Santori Vs Gibson
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 94 959059
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Santori, Andrew, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Gibson, Valerie J, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
No Logo Superior National Insurance Co, Intervenor
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995
Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
    Blank 29 Filed: 5/24/1995, Entered: 5/24/1995
    Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For Aug-31-1995 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
      Blank 28 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995
      Order To Show Cause For August 31, 1995 At 1:30pm
        Blank 27 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/23/1995
        Mailing (ca068) From 05/24/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 08/31/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
          Blank 26 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995
          Order To Show Cause-05/24/95 1:30pm
            Blank 25 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995
            > National Insurance Co.
              Blank 24 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995
              Req For Dism, W/ Prej Complt-in-intervention Of >
                Blank 23 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995
                Mailing (ca068) From 05/24/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 05/24/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995
                  Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For May-24-1995 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 3/31/1995
                    Req For Dism, W/ Prej Complt Only
                      Blank 20 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: 10/12/1994
                      Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 10/11/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am For 10/11/94 Scd8 09:00 Am
                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 7/29/1994
                        Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference: Hearing Set For Oct-11-1994 At 02:30 Am In Dept 8
                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 7/29/1994
                          Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Oct-11-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 478
                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/22/1994, Entered: 7/22/1994
                            Status Conference Order
                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/21/1994, Entered: 7/21/1994
                              Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 07/29/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 10/11/94 Scd8 09:00 Am
                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/12/1994, Entered: 7/12/1994
                                Answer Of Valerie J Gibson To Complt-in-intervention
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/11/1994
                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/1/1994, Entered: 7/1/1994
                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/1994, Entered: 6/30/1994
                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/16/1994, Entered: 6/16/1994
                                        Proof Of Service
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 4/25/1994
                                          $182 Pd By: Valerie J. Gibson
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 4/25/1994
                                            Answer Of Valerie J. Gibson
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: 4/13/1994
                                              Proof Of Service
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: 4/13/1994
                                                Summons Issued
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: 4/13/1994
                                                  $182 Pd By: Superior National Insurance Co
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/13/1994, Entered: 4/13/1994
                                                    Complaint-in-intervention Of Superior National Insurance Co
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: 3/4/1994
                                                      Statement Of Damages
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: 3/4/1994
                                                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jul-29-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: 3/4/1994
                                                          Summons Issued
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/4/1994, Entered: 3/4/1994
                                                            Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?