Deforrest Vs Stanley Smith Security Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 94 963215
Superior Court Judge William Cahill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deforrest, Eugene, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Hinshaw Cohen & Barnet

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan, Hinshaw, Ruben, Cohen & Barnet +1 415 296 0800
v.
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jackson Lewis Llp +1 415 394 9400
No Logo Pinkerton Inc, Defendant
No Logo Pm Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP +1 213 250 1800
No Logo Pm Realty Group, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Stanley Smith Security, Inc., Defendant
Cause of Action Wrongful Discharge
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 107 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997
Remittitur Dismissed-microfilmed R/b F: 227-14
    Blank 106 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997
    $ 100 Notice Appeal Pd-s. Court # 1600/00541711
      Blank 105 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996
      Order Of Court Of Appeal Granting Request Of Eeoc For Permission To File Amicus Curaie Brief
        Blank 104 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
        Order Granting Motion To Strike & Tax Costs Microfilmed R/b F: 170-28
          Blank 103 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996
          Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
            Blank 102 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996
            Mo To Tax & Or Strike Costs--attys Fees Stricken.balance Ofcosts Awarded To Deft.(10)
              Blank 101 Filed: 1/8/1996, Entered: 1/8/1996
              Deforrest's Reply Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo To Strike And Tax Costs
                Blank 100 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/4/1996
                Deft's Oppos To Pltf's Mo To Strike
                  Blank 99 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/4/1996
                  Declaration Of James A. Carter
                    Blank 98 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/4/1996
                    Deft's Objection To Declaration Of Eugene P. Deforrest
                      Blank 97 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/15/1995
                      Certified Record To Court Of Appeals Ao72441#4(5.1)r)
                        Blank 96 Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995
                        Amended Notice Of Appeal Filed
                          Blank 95 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995
                          Declaration Of Eugene P Deforrest
                            Blank 94 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995
                            Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo To Strike And Tax Costs
                              Blank 93 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995
                              Ntc Of Mo To Tax And/or Strike Costs, Calendar Motion: Tax Costs, Calendar Motion: To Strike Hearing Set For Jan-11-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                Blank 92 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995
                                Stipulation To Extend Time To File And Serve Motion To Strike And Or Tax Costs
                                  Blank 91 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995
                                  Notice To Reporter Joseph Vickstein To Prepare Transcript
                                    Blank 90 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995
                                    Notification Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal Filed
                                      Blank 89 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995
                                      $ 100.00 Bryan Law Corp #024330 Cashier Payment
                                        Blank 88 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995
                                        Appellant's Notice To Prepare A Reporter's Transcript Filed
                                          Blank 87 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995
                                          Notice Of Election To Proceed Under Rule 5.1
                                            Blank 86 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995
                                            Notice Of Appeal Filed By Plaintiff Eugene Deforrest
                                              Blank 85 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995
                                              Deft Guadrsmark Inc's Memorandum Of Costs
                                                Blank 84 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995
                                                Notice Of Entry Of Order
                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995
                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/27/1995
                                                    Entry Of Judgment By Court Pursuant To Ccp Section 437(c) -microfilmed R/b F: 161-33
                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995
                                                      Proceedings Reported By Richard Botto, Csr
                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995
                                                        Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar, No Appearance; Trial Date Vacated; Dismissed
                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995
                                                          Order Granting Defnt's Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Microfilmed R/b F: 161-05
                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995
                                                            Stip & Protective Order
                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995
                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995
                                                                Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995
                                                                  Mo For Sj/sa;relf Under Ccp 473--matter Taken Under Submis-sion.(10)
                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995
                                                                    Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Lamont W. Allen
                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995
                                                                      Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Eugene Perry Deforrest
                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995
                                                                        Deft's Compendium Of Federal Cases & Statutes Not Containedin California Reporters
                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995
                                                                          Declaration Of Harry G. Lewis
                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995
                                                                            Deft's Reply To Pltf's Oppos To Mo For Summ Judgment
                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995
                                                                              Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995
                                                                                Mo For Sj/sa--cont Sept 29, 1995.(10)
                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995
                                                                                  Pltf's Separate Statement Of Disputed & Undisputed Facts Opposing Mo For Summ Judgment
                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995
                                                                                    Memo Of Pts & Auths In Oppos To Mo For Summ Judgment And Summ Adjudication Of Issues
                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995
                                                                                      $ 78.00 Jury Fee Bryan Law Corp #023766 Cashier Payment
                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995
                                                                                        Declaration Of Richard M. Bryan
                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995
                                                                                          Ex Parte Order Extending Time To File Response In Oppos To The Deft's Mo For Summ Judgment
                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995
                                                                                            Ex Parte Appl & Declaration Requesting Leave Of Court For Extension Of Time For Filing Supplemental Exhibits
                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995
                                                                                              Pltf's Separate Statement Of Disputed & Undisputed Facts Opposing Mo For Summ Judgment
                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995
                                                                                                Objections To Evidence In Oppos To Guardmark's Mo For Summ Judgment
                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995
                                                                                                  Pltf's Conpendium Of Federal & State Law Not Contained In California Reporters In Oppos To Mo For Summ Judgment
                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995
                                                                                                    Mailing, Settlement Conference Notice From 10/05/95 Scd7 09:00 Am For 10/05/95 Scd7 09:00 Am
                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995
                                                                                                      Settlement Conference Continued, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Oct-05-1995 At 09:00 Am In Dept 7
                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995
