complaint For Damages (contra Costa Case # C93-01436)
                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                    Ntc Of 1st Status Conference
                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                        Answer Of Eileen Chen
                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                          Status Conference Questionnaire
                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                            Status Conference Questionnaire
                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                              Ntc Of Assigned Arbitrator
                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                                Ntc Of Submission Of Petition For Coordination
                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                                  Request For Arbitration Hrg Date Status
                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                                    Award Of Arbitrator
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                                        Ntc Of Hrg On Petition For Coordination
                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 2/1/1994, Entered: 2/1/1994
                                                                                                          Contra Costa Case # C93-01436 Transfer & Consolidated With Superior Court Case # 954975
                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 1/27/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994
                                                                                                            Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/26/1994, Entered: 1/26/1994
                                                                                                              Association Of Counsel [for Deft-kinder & Wuerfel]
                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/24/1994
                                                                                                                Request For Trial For The Pltf
                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/18/1994, Entered: 1/18/1994
                                                                                                                  Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer S.f., Sup Crt; Ord Signed In Open Crt (10)
                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/18/1994, Entered: 1/18/1994
                                                                                                                    Petn For Coord--crt Granted The Stip To Consl Cases In Contra Costa & This Case. Contra Costa Case Ord Transf To S.f., Sup Crt; Ord Signed In Open Crt (10)
                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/18/1994, Entered: 1/18/1994
                                                                                                                      Order Granting Petition Of Coordination
                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/28/1993, Entered: 12/28/1993
                                                                                                                        Request For Trial De Novo For The Pltf
                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993
                                                                                                                          Ntc Of Hearing On Petn For Coordination (1/18/94, 9:30 A.m. Dept. 10)
                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993
                                                                                                                            Notice Of Submission Of Petn For Coord
                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993
                                                                                                                              Ntc Of Submission Of Petn For Coordination
                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993
                                                                                                                                Decl Of Raymond B. Mcfalone In Support Of Petn For Coord
                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993
                                                                                                                                  Memo Of Pts & Auths In Support Of Petn For Coord
                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993
                                                                                                                                    Petition For Coordination
                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/27/1993, Entered: 12/27/1993 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Judicial Council Order Assigning The Hon. William Cahill As Coord Motion Judge (jcc 2943 "kassabian Injury Cases")
                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/17/1993, Entered: 12/17/1993
                                                                                                                                        > Menlo Management To X-complt
                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/17/1993, Entered: 12/17/1993
                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Pacific Real Estate Investment And >
                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/13/1993, Entered: 12/13/1993
                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 11/12/1993, Entered: 11/12/1993
                                                                                                                                              $364 Pd By: Robert Thompson Lambert & Lonnie Dart
                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/12/1993, Entered: 11/12/1993
                                                                                                                                                Answer Of Robert Thompson Lambert & Lonnie Dart
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued On Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                    > Inc. & Menlo Management
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                      $364. Pd By Pacific Real Est. Investment Trust,>
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                        > Inc. & Menlo Management
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Pacific Real Estate Investment Trust,>
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                            > Management
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                              > Inc. Dba Lakeshore Shopping Center; & Menlo >
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/3/1993, Entered: 11/3/1993
                                                                                                                                                                X-complt Of Pacific Real Estate Investment Trust >
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: 10/26/1993
                                                                                                                                                                  $182. Pd By: Eileen Chen
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: 10/26/1993
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Submission Of Petition For Coordination
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/22/1993, Entered: 10/22/1993
                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/19/1993, Entered: 10/19/1993
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/1993, Entered: 10/19/1993
                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/17/1993, Entered: 9/17/1993
                                                                                                                                                                            Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Feb-25-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/17/1993, Entered: 9/17/1993
                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/1993, Entered: 9/17/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?