Ambrunn Vs Abbott Laboratories
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 93 957383
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ambrunn, Harry B, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alioto & Alioto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Lawrence Alioto +1 415 434 2100
No Logo Seventeen Fifty Medical Center Pharmacy Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alioto & Alioto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Lawrence Alioto +1 415 434 2100
v.
Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Abbott Laboratories"
No Logo AmeriNet, Defendant
No Logo Bergen Brunswig Drug Co, Defendant
No Logo F.d. Titus & Son, Defendant
No Logo Intermountain Health Care, Defendant
No Logo Pbi Buyers Inc, Defendant
Cause of Action Antitrust/unfair Competition
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001
Declaration Of Thomas Sidun Re: Mailing Of Ntc Of Class Decertification
    Blank 26 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001
    Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice-microfilmed R/b F: 365-25
      Blank 25 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994
      Proof Of Service
        Blank 24 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
        Appendix Of Non-california Auths Cited By The Manufacturer & Wholesaler Defnts & By Medco Containment Services Etal
          Blank 23 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
          Declaration Of Dean S Krystowski
            Blank 22 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
            Memorandum Of Points & Authorities Supporting Demurrer Of Manufacturer & Wholesaler Defnts To Plntf's Consolidated
              Blank 21 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
              Memorandum Of Points & Authorities Supporting Demurrer Of Medco Containment; National Pharmacies; Paid Prescriptions
                Blank 20 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Strike Class Allegations
                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
                  Ntc Of Hrg On Demurrer Of Defnts Medco Containment Servicesnational Pharmacies; Paid Prescriptions To Plntfs' Consldt
                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
                    Ntc Of Hrg On Demurrer Of Manufacturer & Wholesaler Defnts To Plntfs' Consolidated & Amended Complaint
                      Blank 17 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
                      Demurrer Of Medco Containment Services; National Pharmaciespaid Prescriptions To Consolidated & Amended Complaint
                        Blank 16 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
                        Demurrer Of Manufacturer & Wholesaler Defnts To Plntfs' Consolidated & Amended Complaint
                          Blank 15 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
                          Ntc Of Defnts' Motion To Strike Class Allegations From The Consolidated & Amended Complaint, Calendar Motion: To Strike Hearing Set For Oct-28-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 9
                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/17/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994
                            Notice Of Entry Of Order
                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/13/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994
                              Proof Of Service By Mail
                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/20/1994, Entered: 5/20/1994
                                Ptr1, St/cf 5-20-94 @ 8:30 Am, Off Calendar: Jcc,
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: 5/3/1994
                                  Drug Barn; Milton & Barbara Sloban's Ntc Of Submission Of Petition For Coordination Of Add-on Case
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/29/1994, Entered: 4/29/1994
                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/1994, Entered: 4/28/1994
                                      Proof Of Service
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/1994, Entered: 4/22/1994
                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: 4/12/1994
                                          Ntc Of Entry Of Order
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/25/1994, Entered: 2/25/1994
                                            Proof Of Service
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 2/14/1994
                                              Ntc Of Submission Of Petition For Coordination Of Proceedings
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/14/1994, Entered: 2/14/1994
                                                Bergen Brunswig Drug Co's Ntc Of Submission Of Petn For Coordination Of Proceedings
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: 12/22/1993
                                                  Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For May-20-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: 12/22/1993
                                                    Summons Issued
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: 12/22/1993
                                                      Complaint For Violations Of The California Unfair Practicesact

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?