                                                                                                        Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995
                                                                                                          Settlement Conference Order
                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995
                                                                                                            Ntc Of Appl For Ex Parte Order Granting Relief
                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995
                                                                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995
                                                                                                                Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Deft's Ex Parte Appl & Order For Relief
                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995
                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Harry G. Lewis
                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995
                                                                                                                    Order Granting Relief, Calendar Motion: Relief Hearing Set For Sep-29-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Harry G Lewis
                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Coley Buellesfeld
                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                                                                          Deft's Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                                                                            Deft Guardsmark Inc's Compendium Of Federal & State Not Contained In Calif Reporters In Supp Of Mo For Summ Judgmnt
                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                                                                              Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Mo Forsummary Judgment
                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                                                                                $100 Pd By: Guardsmark Inc/mo For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                                                                                  Ntc Of Mo For Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Adjudication Of Issues Hearing Set For Sep-22-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995
                                                                                                                                    > Gation Services, Sued As Pinkerton, Inc.
                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995
                                                                                                                                      > Ton's Inc. Dba Pinkerton Security & Investi- >
                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995
                                                                                                                                        > Defdts, Stanley Smith Security, Inc & Pinker->
                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995
                                                                                                                                          Req For Dism, W/ Prej - Entire Action As To >
                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995
                                                                                                                                            Req For Dism, W/ Prej Complt Only As To Pm Realty Group Ltd
                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995
                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 6/29/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995
                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995
                                                                                                                                                  (4) Notice Of Early Settlement Conference-early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995
                                                                                                                                                    Order Of Court Of Appeal Denying Petition For Writ Of Mandate & Request For Stay
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995
                                                                                                                                                      Plan Ii Trial, Settlement Conference:
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995
                                                                                                                                                        Plan Ii Trial, Plaintiff Demands;
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995
                                                                                                                                                          Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995
                                                                                                                                                            Dropped From Trial Calendar (ptr1),
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995
                                                                                                                                                              Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 2/3/1995
                                                                                                                                                                Plan I Trial, Pltf Demands,
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 1/26/1995
                                                                                                                                                                  Defnt Pm Realty Group Ltd's Objection To Status Conference Order; Request For Reassignment From Plan 1 To Plan 2
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995
                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995
                                                                                                                                                                      Mailing, Trial Settlement From 02/03/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 07/10/95 Scd4 08:30 Am
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995
                                                                                                                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994
                                                                                                                                                                          $182 Pd By: Pm Realty Group Ltd
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 11/28/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994
                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Of Pm Realty Group Ltd
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/18/1994
                                                                                                                                                                              Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer (10, Cahill)
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/18/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                Pm Realty Grp Demurrer To 7th C/a Overuled 10 Days To Ans. 8th C/a Sufficienbtly States C/a (10.cahill)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/18/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Overruling Demurrer With Ten Days To Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 11/16/1994, Entered: 11/16/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                    Pm Realty Group's Reply To Pltf's Oppos
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                      Pltf's Oppos To The Demurrer Of Pm Realty Group Ltd
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proceedings Reported By Mary Ellen Scherer
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                          Demurrer - Cont Nov 18, 1994 (10)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/24/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                            Ntc Of Cont Of Demurrer Of Pm Realty Group Ltd Sued As Pm Management, Calendar Motion: Continue, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Nov-18-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: 10/21/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                              $182 Pd By: Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: 10/21/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Of Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request For Judicial Ntc
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                    $182 Pd By: Pm Realty Group Ltd Sued As Pm Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ntc Of Hearing On Demurrer Of Pm Realty Group Ltd Sued As Pm Management, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Nov-04-1994 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/7/1994, Entered: 10/7/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                        $364. Pd By Stanley Smith Secur, Inc & Pinkerton's Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/7/1994, Entered: 10/7/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                          > Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/7/1994, Entered: 10/7/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Of Stanley Smith Security, Inc.& Pinkerton's>
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/14/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/14/1994, Entered: 9/14/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/23/1994, Entered: 8/23/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Feb-03-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/23/1994, Entered: 8/23/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/23/1994, Entered: 8/23/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint For Wrongful Termination

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?