Guardsmark Inc Vs Fifth & Market Assoc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 94 962378
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelson & Kennard +1 916 920 2295
v.
No Logo Fifth & Market Associates Ltd, Defendant
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995
Ptr1, Osc 3-2-95 @ 2:00 Pm, Off Calendar: Default,
    Blank 17 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995
    Ptr1, Osc 3-2-95 @ 2:00 Pm, Off Calendar: Default Entered,
      Blank 16 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/2/1995
      Ptr1, Osc 3-2-95 @ 2:00 Pm, Off Calendar: Default,
        Blank 15 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: 1/27/1995
        Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Mar-02-1995 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 314
          Blank 14 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995
          Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal/sanctions For March 2, 1995 At 2:00pm
            Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995
            Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 01/27/95 Ptr1 10:30 Am For 03/02/95 Ptr1 02:00 Pm
              Blank 12 Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/6/1995
              Req To Enter Default/clerk's Judgment-entered As To: Fifth & Market Associates Ltd
                Blank 11 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994
                Declaration Of Robert Scott Kennard
                  Blank 10 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994
                  Order Denying Appl For Continuance Of Status Conference
                    Blank 9 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994
                    Ex Parte Appl For For Continuance Of Status Conference
                      Blank 8 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994
                      Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Jan-27-1995 At 10:30 Am In Dept 314
                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/19/1994, Entered: 12/19/1994
                        Summons Filed
                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/1994, Entered: 12/16/1994
                          Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 12/21/94 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 01/27/95 Ptr1 10:30 Am
                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/1994, Entered: 12/16/1994
                            Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: Jan. 27, 1995 - 10:30 Am
                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/15/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994
                              Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                                Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Dec-21-1994 At 08:30 Am In Dept 478
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                                  Summons Issued
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/15/1994, Entered: 7/15/1994
                                    Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?