Loomis Vs Reliance Comm-tec Network Svs
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 94 960299
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Loomis, Timothy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smolich & Smolich

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Smolich & Smolich +1 916 443 2988
v.
No Logo Costa Enterprises, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burnham Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burnham Brown +1 510 444 6800
No Logo Pacific Bell (140 New Montgomery), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pacific Bell Legal Dept +1 415 542 2155
No Logo Reliance Comm-tec Network Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bronson, Bronson & McKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bronson, Bronson & Mckinnon +1 408 293 0599
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bronson, Bronson & McKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bronson, Bronson & Mckinnon +1 408 293 0599
No Logo Costa Enterprises, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burnham Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burnham Brown +1 510 444 6800
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 82 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Blank 81 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996
    Proceedings Reported By Richard Botto, Csr
      Blank 80 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996
      Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar Settled
        Blank 79 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996
        Added To Court Calendar
          Blank 78 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996
          Transferred From Jury To Court Calendar-failure To Timely Deposit Jury Fees
            Blank 77 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996
            Proof Of Service
              Blank 76 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996
              Sc Held Not Settled Sc7
                Blank 75 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/4/1996
                Re-ntc Of Mo By Defdts For Sanctions, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Jun-14-1996 At 09:00 Am In Dept 450
                  Blank 74 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996
                  Defts' Re-ntc Of Mo For Sanctions, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Jun-06-1996 At 09:00 Am In Dept 450
                    Blank 73 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996
                    Declaration Of James M Smolich
                      Blank 72 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996
                      Pltf's Answer To Deft's Mo For Sanctions For Violation Of Adiscovery Order
                        Blank 71 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996
                        Ntc Of Mo By Defdts For Sanctions, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For May-24-1996 At 09:00 Am In Dept 450
                          Blank 70 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996
                          Proof Of Service
                            Blank 69 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Court Filing
                            Stipulation That Commissioner May Act As Judge Pro Tempore
                              Blank 68 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996
                              Order Re Sanctions For Failure To Appear At Physical Exam- Microfilmed R/b F: 176-30
                                Blank 67 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996
                                Declaration Of James M. Smolich
                                  Blank 66 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996
                                  Pltf's Answer To Deft's Mo For Sanctions
                                    Blank 65 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996
                                    Proof Of Service
                                      Blank 64 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996
                                      Declaration Of Andrew S. Miller
                                        Blank 63 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996
                                        Defts' Ntc Of Mo For Sanctions, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Mar-26-1996 At 09:00 Am In Dept 469
                                          Blank 62 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996
                                          Declaration Of Jason A. Doren
                                            Blank 61 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996
                                            Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Mo For Sanctions
                                              Blank 60 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996
                                              Mailing (ca025) From 06/24/96 Scd1 09:00 Am For 06/04/96 Scd7 09:00 Am
                                                Blank 59 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996
                                                Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996
                                                  Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Jun-04-1996 At 09:00 Am In Dept 7
                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996
                                                    Notice Of Trial, Plaintiff Demands; Consolidated With #959816 (ptr1)
                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995
                                                      Request For Trial De Novo For The Pltf (consolidated With Case No. 959816)
                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/7/1995
                                                        Order Re Pltf's Mo To Consolidate Actions Consol W/ 959816
                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995
                                                          Req For Dism, W/ Prej Complt Only As To Costa Enterprises Only
                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/5/1995
                                                            Judgment-microfilmed R/b F: 147-08
                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995
                                                              Judgment By Court Microfilmed R/b F: 146-34
                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995
                                                                (2) Declaration Of Service
                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 4/27/1995
                                                                  Motions For Summary Judgment Transferred To Dept. One. (8)
                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 4/27/1995
                                                                    Order Granting Deft & X-deft Pacific Bell's Mo For Summary Judgment Against Pltf-microfilmed R/b F: 143-29
                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 4/27/1995
                                                                      Order Granting Deft & X-deft Costa Enterprises' Mo For Summary Judgment Against Pltf-microfilmed R/b F: 143-29
                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995
                                                                        Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995
                                                                          Mtn Summ Judg/summ Adj - Referrd To Dept No 8 (10)
                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995
                                                                            Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995
                                                                              Mtn Summ Judg/summ Adj - Ref To Dept No 8 (10)
                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995
                                                                                Declaration Of Service
                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995
                                                                                  $100 Pd By: Pacific Bell/mo For Summary Judgment
                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995
                                                                                    Ntc Of Mo For Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Adjudication Of Issues Hearing Set For Apr-26-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995
                                                                                      Declaration Of Mailing Notice
                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995
                                                                                        Declaration Of Hand-delivery Of Notice
                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995
                                                                                          $100 Pd By: Costa Enterprises/mo For Summary Judgment
                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/27/1995
                                                                                            Ntc Of Mo For Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Adjudication Of Issues Hearing Set For Apr-24-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995
                                                                                              Change Of Address Of Atty
                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 12/30/1994
                                                                                                Proof Of Service
                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994
                                                                                                  Association Of Atty, Larson & Burnham For Defdt, Pacific Bell
                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: 11/3/1994
                                                                                                    Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 11/21/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am For 11/21/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 10/25/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994
                                                                                                      X-complt Of Costa Enterprises
                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: 10/21/1994
                                                                                                        Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Nov-21-1994 At 08:00 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: 10/12/1994
                                                                                                          Status Conference Order
                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 10/12/1994, Entered: 10/12/1994
                                                                                                            Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 10/21/94 Ptr1 10:30 Am For 11/21/94 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/3/1994, Entered: 10/3/1994
                                                                                                              Answer Of Costa Enterprises
                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: 9/29/1994
                                                                                                                Ntc & Acknowledgment Of Receipt
                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994
                                                                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994
                                                                                                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994
                                                                                                                      $182. Pd By: Costa Enterprises
                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: 9/22/1994
                                                                                                                        Answer Of Costa Enterprises
                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 9/16/1994, Entered: 9/16/1994
                                                                                                                          Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Oct-21-1994 At 10:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/6/1994, Entered: 9/6/1994
                                                                                                                            Association Of Atty, Raymond F Churchill For Defdt, Pacificbell
                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994
                                                                                                                              Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 09/16/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 10/21/94 Ptr1 10:30 Am
                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 9/2/1994
                                                                                                                                Order To Show Cause-10/21/94 10:30 Am
                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 8/26/1994, Entered: 8/26/1994
                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Substitute True Name(s) For Fictitious Name(s)
                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 8/18/1994, Entered: 8/18/1994
                                                                                                                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement (joint)
                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994
                                                                                                                                      > Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994
                                                                                                                                        $364. Pd By: Reliance Comm/tec.-network Services, &
                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994
                                                                                                                                          > Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994
                                                                                                                                            Answer Of Reliance Comm/tec.-network Services, &
                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994
                                                                                                                                              Pacific Bell's Amendment To X-complt To Substitute True Name Of "roe" X-deft
                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994
                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994
                                                                                                                                                  X-complt Of Pacific Bell
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994
                                                                                                                                                    $182 Pd By: Pacific Bell
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994
                                                                                                                                                      Answer Of Pacific Bell
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994
                                                                                                                                                        > Comm/tec.-network Services
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994
                                                                                                                                                          $364. Pd By: Reliance Electric Co. & Reliance > & Receipt Number 302796
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994
                                                                                                                                                            > Comm/tec.-network Services
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/8/1994
                                                                                                                                                              Answer Of Reliance Electric Co. & Reliance >
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994
                                                                                                                                                                Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Sep-16-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994
                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/20/1994, Entered: 4/20/1994
                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?