Sap Vs Foley
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 94 959429
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sap, Ugo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson, Donovan & Poole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anderson, Donovan & Poole +1 415 956 6413
v.
No Logo Foley, Marjorie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 12/21/1995
Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
    Blank 45 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995
    Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For Dec-14-1995 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
      Blank 44 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995
      Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
        Blank 43 Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995
        Order To Show Cause, 12/14/95 1:30pm
          Blank 42 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995
          Mailing (ca068) From 11/16/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 12/14/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
            Blank 41 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995
            Order Denying Mo And Awarding Sanctions-microfilmed R/b F: 159-27
              Blank 40 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995
              Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: Nov. 16, 1995 - 1:30 Pm
                Blank 39 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995
                Mailing (ca068) From 11/16/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 11/16/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995
                  Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For Nov-16-1995 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Court Filing
                    Stipulation That Commissioner May Act As Judge Pro Tempore
                      Blank 36 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995
                      Deft's Reply To Oppos Of Pltf To Foely's Mo To Compel Deposition Of Ellis Ross Anderson
                        Blank 35 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995
                        Declaration Of Ellis Ross Anderson
                          Blank 34 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995
                          Memo Of P&a's In Opposition To Mo Compel Deposition Of Ellis Ross Anderson
                            Blank 33 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995
                            Pltf & X-deft Ugo Sap's Oppos To Foley's Mo To Compel Depo-sition Of Ellis Ross Anderson
                              Blank 32 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995
                              Ntc Of Unavailability Of Counsel
                                Blank 31 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995
                                Deft's Ntc Of Mo To Compel Attendance Of Ellis Ross Ander- Son At Deposition, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Aug-28-1995 At 10:30 Am In Dept 450
                                  Blank 30 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995
                                  Change Of Address Of Atty
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995
                                    Scd1-mo.cal: Mo. To Adv. Trial Pur. Ccp 36a, Off Calendar W/o Prej.; Mo. To Exempt Case From Arbitration, Denied
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                                      Defnt & X-compln Marjorie Foley's Reply To Plntf's Oppos To Motion
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                                        Plntf & X-defnt Ugo Sap's Oppos To Foley's Motion
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995
                                          Ntc Of Motion To Advance Case To Trial & For Exemption Fromarbitration, Calendar Motion: Advance Trial Hearing Set For Apr-11-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 1
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995
                                            Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995
                                              Declaration Of Daniel J Mash
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995
                                                Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995
                                                  Motion To Advance Trial - Dept. No. 1 Matter (10)
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995
                                                    Ntc Of Mo To Advance Case To Trial, Calendar Motion: Advance Trial Hearing Set For Mar-08-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995
                                                      Declaration Of Marjorie Foley
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995
                                                        Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Mo To Advance Case To Trial
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/25/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994
                                                          Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 10/24/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am For 10/24/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/1994, Entered: 8/19/1994
                                                            Ntc Of Unavailability Of Counsel
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/12/1994, Entered: 8/12/1994
                                                              Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Oct-24-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 478
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/2/1994
                                                                Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 08/12/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 10/24/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/2/1994, Entered: 8/2/1994
                                                                  Status Conference Order
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/1994, Entered: 7/26/1994
                                                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/18/1994, Entered: 7/18/1994
                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 6/29/1994
                                                                        Answer Of Pltf/x-defdt, Ugo Sap To X-complt
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/2/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994
                                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/19/1994, Entered: 5/19/1994
                                                                            X-complt Of Marjorie Foley
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 5/19/1994, Entered: 5/19/1994
                                                                              $182 Pd By: Marjorie Foley
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/19/1994, Entered: 5/19/1994
                                                                                Answer Of Marjorie Foley
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/19/1994, Entered: 5/19/1994
                                                                                  Summons Issued On Cross-complaint
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 4/25/1994
                                                                                    Summons Filed
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/1994, Entered: 4/25/1994
                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994
                                                                                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Aug-12-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994
                                                                                          Summons Issued
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/17/1994, Entered: 3/17/1994
                                                                                            Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?