Redmond Vs P.g. & E.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 94 960193
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Redmond, Charles, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo Pacific Gas & Electric Co (2225 Folsom), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ropers Majeski Kohn Bentley Wagner & Kane +1 415 364 8200
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan & Lifter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan & Lifter +1 510 763 6510
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995
> Pacific Gas And Electric Company
    Blank 22 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995
    Req For Dism, W/ Prej X-complt Only As To >
      Blank 21 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995
      $182 Pd By: Tishman Speyer Properties
        Blank 20 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995
        Answer Of Tishman Speyer Properties To X-complt
          Blank 19 Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995
          Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
            Blank 18 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994
            Off Calendar Settled (schuman/ptr1)
              Blank 17 Filed: 12/20/1994, Entered: 12/20/1994
              Off-calendar-settled (schuman/ptr1),
                Blank 16 Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994
                Notice Of Early Settlement Conference-early Settlement Program
                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994
                  Summons Issued
                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994
                    Cross-complaint Of Pg&e Co
                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: 9/9/1994
                      Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: 9/9/1994
                        Plan I Trial, Pltf Demands,
                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/1994, Entered: 8/30/1994
                          Status Conference Order
                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994
                            Mailing, Trial Settlement From 09/09/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 03/01/95 Sc20 04:00 Pm
                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994
                              Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: 6/6/1994
                                $182 Pd By: Pg&e Co
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: 6/6/1994
                                  Answer Of Pg&e Co
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/26/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994
                                    Proof Of Service
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/26/1994, Entered: 5/26/1994
                                      Summons Filed
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/1994, Entered: 5/4/1994
                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994
                                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Sep-09-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994
                                            Summons Issued
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/14/1994, Entered: 4/14/1994
                                              Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?